Board of Retirement of the Imperial County Employees' Retirement System v. Franklin Templeton Investor Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Board of Retirement of the Imperial County Employees' Retirement System
Defendant: Franklin Templeton Investor Services, LLC, Franklin/Templeton Distributors, Inc. and Templeton Institutional Funds, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv01784
Filed: March 31, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Second Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Date to Re-File Motion to Dismiss in Order to Finalize Pending Settlement filed by Franklin/Templeton Distributors, Inc., Templeton Institutional Funds, Inc., Franklin Templeton Investor Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 8, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
April 25, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Date to Re-File Motion to Dismiss filed by Board of Retirement of the Imperial County Employees' Retirement System. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 25, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 18, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Dates for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Board of Retirement of the Imperial County Employees' Retirement System. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 18, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Retirement of the Imperial County Employees' Retirement System v. Franklin Templeton Investor Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Retirement of the Imperial County Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Raymond Francis Lynch
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Templeton Investor Services, LLC
Represented By: Amy V. Endicott
Represented By: Alison Epstein
Represented By: Gilbert Ross Serota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin/Templeton Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: Amy V. Endicott
Represented By: Alison Epstein
Represented By: Gilbert Ross Serota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Templeton Institutional Funds, Inc.
Represented By: Amy V. Endicott
Represented By: Alison Epstein
Represented By: Gilbert Ross Serota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?