Michael Gonzales v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Michael Gonzales
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC and Raiser-CA
Case Number: 3:2017cv02264
Filed: April 24, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2018 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/21/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
May 2, 2018 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 52 Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
April 18, 2018 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part 38 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Second Amended Complaint due by 5/18/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Gonzales v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Leo Oot, Jr.
Represented By: John K. Sherk, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber USA, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Leo Oot, Jr.
Represented By: John K. Sherk, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raiser-CA
Represented By: Patrick Leo Oot, Jr.
Represented By: John K. Sherk, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gonzales
Represented By: Hannah Parke Belknap
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton, Jr.
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?