POP MIDDLE EAST, INC., a foreign corporation v. POPSUGAR INC., a Delaware corporation et al

Plaintiff: Pop Middle East, Inc
Defendant: Popsugar Inc and Ebates Inc
Case Number: 3:2017cv02015
Filed: April 11, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR FURTHER INFORMATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss filed by Pop Middle East, Inc. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/28/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
May 18, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY EDWARD KLARIS PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 17, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY EDWARD KLARIS by Hon. William Alsup denying 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POP MIDDLE EAST, INC., a foreign corporation v. POPSUGAR INC., a Delaware corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pop Middle East, Inc
Represented By: David M. Given
Represented By: Edward Klaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Popsugar Inc
Represented By: Benedict Y Hur
Represented By: Jay Rapaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebates Inc
Represented By: Thomas V. Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?