Bratton et al v. FCA US LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Christina G. Bratton and Ricky A. Bratton
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv01458
Filed: March 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion for Attorney Fees. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER IMPOSING SANCTIONS; AND FURTHER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/14/17. Show Cause Response due by 11/21/2017. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 17-1541-WHO, 17-1532-VC, 17-4042-LHK, 17-4154-LHK, and 17-4294-LHK. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/17/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 6/23/2017. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 16, 2017. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bratton et al v. FCA US LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina G. Bratton
Represented By: Steve Mikhov
Represented By: Mark D. O'Connor
Represented By: Lauren Andrea Ungs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky A. Bratton
Represented By: Steve Mikhov
Represented By: Mark D. O'Connor
Represented By: Lauren Andrea Ungs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Aaron Michael Brian
Represented By: Jennifer A. Kuenster
Represented By: Kristi Jean Livedalen
Represented By: Scott S. Shepardson
Represented By: Sharon Lynn Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?