Eolas Technologies Incorporated v. Google Inc.

Plaintiff: Eolas Technologies Incorporated
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv01138
Filed: March 6, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2017 113 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 111 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reflect Name Change from Google Inc. to Google LLC filed by Google LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
October 2, 2017 110 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 109 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Stay Court Deadlines Other Than Those Set Forth In The Court's September 27, 2017 Order filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 2, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
September 26, 2017 108 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 107 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Court Deadlines filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 26, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 21, 2017 106 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 105 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 102 Order to Extend Deadline to Meet and Confer and File Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 21, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 20, 2017 104 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 103 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Modify Court Deadlines filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 20, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
August 28, 2017 97 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 96 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Extending Time to File Joint Letter Brief re Infringement Contentions filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 28, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
August 8, 2017 94 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Early Summary Judgment and Claim Construction Reconsideration Briefing Schedules (Corrected) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Tutorial Hearing set for 10/31/ 2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Hearing on summary judgment motions set for 12/5/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 8, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
June 21, 2017 84 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 83 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Rescheduling July 5, 2017 Case Management Conference for August 2, 2017 filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 21, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
May 22, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 66 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Eolas Technologies Incorporated filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 22, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eolas Technologies Incorporated v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eolas Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: Kevin Lee Burgess
Represented By: John Bruce Campbell, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Hess
Represented By: James Elroy Quigley
Represented By: Craig N. Tolliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Lindsay M Cooper
Represented By: Felipe Corredor
Represented By: Michael Edwin Jones
Represented By: David Andrew Perlson
Represented By: Michael Daniel Powell
Represented By: Charles K Verhoeven
Represented By: Jonathan K. Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?