Frost v. Wilkinson

Plaintiff: Vinton P. Frost
Defendant: Monty Wilkinson
Case Number: 3:2017cv01587
Filed: March 23, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Because the plaintiff has not amended his complaint by the deadline, the court dismisses this case. This dismissal is without leave to amend. With respect to Mr. Wilkinson, the plaintiff's FOIA claim is dismissed with p rejudice. The dismissal is otherwise without prejudice. Which is to say, apart from Mr. Wilkinson's status as an improper party, the court does not finally dispose of the plaintiff's FOIA claims on the merits. The clerk of court will close this file. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/3/2017. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
July 5, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 12 Motion to Dismiss; granting 36 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 39 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. The court dismisses the complaint without prejudice. The plaintiff may file an amended com plaint, if he chooses, to add a proper defendant and to plausibly allege that his FOIA claim is not moot and is otherwise viable. Any amended complaint must be filed within 28 days of this order: that is, by August 2, 2017. The plaintiff's subsequent motion (ECF No. 39) is denied as moot. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
June 12, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for 35 Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (notewarelS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frost v. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinton P. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monty Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?