Hakimi v. Passport Capital LLC et al
Plaintiff: Todd Hakimi
Defendant: Passport Capital LLC, Passport Holdings LLC, Passport Special Opportunities Master Fund LP, John H. Burbank, III and Hortonworks, Inc
Case Number: 3:2017cv02448
Filed: April 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 30 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER VACATING REQUEST TO FILE NOTICE OF PUBLICATION Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/26/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY GLEN OSTRAGER by Hon. William Alsup denying 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/18/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hakimi v. Passport Capital LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Hakimi
Represented By: Joshua S. Broitman
Represented By: Willem F. Jonckheer
Represented By: Glenn Ostrager
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Represented By: Paul D. Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Passport Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Passport Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Passport Special Opportunities Master Fund LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Burbank, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hortonworks, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?