United States v. Coinbase, Inc.
Petitioner: United States
Respondent: Coinbase, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv01431
Filed: March 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER RE PETITION TO ENFORCE IRS SUMMONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/28/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 10 Motion to Intervene; granting 12 Motion Proceed Under Fictitious Names; granting 14 Administrative Motion Proceed Under Fictitious Names; denying 19 Motion to Intervene; and granting 39 Stipulation TO SUBSTITUTE PROPOSED INTERVENOR JOHN DOE 4 FOR PROPOSED INTERVENORS JOHN DOES 1 AND 2(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 17-cv-1431. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on March 17, 2017. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Coinbase, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States
Represented By: Amy Talburt Matchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Coinbase, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?