Astrid Angolini v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Astrid Angolini
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2017cv01793
Filed: March 31, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 30 Stipulation for Dismissal of Action with Prejudice [FRCP 41(a)(1)]. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
July 19, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 22 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
June 21, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 18 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
June 9, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 15 Request to Appear at Case Management Conference by Telephone (July 11, 2017). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Astrid Angolini v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Astrid Angolini
Represented By: Paul Randall Noah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?