AbbVie Inc. v. Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
AbbVie Inc. |
Defendant: |
Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. and Grifols Worldwide Operations Ltd. |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv01815 |
Filed: |
March 31, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Francisco Office |
County: |
Lake |
Presiding Judge: |
Edward M. Chen |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
35 U.S.C. § 145 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 21, 2018 |
Filing
81
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 80 to Postpone Case Management Conference Pending Resolution of Arbitration filed by AbbVie Inc. Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2018. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/13/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/21/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
|
January 26, 2018 |
Filing
79
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 78 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 76 Clerk's Notice, Postpone Case Management Conference Pending Resolution of Arbitration filed by AbbVie Inc. Case Management Statement due by 3/22/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor.Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
|
August 31, 2017 |
Filing
75
ORDER - REDACTED/PUBLIC Version of Docket No. 73 - Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/31/2017. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
|
June 8, 2017 |
Filing
56
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND MOTION HEARING filed by Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND MOTION HEARING, 48 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and To Stay . Responses due by 7/7/2017. Replies due by 7/21/2017. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 11/16/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/8/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
|
June 6, 2017 |
Filing
53
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. Case stayed. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/6/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?