Ereikat v. American Express Centurion Bank et al

Plaintiff: Mohammed Ereikat
Defendant: American Express Centurion Bank, Equifax Information Services, LLC and TransUnion, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv02000
Filed: April 10, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 45 of Dismissal with Prejudice Between Plaintiff and Defendant Trans Union, LLC ONLY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/20/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
July 20, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/28/2017 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 9/21/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/20/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
June 26, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 28 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/26/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ereikat v. American Express Centurion Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Ereikat
Represented By: Sara Fatehmeh Khosroabadi
Represented By: Farmon Javad Rahimi
Represented By: Joshua B. Swigart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Centurion Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?