Swamy v. Title Source, Incorporated

Plaintiff: Som Swamy
Defendant: Title Source, Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2017cv01175
Filed: March 7, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2017 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Alsup deferring ruling on 73 Motion to Certify Class; deferring ruling on 75 Motion; denying 76 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 91 Administrative Motion. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2017)
October 31, 2017 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AS MODIFIED by Judge William Alsup granting 87 Stipulation. Amended Pleadings due by 11/17/2017.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 29, 2017 86 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 84 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2017)
July 17, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge William Alsup [denying 53 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
June 12, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO TRANSFER by Judge William Alsup [denying 25 Motion to Transfer Case]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
May 22, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup denying 24 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
May 18, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY WILLIAM HOGG PRO HAC VICE Hon. William Alsup granting 48 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 16, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE AND TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY RE VENUE re 30 MOTION to Continue Response to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Som Swamy, 36 Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time for Setting of Hearing on Motion for Continuance of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to Conduct Limited Discovery filed by Som Swamy. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/16/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 15, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PETER WAHBY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
May 9, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS OF ATTORNEYS GALVIN B. KENNEDY, MARSHALL M. HOGG, AND JEFFREY B. MORGANROTH by Judge Alsup denying 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; denying 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; denying 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swamy v. Title Source, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Som Swamy
Represented By: Don J. Foty
Represented By: Galvin B. Kennedy
Represented By: Lorrie T. Peeters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Title Source, Incorporated
Represented By: Michelle L. DuCharme
Represented By: Lindsay Erin Hutner
Represented By: James Milton Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?