Baird v. BlackRock Institutional Trust Company, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Charles Baird
Defendant: BlackRock Institutional Trust Company, N.A., Blackrock, Inc., The BlackRock, Inc. Retirement Committee, Jason Herman, The Administrative Committee of the Retirement Committee and The Investment Committee of the Retirement Committee
Case Number: 3:2017cv01892
Filed: April 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ON 385 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, 396 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND 387 MOTION TO EXCLUDE. (This order also grants 378 , 384 , 386 , 411 , 414 , 418 , 421 , 431 , and 433 ). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 440 Stipulation FOR TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for 1/5/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ORDER ON ADMINISTRATIVE 364 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 402 Stipulation Re 378 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE 376 MOTION TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF INDIVIDUAL AND CORPORATE DEFENDANTS THAT EXTENDS THE PAGE LIMIT FOR A SINGLE MOTION BY FIVE PAGES. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 374 Stipulation TO MODIFY THE CASE SCHEDULE. Close of Expert Discovery due by 8/7/2020; Motions due by 9/24/2020; Responses due by 10/29/2020; Replies due by 11/19/2020; Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2021 03:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Jury Selection / Jury Trial (7 days) set for 3/1/2021 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 362 Unopposed MOTION to Change Time for Case Management. Conference Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2020 and Further Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER RE 360 SEALING OF ORDER ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, MOTION TO STRIKE, DAUBERT MOTION, AND MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/11/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 358 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sarah D. Holz. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ON DEFENDANTS 355 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM A NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND 354 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 351 BlackRock's Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Time to File Answer to Second Amended Complaint.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Regarding 262 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 348 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decision. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER RE SEALING OF 340 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO STAY. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. (This order grants docket nos. 177 , 178 , 180 , 210 , 211 , 224 , 225 and 283 and grants in part and denies in part docket no. 181 ). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER (Redacted) by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Regarding 268 269 Joint Discovery Letters. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Regarding 238 240 Joint Discovery Letters.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Regrding 241 Joint Discovery Letter. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 250 Stipulation to Modify the Case Schedule: Close of Fact Discovery due by 3/6/2019; Opening Reports due by 3/27/2019; Rebuttal Reports due by 4/24/2019; Close of Expert Discovery due by 5/8/2019; Motions due by 6/3/2019; Responses due by 7/3/2019; Replies due by 7/25/2019; and Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 243 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lempert, Scott. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 236 Stipulation to Modify the Case Schedule: Close of Fact Discovery due by 2/19/2019; Opening Reports due by 3/15/2019; Rebuttal Reports due by 4/16/2019; Close of Expert Discovery due by 4/30/2019; Motions due by 5/21/2019; Responses due by 6/20/2019; Replies due by 7/11/2019; Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Regarding 209 Joint Discovery Letter. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 1/28/2019. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/23/2019. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 219 Stipulation Regarding Authenticity Of Documents. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 214 Motion for Extension of Time to File to Change Time to File Declarations in Support of 210 and 211 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 207 Stipulation Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 203 Stipulation to File Consolidated Response to Requests for Judicial Notice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting Corrected 202 Stipulation to Modify Case Schedule. Close of Fact Discovery due by 2/4/2019; Designation of Experts due by 2/28/2019; Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 4/1/2019; Close o f Expert Discovery due by 4/16/2019; Motions due by 5/13/2019; Responses due by 6/10/2019; Replies due by 6/28/2019; Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 194 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motions to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 193 Motion for Leave to File a Consolidated Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 174 Stipulation to Modify the Briefing Schedule for Motions to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint: Motions due by 10/22/2018, Responses due by 12/21/2018 and Replies due by 1/18/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE. Close of Fact Discovery due by 12/21/2018; Opening Reports due by 1/14/2019; Rebuttal Reports due by 1/29/2019; Close of Expert Discovery due by 2/28/2019; Motions due by 3/28/2019; Responses due by 4/26/2 019; Replies due by 5/14/2019; Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. ( 161 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify the Case Schedule- Terminated). Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/11/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 168 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Russell, Matthew. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 164 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brian Ortelere.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS [133-3] MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. **REDACTED VERSION FOR PUBLIC FILING** Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2018. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/23/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 142 Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule on 133 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018) Modified on 8/6/2018 (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 137 Stipulation to Enlarge Date to File a Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Regarding 114 115 116 117 119 Joint Discovery Letters. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 131 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Requiring Supplemental Documents. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/29/2018. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFFS 107 MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 105 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 102 Stipulation to Modify Case Schedule. Amended Pleadings due by 4/23/2018; Close of Fact Discovery due by 6/22/2018; Designation of Experts due by 7/6/2018; Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 8/5/2018; Motions due by 9/14/2018; Replies due by 10/30/2018; Responses due by 10/15/2018; Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 88 Stipulation re 85 MOTION Relief Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 81 Stipulation re 80 Request for Judicial Notice. Responses due by 12/8/2017; Replies due by 12/22/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 77 Stipulation re Docket No. 75 . Motions due by 11/8/2107; Responses due by 12/8/2017; Replies due by 12/22/2017; Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 66 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Selesnick, Julie. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 41 Stipulation Selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 54 Stipulation Case Management Stipulation. Amended Pleadings due by 1/28/2018; Close of Fact Discovery due by 3/9/2018; Designation of Experts due by 4/6/2018; Designation of Rebuttal Ex perts due by 5/7/2018; Close of Expert Discovery due by 6/8/2018; Motions due by 6/21/2018; Replies due by 8/2/2018; Responses due by 7/19/2018; Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2018 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Bortscheller, Mary. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 45 Stipulation to reschedule hearing on Defendants' motion to dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 37 Stipulation TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS SHIRLEY HILLMAN, HEATHER F. RINGWALD TO FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADING. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 27 Stipulation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Meaghan McLaine VerGow. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baird v. BlackRock Institutional Trust Company, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Baird
Represented By: Karen L Handorf
Represented By: Julia Horwitz
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Nina Rachel Wasow
Represented By: Michelle C. Yau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlackRock Institutional Trust Company, N.A.
Represented By: Brian David Boyle
Represented By: Randall W. Edwards
Represented By: Adam Manes Kaplan
Represented By: Meaghan McLaine VerGow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackrock, Inc.
Represented By: Brian David Boyle
Represented By: Randall W. Edwards
Represented By: Adam Manes Kaplan
Represented By: Meaghan McLaine VerGow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The BlackRock, Inc. Retirement Committee
Represented By: Brian David Boyle
Represented By: Randall W. Edwards
Represented By: Adam Manes Kaplan
Represented By: Meaghan McLaine VerGow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Herman
Represented By: Brian David Boyle
Represented By: Randall W. Edwards
Represented By: Adam Manes Kaplan
Represented By: Meaghan McLaine VerGow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Administrative Committee of the Retirement Committee
Represented By: Brian David Boyle
Represented By: Randall W. Edwards
Represented By: Adam Manes Kaplan
Represented By: Meaghan McLaine VerGow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Investment Committee of the Retirement Committee
Represented By: Brian David Boyle
Represented By: Randall W. Edwards
Represented By: Adam Manes Kaplan
Represented By: Meaghan McLaine VerGow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?