Moralez v. Horizon

Plaintiff: Francisca Moralez
Defendant: Horizon
Case Number: 3:2017cv01479
Filed: March 19, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/12/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
October 2, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF. Motions terminated: 22 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION From Order Striking Defendant's Answer. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/02/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
September 19, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT'S ANSWER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/19/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 6, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing, no later than September 20, 2017, why the action should not be dismissed for failure to prosec ute. In the event plaintiff files, on or before September 20, 2017, a Notice of Need for Mediation or a statement that the case has settled, this Order to Show Cause will stand discharged without further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/06/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
August 24, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 11, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/11/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moralez v. Horizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisca Moralez
Represented By: Russell Scott Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?