Mario v. Swissport USA, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Fesaitu Mario
Defendant: Swissport USA, Inc. and Swissport Cargo Services L.P.
Case Number: 3:2017cv02099
Filed: April 14, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND MOTION TO COMPEL Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/15/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
August 3, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AS MODIFIED by Hon. William Alsup granting 34 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
June 5, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/5/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mario v. Swissport USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fesaitu Mario
Represented By: Marcus Joseph Bradley
Represented By: Taylor Lindsey Emerson
Represented By: Kiley Lynn Grombacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swissport USA, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Kepner Hamilton
Represented By: Kenneth Dawson Sulzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swissport Cargo Services L.P.
Represented By: Sarah Kepner Hamilton
Represented By: Kenneth Dawson Sulzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?