Aboudara v. City of Santa Rosa

Plaintiff: Timothy Aboudara, Jr.
Defendant: City of Santa Rosa
Case Number: 3:2017cv01661
Filed: March 27, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 40 Stipulated Scheduling Order. Amended Pleadings due by 8/28/2017; Designation of Experts due by 1/22/2018; Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 2/19/2018; Close of Expert Discoverydue by 3 /19/2018; Close of Fact Discovery due by 1/12/2018; Dispositive Motion due by 5/3/2018; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2018 03:00 PM; Jury Selection / Jury Trial set for 9/10/2018 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
July 31, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 32 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Initial Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
July 10, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 27 Stipulation TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
June 22, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 21 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 9, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File either a Stipulation to ADR Process or Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aboudara v. City of Santa Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Aboudara, Jr.
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Ace Thomas Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?