AbbVie Inc. v. Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: AbbVie Inc.
Defendant: Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. and Grifols Worldwide Operations Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2017cv01815
Filed: March 31, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - REDACTED/PUBLIC Version of Docket No. 73 - Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/31/2017. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
June 8, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND MOTION HEARING filed by Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND MOTION HEARING, 48 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and To Stay . Responses due by 7/7/2017. Replies due by 7/21/2017. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 11/16/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/8/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 6, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. Case stayed. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/6/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AbbVie Inc. v. Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AbbVie Inc.
Represented By: David P. Frazier
Represented By: Elissa Nicole Knoff
Represented By: Michael A. Morin
Represented By: Gregory K. Sobolski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc.
Represented By: Jason R. Bartlett
Represented By: Katherine Nicole Clouse
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Represented By: Sherman W. Kahn
Represented By: Michael Vincent O'Shaughnessy
Represented By: Marc J. Pernick
Represented By: Thomas P. Steindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grifols Worldwide Operations Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?