Tryfonas v. Splunk Inc

Plaintiff: Christos Tryfonas
Defendant: Splunk, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv01420
Filed: March 15, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 42 Stipulation To Extend Current Case Deadlines. Close of Fact Discovery due by 2/1/2018; Designation of Experts due by 2/15/2018; Close of Expert Discovery due by 3/19/2018; Motion Hearing s et for 5/10/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2018 03:00 PM.; Jury Selection / Jury Trial (4-day)set for 8/20/2018 08:30 AM before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
June 21, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 26 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
June 14, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 22 Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tryfonas v. Splunk Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christos Tryfonas
Represented By: Andrew Dimitriou
Represented By: Rory Cosby Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Splunk, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?