Blair v. Rent-A-Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Paula L. Blair, Andrea Robinson and Harris A. Falechia
Defendant: Rent-A-Center, Inc. and Rent-A-Center West, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv02335
Filed: April 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER GRANTING #223 STIPULATED REQUEST RE FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 223 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #219 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Final Distribution of Settlement filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Rabe)(Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 NOTICE of class action claim submission and LETTER from Ronnie Barnett. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MANDATE of USCA as to #84 Notice of Appeal, filed by Rent-A-Center, Inc., Rent-A-Center West, Inc. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/24/2020. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER RE #215 MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, EXPENSES, AND INCENTIVE AWARD by Judge Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Fairness Hearing and Motion Hearing held on 1/23/2020 re #215 MOTION for (1) Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and (2) Award of Attorneys' Fees, Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Enhancements. Settlement approved. Order to follow. (Total Time in Court: 19 minutes) Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorney: Zachariah Dostart, Michael Rubin. Defendant Attorney: Christina Sarchio. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/23/2020)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Supplemental Brief re #215 MOTION for (1) Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and (2) Award of Attorneys' Fees, Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Enhancements filed byPaula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Rabe Regarding Settlement Administration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #215 ) (Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Christina Guerola Sarchio (Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MOTION for (1) Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and (2) Award of Attorneys' Fees, Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Enhancements filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 11/29/2019. Replies due by 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Rubin, #2 Declaration of Zachariah P. Dostart, #3 Proposed Order and Judgment, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/10/19, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #209 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2020. (Related documents(s) #209 ) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER APPROVING REVISED CLASS NOTICES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/16/2019. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Proposed Order re #211 Notice (Other), Revised Class Notices by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 NOTICE by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson re #208 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Regarding Joint Submission of Revised Class Notices for the Court's Review (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/10/2019 before Judge William Alsup by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/10/2019 before Judge William Alsup by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER RE #204 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 10/10/2019. re #204 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Paula L. Blair, Andrea Robinson, Harris A. Falechia, Final Approval Hearing set for 1/23/2020 at 11:00 AM.Total Time in Court: 21 minutes. Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney: Michael Rubin, Zach Dostart, Andrew Kushner. Defendant Attorney: Christina Sarchio, Norma Garcia. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/11/2019)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 RESPONSE (re #204 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement ) Statement of Non-Opposition filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (McClellan, Nathan) (Filed on 9/19/2019) Modified on 9/20/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING: Motion Hearing re #204 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement previously set for 10/10/2019 08:00 AM is rescheduled to 10/10/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 9/19/2019. Replies due by 9/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zachariah P. Dostart, #2 Declaration of Michael Rubin, #3 Proposed Order)(Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER of USCA granting motion to extend the deadline for filing a petition for panel rehearing as to #84 Notice of Appeal, filed by Rent-A-Center, Inc., Rent-A-Center West, Inc. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson, Rent-A-Center, Inc. and Rent-A-Center West, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 7/10/2019) Modified on 7/11/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 NOTICE by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (Brown, Eric) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 USCA Opinion as to #84 Notice of Appeal, filed by Rent-A-Center, Inc., Rent-A-Center West, Inc. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER of USCA granting motion for leave to file a reply as to #190 USCA Case Number (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Christina Guerola Sarchio CORRECTION OF DOCKET #197 (Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 *** DISREGARD. SEE #198 *** MOTION to Substitute Attorney NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 6/13/2019) Modified on 6/13/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STATUS REPORT ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/12/2019. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER GRANTING #194 STIPULATED REQUEST TO STAY DISCOVERY DEADLINES by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #186 Order on Stipulation to Stay Discovery Deadlines filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson, Rent-A-Center West, Inc. and Rent-A-Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 4/15/2019) Modified on 4/15/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Settlement Conference held on 3/28/2019. Sealed FTR Time: 4:00-4:01. Attorney for Plaintiff: James Hannink, Zach Dostart, Eric Brown, Michael Rubin Attorney for Defendant: Christina Guerola Sarchio (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Filed Under Seal)(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/29/2019)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Settlement Conference held on 3/7/2019. Further settlement conference set for 3/28/19 at 11:00 AM.FTR Time: Not Reported. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Further Settlement Conference set for 3/28/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Vickie E. Turner (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Turner, Vickie) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Telephone Conference held on 2/26/2019.FTR: Not Reported Plaintiff Attorney: Zach Dostart (by phone). Defendant Attorney: Christina Sarchio (by phone). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Telephone Conference set for 2/26/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Chambers before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 USCA 9th Circuit Case Number 19-80024 (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/25/2019.Further Telephone Conference set for 2/26/19 at 2:00 PMFTR Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Zach Dostart, Michael Rubin (by phone). Defendant Attorney: Christina Sarchio, Lily North (by phone). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/28/2019 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER RE CASE SCHEDULE AND CLASS NOTICE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Telephone Conference set for 2/25/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Chambers before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Conference call information has been emailed to counsel.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #159 Order on Stipulation, Stipulation to Modify Case Management Order filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc., Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia and Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re: Stipulation to Modify Case Management Order)(North, Lily) (Filed on 2/22/2019) Modified on 2/25/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Telephone Conference held on 2/22/2019. Settlement Conference, previously set for 2/27/19 at 11:00 AM, is continued to 3/7/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. Defendant shall produce updated data by close of business on Monday, 2/25/19.FTR Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Zach Dostart (by phone). Defendant Attorney: Lily North (by phone). Attachment: Minute Order. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/22/2019)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Statement Proposal for Class Notification re #179 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Class Notice by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 2/21/2019) Modified on 2/21/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 STATUS REPORT Regarding Status of the Appeal by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson, Rent-A-Center West, Inc. and Rent-A-Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 2/20/2019) Modified on 2/21/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: TIME CHANGE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Settlement Conference, previously set for 2/27/19 at 9:30 AM, will now start at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER RE #153 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND #163 MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION by Judge Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference, previously set for 1/31/19 at 9:30 AM, has been re-set for 2/27/2019at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE of Change of Address by Vickie E. Turner (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Turner, Vickie) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 19, 2018, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Ana Dub, telephone number 415-290-1651; ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2019. (amdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 12/19/2018. re #153 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Rent-A-Center, Inc., Rent-A-Center West, Inc., #163 MOTION for Reconsideration re #155 Order on Motion to Certify Class, #161 Order on Motion for Leave to File filed by Paula L. Blair, Andrea Robinson, Harris A. Falechia Total Time in Court: 40 minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. Plaintiff Attorney: Michael Rubin; Eric Brown; Andrew Kushner. Defendant Attorney: Christina Sarchio; Norma Garcia. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/19/2018 before Judge William Alsup by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/19/2018 before Judge William Alsup by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE RE TODAY'S HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/19/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 REPLY (re #163 MOTION for Reconsideration re #155 Order on Motion to Certify Class, #161 Order on Motion for Leave to File ) filed byPaula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David M. Breshears, #2 Declaration of Zachariah Dostart, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 EXHIBITS re #168 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,, EXHIBIT Q TO SARCHIO DECLARATION [168-1] filed byRent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Related document(s) #168 ) (Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 EXHIBITS CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [168-18] filed byRent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #163 MOTION for Reconsideration re #155 Order on Motion to Certify Class, #161 Order on Motion for Leave to File ) filed byRent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina G. Sarchino, #2 Exhibit A to Sarchino Decl, #3 Exhibit B to Sarchino Decl, #4 Exhibit C to Sarchino Decl, #5 Exhibit D to Sarchino Decl, #6 Exhibit E to Sarchino Decl, #7 Exhibit F to Sarchino Decl, #8 Exhibit G to Sarchino Decl, #9 Exhibit H to Sarchino Decl, #10 Exhibit I to Sarchino Decl, #11 Exhibit J to Sarchino Decl, #12 Exhibit K to Sarchino Decl, #13 Exhibit L to Sarchino Decl, #14 Exhibit M to Sarchino Decl, #15 Exhibit N to Sarchino Decl, #16 Exhibit O to Sarchino Decl, #17 Exhibit P to Sarchino Decl, #18 Exhibit R to Sarchino Decl (see #169 ), #19 Exhibit S to Sarchino Decl, #20 Declaration of Sonya Kwon, #21 Exhibit A to Kwon Decl, #22 Declaration of Kevin Davis, #23 Exhibit A to Davis Decl, #24 Exhibit B to Davis Decl)(Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 12/3/2018) Modified on 12/4/2018 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 CLERK'S NOTICE: The time of Motion hearing re: #153 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #163 MOTION for Reconsideration re #155 Order on Motion to Certify Class, #161 Order on Motion for Leave to File is RESCHEDULED from 12:00 noon to 12/19/2018 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference reset for 1/31/2019 AT 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER GRANTING #164 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE DECEMBER 13, 2018 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION (AS MODIFIED) by Judge William Alsup. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2018 12:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #153 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #163 MOTION for Reconsideration re #155 Order on Motion to Certify Class, #161 Order on Motion for Leave to File filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #153 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2018 12:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MOTION for Reconsideration re #155 Order on Motion to Certify Class, #161 Order on Motion for Leave to File filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David M. Breshears in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration)(Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 REPLY BRIEF in Support (re #153 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina Sarchio In Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER GRANTING #160 REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND CONTINUING HEARING DATE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Order re Motion for Class Certification filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER GRANTING #157 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL DATES (AS MODIFIED) by Judge William Alsup. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Jury Selection set for 4/1/2019 07:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Jury Trial set for 4/1/2019 07:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #153 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byPaula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue the Class Notice Deadlines and the Pre-trial and Trial Dates filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 11/12/2018)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER RE PENDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Judge Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER RE #109 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER RE #118 #128 CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 11/13/2018. Replies due by 11/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Lily A. North, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference re-set for 12/5/2018 at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Telephonic Scheduling Conference to re-set Settlement Conference held on 10/2/2018. Settlement Conference set for 12/5/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor.FTR Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Zach Dostart, Michael Rubin, Eric Brown (by phone). Defendant Attorney: Christina Sarchino, Kirsten Gallagher, Norma Garcia (by phone). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/2/2018)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 CLERK'S NOTICE (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) The Court converts the 10/2/18 11:00 AM Settlement Conference to a Telephonic Scheduling Conference in San Francisco, Chambers before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. The clerk has emailed conference call information to counsel.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Discovery Letter Brief to The Honorable William Alsup filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (North, Lily) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson re #146 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit 13, #7 Exhibit 14, #8 Exhibit 15, #9 Exhibit 16, #10 Exhibit 17, #11 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel Dated September 11, 2018 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER DENYING #108 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER DENYING #142 EX PARTE MOTION TO MODIFY CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #142 Ex Parte Application re #92 Order on Stipulation, to Modify Amended Case Management Order ) filed byRent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kirsten F. Gallacher, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Kirsten F. Gallacher, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Kirsten F. Gallacher, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Kirsten F. Gallacher, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gallacher, Kirsten) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Proposed Order re #142 Ex Parte Application re #92 Order on Stipulation, to Modify Amended Case Management Order by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Ex Parte Application re #92 Order on Stipulation, to Modify Amended Case Management Order filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zachariah P. Dostart in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion to Modify Amended Case Management Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION leave to file declaration pursuant to Local Rule 7-11 for Leave to Submit a Post Hearing Declaration filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. Responses due by 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration Christina Sarchio, #3 Proposed Order)(Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 23, 2018, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #138 Transcript Order, #137 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2018. (Related documents(s) #138 , #137 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 8/23/2018. re #128 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Paula L. Blair, Andrea Robinson, Harris A. Falechia, #109 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Paula L. Blair, Andrea Robinson, Harris A. Falechia, #118 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Rent-A-Center, Inc., Rent-A-Center West, Inc. Total Time in Court: 1:27. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: Zachariah Dostart, Andrew Kushner, Michael Rubin. Defendant Attorney: Lily North, Christina Guerola Sarchio. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/23/2018 before Judge William Alsup by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 TRANSCRIPT ORDER before Judge William Alsup by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (North, Lily) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gallacher, Kirsten) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery Hearing set for 8/23/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearing re #134 Discovery Letter Brieffrom Plaintiffs' Counsel dated August 16, 2018, #135 Order. Discovery Hearing set for 8/23/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 15, 18th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE #134 PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/20/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Discovery Letter Brieffrom Plaintiffs' Counsel dated August 16, 2018 filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 REPLY (re #128 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byPaula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The Settlement Conference, previously set for 9/27/18 at 9:30 AM, has been re-set for 10/2/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d NOTICE OF RECENT DECISION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byRent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #129 ) (Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Declaration of Lily A. North in Support of #129 Opposition/Response to Motion, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [129-1] filed byRent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Related document(s) #129 ) (Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #128 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ) and Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byRent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Lily A North, #2 Exhibit 38, #3 Exhibit 39, #4 Exhibit 40, #5 Declaration David J. Jacoby, #6 Exhibit A)(Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 8/2/2018. Replies due by 8/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zachariah P. Dostart, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 REPLY (re #109 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byPaula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David M. Breshears, #2 Declaration of Eric P. Brown)(Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Edward Kushner (Kushner, Andrew) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 6/26/2018. The Court ruled that, by today, defendants shall disclose to plaintiffs the total amount of compensation received by the witness. By July 10, defendants shall turn over the disputed time records and invoices.Total Time: 25 minutes. Plaintiff Attorney: Zach Dostart. Defendant Attorney: Christina Sarchio. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/26/2018)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER GRANTING #123 STIPULATED REQUEST RE BRIEFING SCHEDULES AND HEARING DATES FOR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William Alsup. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Briefing Schedules and Hearing Dates for Motion for Class Certification and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING RE: #109 MOTION to Certify Class . Motion Hearing reset for 7/26/2018 at 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING #118 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing reset for 7/26/2018 at 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Briefing remains as is. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 DECLARATION of Lily North in Opposition to #109 MOTION to Certify Class filed byRent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Declaration of Sonya Kwon, #39 Exhibit A to Kwon Declaration, #40 Declaration of David Jacoby, #41 Exhibit A of Jacoby Declaration, #42 Declaration of Kevin Davis, #43 Exhibit A of Davis Declaration, #44 Exhibit B of Davis Declaration, #45 Declaration of Michael Cross, #46 Exhibit A of Cross Declaration, #47 Exhibit B of Cross Declaration)(Related document(s) #109 ) (Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #109 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byRent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 6/28/2018. Replies due by 7/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration North Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Declaration Cross Declaration, #40 Exhibit A, #41 Exhibit B, #42 Proposed Order)(Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Order, signed 6/13/18, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #116 Stipulation to Continue Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference, previously set for 6/25/18 at 9:30 AM, has been re-set for 9/27/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Settlement Conference filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge William Alsup granting #114 Stipulation. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Schedule for Motion for Class Certification filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DENYING #93 MOTION TO STAY PENDING APPEAL by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/10/18, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #107 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (Related documents(s) #107 ) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 EXHIBITS re #108 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Proof of Service of Unredacted Exhibits 8-17) filed byPaula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Related document(s) #108 ) (Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Proposed Order re #108 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 5/31/2018. Replies due by 6/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Rubin, #2 Declaration of Zachariah P. Dostart, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Declaration of David M. Breshears, #21 Exhibit A, #22 Declaration of Paula M. Blair, #23 Exhibit 1, #24 Exhibit 2, #25 Exhibit 3, #26 Exhibit 4, #27 Exhibit 5, #28 Exhibit 6, #29 Declaration of Andrea Robinson, #30 Exhibit 1, #31 Declaration of Falechia A. Harris, #32 Exhibit 1, #33 Declaration of Celinda Garza, #34 Exhibit 1, #35 Exhibit 2, #36 Exhibit 3, #37 Exhibit 4, #38 Proposed Order, #39 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zachariah P. Dostart in Support of Administrative Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, #23 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/10/2018 before Judge William Alsup by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (North, Lily) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 5/10/2018 re #93 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Rent-A-Center, Inc., Rent-A-Center West, Inc. Motion taken under submission.Total Time in Court: 27 Minutes. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney: Michael Rubin. Defendant Attorneys: Lily North, H. Joseph Escher III.Defendant Client Representative: Norma Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/10/2018)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/2/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER REGARDING NUMEROSITY AND REVIEW OF RENTAL PURCHASE AND ARBITRATION AGREEMENTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/26/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson NOTICE OF FILING OF PROPOSED ORDER PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S ORDER DATED APRIL 23, 2018 [Dkt. 99] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Eric) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-23-18, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Wyatt, telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #101 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (Related documents(s) #101 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/23/2018 before Judge William Alsup by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (North, Lily) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/23/2018 before Judge William Alsup by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson, for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Discovery Hearing held on 4/23/2018. The parties have reached an agreement as stated on the record. The parties shall submit a proposed order outlining same. Total Time in Court: 10 Minutes. Court Reporter: Kathy Wyatt. Plaintiff Attorneys: Zach Dostart, Eric Brown. Defendant Attorneys: Lily North, H. Joseph Escher III. Also Present: Norma Garcia, Rent-a-Center (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2018) Modified on 4/23/2018 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Letter from Lily A. North In Response to Plaintiffs' April 16, 2018 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(North, Lily) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re #96 Letter filed by Paula L. Blair, Andrea Robinson, Harris A. Falechia]. Response due by NOON on 4/19/2018. Two-hour meet-and-confer from 9:00AM--11:00AM 4/23/2018 in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 4/23/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/17/2018. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Letter from Plaintiffs Requesting Discovery Relief . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #93 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal ) filed byPaula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hannink, James) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #93 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal. Motion Hearing reset for 5/10/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Briefing remains as is. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Renotice motion hearing re #93 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed byRent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Related document(s) #93 ) (Friedman, Robert) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 4/16/2018. Replies due by 4/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Robert) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting in part and denying in part #91 Stipulation. Close of Fact Discovery due by 9/11/2018. Designation of Experts due by 9/11/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Jury Trial set for 1/14/2019 07:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Scheduling Deadlines by 45 Days filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint (Brown, Eric) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/28/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Escher, H.) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Transcript Designation Form before Judge WHA, re #84 Notice of Appeal, #86 USCA Case Number 17-17221 Transcript due by 11/29/2017. (Escher, H.) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearing Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-28-2017, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #58 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2018. (Related documents(s) #58 ) (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 USCA Case Number 17-17221 USCA 9th Circuit for #84 Notice of Appeal, filed by Rent-A-Center, Inc., Rent-A-Center West, Inc.. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. Appeal of Order on Motion to Compel #62 , Order #82 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11836384 paid.) (USCA # 17-17221 ) (Escher, H.) (Filed on 10/30/2017) Modified on 11/3/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER REGARDING CLASS CLAIMS by Judge Alsup re #70 Motion for Leave to File. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 AMENDED ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS ACTION CLAIMS, AND STAY PROCEEDINGS, VACATING #62 Order on Motion to Compel Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/25/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY CHRISTINA SARCHIO FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #69 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE AS MODIFIED re #79 Notice (Other), filed by Paula L. Blair, Andrea Robinson, Harris A. Falechia Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/23/2017. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson re 73 Discovery Hearing,,, of Filing of Proposed Order Pursuant to the Court's Order Dated October 17, 2017 [Dkt. No. 73] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Discovery Dispute)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #70 First MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Order Re Motion to Compel Arbitration, Strike Class Action Claims, and Stay Proceedings ) filed byRent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Friedman, Robert) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 17, 2017, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #74 Transcript Order, #75 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2018. (Related documents(s) #74 , #75 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byRent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Turner, Vickie) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/17/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/17/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Discovery Hearing held on 10/17/2017. The parties did meet and confer regarding the discovery issues. Norma Garcia was called as a witness by the court and sworn for testimony. An agreed-upon proposed order is to be submitted electronically to the court no later than Friday, October 20, 2017, at noon.Total Time in Court: 20 Minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorneys: Zach Dostart, Eric Brown. Defendant Attorneys: Robert Dixon, H. Hoseph Escher III, Christina Sarchio, Lily North. Also Present: Norma Garcia, Associate General Counsel for Rent-A-Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/17/2017)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dixon, Robert) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION re #70 First MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Order Re Motion to Compel Arbitration, Strike Class Action Claims, and Stay Proceedings filed by Paula L. Blair. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/12/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 First MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Order Re Motion to Compel Arbitration, Strike Class Action Claims, and Stay Proceedings filed by Paula L. Blair. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hannink, James) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Christina G. Sarchio ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11787973.) filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re #64 Letter, filed by Paula L. Blair, Andrea Robinson, Harris A. Falechia]. Response due by NOON on 10/13/2017. Two-hour meet-and-confer set for 9:00AM--11:00AM on 10/17/2017 in the Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 10/17/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/10/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Notice of Settlement Conference Order Setting Settlement Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference set for 6/25/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/10/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Telephonic Scheduling Conference to set Settlement Conference held on 10/10/2017. Settlement conference set for 6/25/18 at 9:30 AM. At least one class representative must attend the settlement conference, in person. Other class representatives must be on telephone standby. Court to issue Order.FTR Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Zach Dostart. Defendant Attorney: Joe Escher, Christine Sarchio. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/10/2017) Modified on 10/10/2017 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Joseph Escher, III (Escher, H.) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel Dated October 9, 2017 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 10/9/2017)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/28/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Gallacher, Kirsten) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS ACTION CLAIMS, AND STAY PROCEEDINGS by Judge William Alsup granting in part and denying in part #22 Motion to Compel.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). Telephonic Scheduling Conference to set Settlement Conference set for 10/10/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 9/28/2017 re: #22 Motion to Partially Compel Arbitration; Further Case Management Conference held on 9/28/2017. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 12/3/2018 at 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Case Referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for settlement conference. Total Time in Court: 26 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Plaintiff's Attorneys: Michael Rubin, Zach Dostart. Defendant's Attorneys: Robert Friedman, Vickie Turner. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Mediation/Settlement. Motion for class certification must be filed by 3/29/2018, to be heard on a 49-day track. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 12/3/2018 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Amended Pleadings due by 12/29/2017. Discovery due by 7/31/2018. Expert Witness List due by 7/31/2018. Motions due by 9/6/2018. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/28/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/28/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Compel [Defendants' Notice of Motion And Motion To Partially Compel Arbitration, Strike Class Action Claims, And Stay Proceedings]. Motion Hearing reset to 9/28/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE by Hon. William Alsup granting #56 Stipulation. Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #22 MOTION to Compel [Defendants' Notice of Motion And Motion To Partially Compel Arbitration, Strike Class Action Claims, And Stay Proceedings] filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dixon, Robert) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE AND ORDER RE FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/6/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc. re #53 Order re Motion to Compel Arbitration (Friedman, Robert) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/28/2017. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re #51 Proposed Order filed by Paula L. Blair, Andrea Robinson, Harris A. Falechia. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/4/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hannink, James) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting #49 Stipulation. Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #22 MOTION to Compel [Defendants' Notice of Motion And Motion To Partially Compel Arbitration, Strike Class Action Claims, And Stay Proceedings] and to Continue Case Management Conference to September 7, 2017 filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hannink, James) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order by Hon. William Alsup denying #46 Stipulation.(whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hannink, James) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #22 MOTION to Compel [Defendants' Notice of Motion And Motion To Partially Compel Arbitration, Strike Class Action Claims, And Stay Proceedings] and to Continue Case Management Conference to August 31, 2017 filed by Paula L. Blair, Harris A. Falechia, Andrea Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hannink, James) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Prince Brown (Brown, Eric) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Rubin (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byPaula L. Blair, Andrea Robinson, Harris A. Falechia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/7/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO TRANSFER, GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT, AND VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER re #40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Paula L. Blair Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/7/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Further Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #35 Reply to Opposition/Response, for (1) Filing of Second Amended Complaint and (2) Withdrawal of Defendants' Motion to Transfer and Vacatur of Hearing filed by Paula L. Blair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hannink, James) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RE PENDING MOTION TO TRANSFER [re #20 MOTION to Change Venue To Central District of California filed by Rent-A-Center, Inc., Rent-A-Center West, Inc.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/30/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO RESPOND TO OBJECTION by Hon. William Alsup granting #37 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Objection (Dkt. 36) filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Turner, Vickie) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OBJECTIONS to re #35 Reply to Opposition/Response, and Argument Pursuant to this Court's Supplemental Order and Civil L.R. 7-3(d) by Paula L. Blair. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPLY (re #20 MOTION to Change Venue To Central District of California ) and #21 Defendants Amended Notice Of Motion And Motion To Transfer Action To The Central District Of California filed byRent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dixon, Robert) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPLY (re #22 MOTION to Compel [Defendants' Notice of Motion And Motion To Partially Compel Arbitration, Strike Class Action Claims, And Stay Proceedings] ) filed byRent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ROBERT FRIEDMAN PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11491678.) Filing fee previously paid on 06/22/2017 filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Friedman, Robert) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY ROBERT FRIEDMAN by Hon. William Alsup denying #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11491678.) filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Friedman, Robert) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 MOTION to Compel [Defendants' Notice of Motion And Motion To Partially Compel Arbitration, Strike Class Action Claims, And Stay Proceedings] ) filed byPaula L. Blair. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #20 MOTION to Change Venue To Central District of California ) and (re #21 AMENDED MOTION to Change Venue to Central District of California) filed byPaula L. Blair. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William Alsup: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/15/2017. Motion to Transfer set for 7/13/2017 and Motion to Compel set for 8/17/2017 shall remain on calendar. Total Time in Court 15 minutes. Court Reporter Name Angela Pourtabib. Plaintiff Attorney Zach Dostart. Defendant Attorney Robert Dixon. This is a text-only Minute Entry (dl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/15/2017)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Paula L. Blair filed by Paula L. Blair. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hannink, James) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by Paula L. Blair. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hannink, James) (Filed on 6/8/2017) Modified on 6/9/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Entities by Paula L. Blair (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hannink, James) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hannink, James) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/5/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Change Venue To Central District of California. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Compel [Defendants' Notice of Motion And Motion To Partially Compel Arbitration, Strike Class Action Claims, And Stay Proceedings] filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 6/16/2017. Replies due by 6/23/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Marc Tuckey, #2 Proposed Order)(Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Renotice motion hearing re #20 MOTION to Change Venue To Central District of California filed byRent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Dixon, Robert) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Change Venue To Central District of California filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 6/16/2017. Replies due by 6/23/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dixon, Robert) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion To Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Turner, Vickie) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/22/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE by Paula L. Blair re #16 Amended Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byPaula L. Blair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc. re 14 Clerk's Notice, (Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Initial CMC on Reassignment. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss [Defendants' Notice of Motion And Motion To Dismiss, Compel Arbitration And To STriek Class Action Claims, Or In The Alternative, To Stay] filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 5/19/2017. Replies due by 5/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Marc Tuckey)(Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss [Defendants' Notice of Motion And Motion To Dismiss, Compel Arbitration And To Strike Class Action Claims, Or In The Alternative, To Stay], #13 MOTION to Dismiss [Defendants' Notice of Motion And Motion To Dismiss, Compel Arbitration And To STriek Class Action Claims, Or In The Alternative, To Stay]. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/4/17. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss [Defendants' Notice of Motion And Motion To Dismiss, Compel Arbitration And To Strike Class Action Claims, Or In The Alternative, To Stay] filed by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 5/16/2017. Replies due by 5/23/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Marc Tuckey)(Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc... (Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Vickie E. Turner (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Turner, Vickie) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc. [Supplemental Certificate of Service] (Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirsten F. Gallacher (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gallacher, Kirsten) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Kenneth Dixon (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dixon, Robert) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/10/2017. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2017. Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2017 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017) Modified on 4/27/2017 (rmm2S, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/27/2017 (rmm2S, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/27/2017 (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Rent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc. [Defendants Rent-A-Center, Inc.'s And Rent-A-Center West, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement And Certification of Interested Entities Or Persons Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 And Civil Local Rules 3-16] (Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [Defendants' Notice of Removal of Civil Action From State Court Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Sections 1332(d)(2)(CAFA)] from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is HG17852522. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-11342035). Filed byRent-A-Center West, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 4/25/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blair v. Rent-A-Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula L. Blair
Represented By: James T. Hannink
Represented By: Zachariah Paul Dostart
Represented By: Andrew Edward Kushner
Represented By: Eric Prince Brown
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Robinson
Represented By: Andrew Edward Kushner
Represented By: Eric Prince Brown
Represented By: James T. Hannink
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Represented By: Zachariah Paul Dostart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harris A. Falechia
Represented By: Andrew Edward Kushner
Represented By: Eric Prince Brown
Represented By: James T. Hannink
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Represented By: Zachariah Paul Dostart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rent-A-Center, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Stern
Represented By: Nathan M McClellan
Represented By: Christina Guerola Sarchio
Represented By: H. Joseph Escher, III
Represented By: Kirsten F. Gallacher
Represented By: Lily Anna North
Represented By: Robert Kenneth Dixon
Represented By: Robert Francois Friedman
Represented By: Vickie E. Turner
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rent-A-Center West, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Stern
Represented By: Nathan M McClellan
Represented By: Christina Guerola Sarchio
Represented By: H. Joseph Escher, III
Represented By: Kirsten F. Gallacher
Represented By: Lily Anna North
Represented By: Robert Kenneth Dixon
Represented By: Robert Francois Friedman
Represented By: Vickie E. Turner
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?