Fowler v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Vana Fowler
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2017cv02092
Filed: April 14, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Adam Hoipkemier. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
May 18, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Stipulation Re: Briefing and Hearing Schedule for 15 Motion to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 3, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to deVyver, K. Issac. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fowler v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Karla Lynn Johnson
Represented By: David S. Reidy
Represented By: K. Issac deVyver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vana Fowler
Represented By: Susan S. Brown
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?