Sangimino et al v. Bayer Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ann Sangimino, Ananhi Gonzalez, Michelle Scheifen, Paige Tucker, Melissa Byreley, Jessica Gutherie, Tarquenia Brown, Tekesha Sant-Val, Kisha Vinson, Katrina Daniels, Solmarie Montes-Arroyo, Jeanette Stiffler, Barbara Turner, Kiri Horne, Amanda Sue Lory, Chenoa Fore, Cassie Lynn Downes, Maria Mendoza, Christine Minor, Dana Davidson, Tasha Oglesby, Jeanette Powles-Dies, Melissa Ragan, Jodi Kirksley, Akasha Terrier, Krisila Baker, Minerva Blackmon, A'randa Gary, Tamara Johnson, Telleia Little, Lauren Max, Chuteah McJunkins, Elizabeth Sipe, Kimberly Waters, Hetty Mae Kodges, Amanda Miller-McKnight, Kristain Halfacre, Pamela Jane Drew, Michelle Campos, Jennifer Holmes, Tanya Muldoon, Staci Sessions, Andrea Jo Patschke, Jennifer Palmer, Esselene Lowe, Wendy Berry, Jennifer Stevens, Mary Cox, Ashley Purvis, Katty Gonzalez, Candise Braley-Davis, Caroline Corbin, Hazen Chandler, Nisha Thomas, Tammy Miller, Victoria Anderson-Lewis, Melissa Carter, Lina Jones and Abegail Tongol
Defendant: Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Essure Inc. and Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv01488
Filed: March 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND AND DENYING AS MOOT MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Alsup finding as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss; granting 18 Motion to Remand (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JONATHAN COHN PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY LOUIS BOGRAD PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY FIDELMA FITZPATRICK PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY FIDELMA FITZPATRICK by Hon. William Alsup denying 30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULES ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND, Motions terminated: 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Notice of Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, 18 MOTION to Remand BRIEFING SCHEDULES filed by Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC ., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Notice of Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' C omplaint and Notice of Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, 18 MOTION to Remand BRIEFING SCHEDULES, 18 MOTION to Remand . Responses due by 4/28/2017. Replies due by 5/12/2017. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/12/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO STAY BRIEFING ON MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup denying 19 Motion to Stay.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sangimino et al v. Bayer Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ann Sangimino
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ananhi Gonzalez
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Scheifen
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paige Tucker
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Byreley
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Gutherie
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarquenia Brown
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tekesha Sant-Val
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kisha Vinson
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Daniels
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solmarie Montes-Arroyo
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Stiffler
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Turner
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiri Horne
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Sue Lory
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chenoa Fore
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassie Lynn Downes
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Mendoza
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Minor
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Davidson
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasha Oglesby
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Powles-Dies
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Ragan
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Kirksley
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akasha Terrier
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krisila Baker
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minerva Blackmon
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A'randa Gary
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Johnson
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telleia Little
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Max
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuteah McJunkins
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Sipe
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Waters
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hetty Mae Kodges
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Miller-McKnight
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristain Halfacre
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Jane Drew
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Campos
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Holmes
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Muldoon
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staci Sessions
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Jo Patschke
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Palmer
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esselene Lowe
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Berry
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Stevens
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Cox
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Purvis
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katty Gonzalez
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candise Braley-Davis
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Corbin
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carmen C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazen Chandler
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Elizabeth Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nisha Thomas
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Elizabeth Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Miller
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Elizabeth Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Anderson-Lewis
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Jonathan A. Hogins
Represented By: Willard J. Moody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Carter
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Jonathan A. Hogins
Represented By: Willard J. Moody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lina Jones
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Jonathan A. Hogins
Represented By: Willard J. Moody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abegail Tongol
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Jonathan A. Hogins
Represented By: Willard J. Moody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Bradley Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare LLC
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Bradley Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Essure Inc.
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Bradley Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Bradley Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?