Austin v. Kiewit Infrastructure West Co. et al
Plaintiff: Lindsey L. Austin
Defendant: Kiewit Infrastructure West Co. and Cherne Contracting Corporation
Case Number: 3:2017cv01920
Filed: April 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 24, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF GWENDYLON DAVIS AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF DECEASED PLAINTIFF LINDSEY L. AUSTIN filed by Lindsey L. Austin. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 25, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2018)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Combine Conference and Hearing Dates To A Single Hearing on March 21, 2018 filed by Kiewit Infrastructure West Co. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 15, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Lindsey L. Austin. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 10, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Request to Permit Telephonic Appearance at January 11 Hearing on the Court's Order to Show Cause filed by Cherne Contracting Corporation, Kiewit Infrastructure West Co. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 5, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin v. Kiewit Infrastructure West Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey L. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiewit Infrastructure West Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherne Contracting Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?