Raig Chaquico v. David Freiberg et al

Plaintiff: Craig Chaquico
Defendant: David Freiberg, Donny Baldwin, Chris Smith, Jude Gold and Catherine Richardson
Case Number: 3:2017cv02423
Filed: April 27, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 26 Motion for Leave to File. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
August 11, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss. Second amended complaint due 9/1/2017. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 8, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James finding as moot 16 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
August 4, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 16 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/4/2017. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raig Chaquico v. David Freiberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Chaquico
Represented By: Gregory Steven Gabriel
Represented By: David Wesley Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Freiberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donny Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jude Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?