Shen et al v. Albany Unified School District et al
Plaintiff: Nima Kormi, Kevin Chen, Michael Bales, Philip Shen, Paul Poe, Nick Noe and C. E.
Defendant: Albany High School, Suzanne Young, Jeff Anderson, Albany Unified School District, Melisa Pfohl and Valerie Williams
Amicus Curiae: Lawyers's Committee for Civil Rights Under Law and National Women's Law Center
Not Classified By Court: Rick Roe
Case Number: 3:2017cv02478
Filed: May 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER. Pending further order, the February 27, 2020 pretrial conference and all other remaining pretrial dates are vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/25/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 5, 2020 Filing 214 USCA Case Number 20-15147 9th Circuit for #213 Notice of Appeal, filed by Valerie Williams, Jeff Anderson. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
February 4, 2020 Filing 213 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Jeff Anderson, Valerie Williams. Appeal of Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #211 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-14139724 paid.) (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 2/4/2020)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER. The Court sets a trial setting conference for February 27, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/29/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON QUALIFIED IMMUNITY AND STATE LAW CLAIM. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
August 19, 2019 Filing 210 NOTICE of Change of Address by Seth L. Gordon (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER. The Court grants for good cause defendants' unopposed motion to seal (Dkt. No. #180 ) the phone records of minor plaintiffs. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/29/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 208 REPLY (re #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Philip Shen's Remaining Claims, #200 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Jeff Anderson In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) ) filed byAlbany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER. The Court finds the motion for summary judgment, Dkt. No. #199 , to be suitable for submission on the papers. Civil L.R. 7-1(b). The hearing set for April 11, 2019, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/25/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 206 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Philip Shen's Remaining Claims ) filed byKevin Chen, C. E., Philip Shen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 205 Declaration of Melisa Pfohl in Support of #204 Declaration in Support,, #202 Declaration in Support, #203 Declaration in Support,, #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Philip Shen's Remaining Claims, #201 Declaration in Support, #200 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Jeff Anderson In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) filed byAlbany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. (Related document(s) #204 , #202 , #203 , #199 , #201 , #200 ) (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 204 Declaration of Valerie Williams in Support of #202 Declaration in Support, #203 Declaration in Support,, #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Philip Shen's Remaining Claims, #201 Declaration in Support, #200 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Jeff Anderson In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) filed byAlbany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. (Related document(s) #202 , #203 , #199 , #201 , #200 ) (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 203 Declaration of Scott Shevelson in Support of #202 Declaration in Support, #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Philip Shen's Remaining Claims, #201 Declaration in Support, #200 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Jeff Anderson In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) filed byAlbany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. (Related document(s) #202 , #199 , #201 , #200 ) (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 202 Declaration of Peter Parenti in Support of #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Philip Shen's Remaining Claims, #201 Declaration in Support, #200 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Jeff Anderson In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) filed byAlbany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. (Related document(s) #199 , #201 , #200 ) (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 201 Declaration of Seth L. Gordon in Support of #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Philip Shen's Remaining Claims, #200 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Jeff Anderson In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) filed byAlbany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. (Related document(s) #199 , #200 ) (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 200 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Jeff Anderson In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 3/18/2019. Replies due by 3/25/2019. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 199 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Philip Shen's Remaining Claims filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 3/18/2019. Replies due by 3/25/2019. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER. Defendants' request to dismiss the third, fourth, sixth, ninth, tenth, and eleventh through sixteenth claims with prejudice is granted. Dkt. Nos. #191 , #197 . Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/27/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 197 Proposed Order re #191 Order, Terminate Motions by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 196 Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint byAlbany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. (Leone, Louis) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER. Plaintiffs' request to extend the deadline for filing a second amended complaint, Dkt. No. 193, is denied. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 194 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #193 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend ) filed byAlbany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 193 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by Kevin Chen, C. E., Philip Shen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Alan Beck, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER. The administrative motion to file under seal (Dkt. No. #130 ) is granted because the documents sought to be filed under seal contain the names and other personal identifying information of minor plaintiffs. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/24/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018) Modified on 8/24/2018 (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS, Dkt. No. #128 . Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/24/2018. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER RE AT&T RECORDS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/30/2018. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 189 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/19/2018, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #188 Transcript Order, ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2018. (Related documents(s) #188 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 188 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on July 19, 2018 before Judge James Donato by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 24, 2018 Filing 187 Letter from Seth L. Gordon re AT&T Mobility Records. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order requiring AT&T Mobility to Produce Records)(Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 7/24/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 186 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Discovery Hearing held on 7/19/2018. Total Time in Court: 15 minutes. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/20/2018)
July 17, 2018 Filing 185 DECLARATION of John Shen filed byPhilip Shen. (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
July 10, 2018 Filing 184 NOTICE of Change of Address by Catherine Anne Beekman (Beekman, Catherine) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #176 Stipulation to Remove Guardian Ad Litem. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER. A hearing to discuss the discovery letters (Dkt. Nos. #178 , #179 ) is set for 7/19/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/9/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 5, 2018 Filing 181 EXHIBITS re #180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Correction of 180-1] Declaration of Seth L. Gordon filed byAlbany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Related document(s) #180 ) (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
July 5, 2018 Filing 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Attachments: # *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** (1) Declaration Declaration of Seth Gordon, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Motion to file under Seal)(Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 7/5/2018) Modified on 7/5/2018 (fff, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2018 Filing 179 Letter from Defendants . (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
June 29, 2018 Filing 178 Letter from Plaintiffs . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
June 7, 2018 Filing 177 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byAlbany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
May 30, 2018 Filing 176 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Removing John Shen As GAL filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
May 30, 2018 Filing 175 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing Claim filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 174 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re #160 Judgment, #162 Judgment, #161 Judgment by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. (Leone, Louis) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
April 30, 2018 Filing 173 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Telephone Conference held on 4/30/2018. Total Time in Court: 20 minutes. Court Reporter: None. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/30/2018)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER. During the call set for Monday, April 30, 2018, the Court will additionally address the discovery issues outlined at Dkt. No. #170 . Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/26/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 26, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 4/30/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Chambers before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 25, 2018 Filing 171 ERRATA re #170 Letter re [DISCOVERY DISPUTE] by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 25, 2018 Filing 170 Letter from Seth Gordon, Attorney for Defendants [DISCOVERY DISPUTE]. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER. The Court sets a telephone conference for 4/30/2018 at 2:00 PM to discuss the discovery dispute raised at #163 and #166 . The parties are directed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 by 4/27/2018 at 2:00 PM to schedule their appearances. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/23/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER re Dkt. No. 167 in 3:17-cv-02478-JD. In light of the parties' joint representations, the case management conference that was set for April 26, 2018 is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/19/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 13, 2018 Filing 167 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Leone, Louis) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
April 12, 2018 Filing 166 Letter from Katherine A. Alberts . (Alberts, Katherine) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 11, 2018 Filing 165 STIPULATION filed by Michael Bales, Nima Kormi, Nick Noe. (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER. Defendants are directed to file a response to plaintiffs' discovery letter at #163 by 4/12/2018. The response should not exceed three pages and should otherwise comply with the Court's Standing Order for Civil Discovery. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/5/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 163 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel RE: Ongoing Discovery Dispute. (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 162 F.R.C.P Rule 68 ACCEPTANCE OF OFFER AND JUDGMENT as to Nima Kormi, through his guardian ad litem, Ellie Kormi. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/29/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 161 F.R.C,P Rule 68 ACCEPTANCE OF OFFER AND JUDGMENT as to Nick Noe, through his guardians ad litem, Mother and Father. Signed by Judge JAMES DONATO on 3/29/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 160 F.R.C.P Rule 68 ACCEPTANCE OF OFFER AND JUDGMENT AS TO Michael Bales, through his guardian ad litem, Patricia Mingucci. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/29/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 28, 2018 Filing 159 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Telephone Conference held on 3/28/2018. Total Time in Court: 23 minutes. Court Reporter: None. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/28/2018)
March 27, 2018 Filing 158 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams Bales [Proposed] Judgment (Leone, Louis) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
March 27, 2018 Filing 157 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams Kormi [Proposed] Judgment (Leone, Louis) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
March 27, 2018 Filing 156 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams [Proposed] Judgment (Leone, Louis) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
March 24, 2018 Filing 155 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel . (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 3/24/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Anne Beekman (Beekman, Catherine) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 153 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel . (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 152 NOTICE by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young OF SETTLEMENT (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER. Plaintiffs are directed to file a response to AUSD's discovery dispute letter (Dkt. No. #150 ) by 3/21/2018. A telephone conference on the dispute is set for 3/26/2018 at 2:00 PM before Judge James Donato. The parties are directed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 by 3/23/2018 at 2:00 PM to schedule their appearances. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/16/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 150 Letter from Seth L Gordon, Attorney for Defendants . (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER. Initial case management conference set for 4/26/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case management statement due by 4/19/2018. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/6/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 2, 2018 Filing 148 REPLY (re #130 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING QUALIFIED IMMUNITY filed byAlbany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
March 1, 2018 Filing 147 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel . (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER re Motion to Dismiss at #128 . The Court finds this motion to be suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). The Court will issue a decision on the papers. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/22/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER. The parties' stipulated protective order at #143 is approved, except that in those cases where the stipulated protective order conflicts with the Court's standing orders (e.g., with respect to the filing of discovery motions), the Court's standing orders will control. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/22/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 16, 2018 Filing 144 Supplemental Brief re #129 Supplemental Brief, Opposition to Defendants' Supplemental Brief RE: Qualified Immunity filed byMichael Bales, Kevin Chen, C. E., Nima Kormi, Nick Noe, Philip Shen. (Related document(s) #129 ) (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 14, 2018 Filing 143 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [PROTECTIVE] FOR STANDARD LITIGATION filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 12, 2018 Filing 142 OBJECTIONS to re #141 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 10, 2018 Filing 141 NOTICE by Michael Bales, Kevin Chen, C. E., Nima Kormi, Nick Noe, Philip Shen re #134 Opposition/Response to Motion, Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Doe v Miami)(Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 2/10/2018)
February 8, 2018 Filing 140 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/30/2018, before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 1:47 p.m. - 1:49 p.m., 1:51 p.m. 2:00 p.m. = 11 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 2/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2018. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 139 REPLY (re #128 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Shen, Kormi, Bales, Chen, Nick Noe, and C.E. ) filed byAlbany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
January 31, 2018 Filing 138 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 30, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Leone, Louis) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 136 Minute Entry for Settlement Conference held on 1/30/2018 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Case settled. Settlement placed on the record and is confidential. The parties and their counsel shall have access to the transcript. FTR Time: 1:47 - 1:49 & 1:51 - 2:00 (SEALED) Plaintiff Attorney: Joseph Salama Defendant Attorney: Louis Leone (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/30/2018) Matter transcribed by Leo Manckiewicz. Modified on 1/31/2018 (notewarelS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2018 Filing 135 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/22/18, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (105 in 3:17-cv-02767-JD) Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 2/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2018. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 26, 2018 Filing 134 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #128 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Shen, Kormi, Bales, Chen, Nick Noe, and C.E. ) Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byMichael Bales, Kevin Chen, C. E., Nima Kormi, Nick Noe, Philip Shen. (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER RE HEARINGS ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. The Court will hear argument on the motion to dismiss in the Doe action at the same time as argument on the motion to dismiss in the Shen action. The Court will set a hearing date once briefing for both motions is complete. The Court vacates the hearings set for 2/1/2018 in the Doe action and 2/22/2018 in the Shen action. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/22/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER. Plaintiffs' motion to extend page limits at Dkt. No. #131 is denied. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/22/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 131 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Extend Page Limits for Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Michael Bales, Kevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Philip Shen, C. E., Nick Noe. Responses due by 1/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Alan Beck, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 130 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Seth Gordon in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Declaration of Jeff Anderson in Support of Defendants' Supplemental Brief [Redacted], #3 Declaration of Jeff Anderson in Support of Defendants' Supplemental Brief [Unredacted], #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal)(Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 129 Supplemental Brief Regarding Qualified Immunity in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's First AmendmentClaims filed byAlbany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeff Anderson in Support of Defendants' Supplemental Brief [Redacted])(Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 128 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Shen, Kormi, Bales, Chen, Nick Noe, and C.E. filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Rick Roe, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/26/2018. Replies due by 2/2/2018. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 10, 2018 Filing 127 NOTICE of Change of Address by Alan Alexander Beck (Beck, Alan) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER. The Motions to Appoint Guardians ad Litem filed by Nima Kormi #125 , Philip Shen #122 , Kevin Chen #124 , and Michael Bales #123 are granted. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/8/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
January 2, 2018 Filing 125 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by Nima Kormi. (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
January 2, 2018 Filing 124 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by Kevin Chen. (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
January 2, 2018 Filing 123 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by Michael Bales. (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
January 2, 2018 Filing 122 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by Philip Shen. (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER re #120 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to File Responsive Pleading. The request is granted. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/21/17. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 19, 2017 Filing 120 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #112 Amended Complaint EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 15, 2017 Filing 119 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/21/17, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (115 in 3:17-cv-02478-JD) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 1/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2018. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER. The Court accepts the parties' jointly proposed briefing schedule on qualified immunity at Dkt. No. #117 . (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 11, 2017 Filing 117 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON ISSUE OF QUALIFIED IMMUNITY filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson. (Leone, Louis) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 11, 2017 Filing 116 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/21/2017 before Judge James Donato by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 10, 2017 Filing 115 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/21/17 before Judge James Donato by Rick Roe, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Salama, Joseph) (Filed on 12/10/2017)
December 6, 2017 Filing 114 NOTICE and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference as to Plaintiff Paul Poe, who is represented by Joe Salama, in case 17-cv-02478-JD , is set for 1/30/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/6/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Filing 113 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DATE OF JANUARY 9, 2018 (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 5, 2017 Filing 112 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byKevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Michael Bales, Philip Shen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER re #45 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/29/17. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Order by Judge James Donato granting #60 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2017) Modified on 11/29/2017 to reflect text-only (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER re Summary Judgment Motions. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/29/17. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
November 28, 2017 Filing 108 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing on Motions to Dismiss held on 11/21/2017. Total Time in Court: 18 minutes. Court Reporter: Kathy Sullivan. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/28/2017)
October 31, 2017 Filing 107 Letter from Louis A. Leone . (Leone, Louis) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 31, 2017 Filing 106 Letter from remaining Plaintiffs' counsel re: Order After Hearing on MSJ. (Salama, Joseph) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 27, 2017 Filing 105 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Telephonic Further Settlement Conference held on 10/27/2017. Court vacates the 11/7/17 further settlement conference. Further Settlement Conference re-set for 1/9/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Updated confidential settlement conference statements due 1/2/18.FTR Time: Not Reported. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/27/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 104 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 10/27/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 10, 2017 Filing 103 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: TIME CHANGE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) The Settlement Conference, previously set for 11/7/17 at 9:30 AM has been re-set for 11/7/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER re (Dkt. No. 96 in 3:17-cv-2478-JD) Motion to Dismiss, (Dkt. No. 68 in 3:17-cv-02767-JD) Motion to Dismiss, and (Dkt. No. 28 in 3:17-cv-03657-JD) Motion to Dismiss. In the C.E. case (17-3657), plaintiff is directed to file an opposition brief that conforms to the Court's page limits by October 20, 2017. The hearing on these motions is continued from October 12, 2017 to November 21, 2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/6/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
September 27, 2017 Filing 101 REPLY (re #96 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by John Doe, Rick Roe, Paul Poe, and Nick Noe ) filed byAlbany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 18, 2017 Filing 100 REPLY (re #96 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by John Doe, Rick Roe, Paul Poe, and Nick Noe ) filed byAlbany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting (97) Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document in case 3:17-cv-02478-JD; granting (69) Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document in case 3:17-cv-02767-JD. The Court grants the request to remove Dkt. No. 68-1 in Case No. 17-cv-02767 and Dkt. No. 96-1 in Case No. 17-cv-2478. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
September 6, 2017 Filing 98 Request for Judicial Notice re #96 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by John Doe, Rick Roe, Paul Poe, and Nick Noe filed byAlbany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Related document(s) #96 ) (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
September 6, 2017 Filing 97 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Seth L. Gordon to Remove Incorrectly filed Document)(Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
September 6, 2017 Filing 96 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by John Doe, Rick Roe, Paul Poe, and Nick Noe filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 9/20/2017. Replies due by 9/27/2017. (Attachments: *** EXHIBIT FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** #1 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice)(Leone, Louis) (Filed on 9/6/2017) Modified on 9/6/2017 (fff, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/15/2017) (rcsS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 95 NOTICE OF FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference set for 11/7/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/1/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
August 23, 2017 Filing 94 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Settlement Conference held on 8/23/2017.Further settlement conference to be set by the Court.FTR Time Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney Darryl Yorkey, Joseph Salama, Catherine Beckman, Donald Driscoll, Adryane Omens. Defendant Attorney Katherine Alberts, Louis Leone. Attachment Minute Order.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/23/2017)
August 17, 2017 Filing 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Settlement Conference held on 8/16/2017. Further Settlement Conference set for 8/23/2017at 11:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco.FTR Time Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney Darryl Yorkey, Joseph Salama, Catherine Beekman, Donald Driscoll, Adryane Omens, Alan Beck. Defendant Attorney Katherine Alberts, Louis Leon. Attachment Minute Order.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/17/2017)
August 15, 2017 Filing 92 Statement Update Regarding Student Disciplinary Proceedings Against Plaintiff C.E. by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 91 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7-27-17 before Hon. James Donato by Michael Bales, Kevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Philip Shen, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 1, 2017 Filing 90 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/27/17, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (84 in 3:17-cv-02478-JD) Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 8/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/1/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2017. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
August 1, 2017 Filing 89 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/27/17 before Hon. James Donato by Rick Roe, Paul Poe, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Salama, Joseph) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
July 31, 2017 Filing 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 7/27/2017. Total Time in Court 51 Minutes. Court Reporter Name Kathy Sullivan. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/31/2017)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART re (85 in 3:17-cv-02478-JD) Letter filed by Valerie Williams, Jeff Anderson, Albany Unified School District, Melisa Pfohl to excuse attendees at the settlement conference. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/31/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
July 28, 2017 Filing 86 Letter from Joseph Salama in response to Mr. Leone's letter to Judge Spero re MSC. (Salama, Joseph) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 28, 2017 Filing 85 Letter from Louis A. Leone . (Leone, Louis) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 27, 2017 Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/27/2017 before Hon. James Donato by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
July 26, 2017 Filing 83 Letter from Louis A. Leone . (Leone, Louis) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order granting #81 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. The case management conference that was set for August 3, 2017, is vacated pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/24/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 19, 2017 Filing 81 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. (Leone, Louis) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting (70) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:17-cv-02478-JD. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER. The Court finds the #38 Motion to Dismiss and #45 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief to be suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), and will decide those motions on the papers. The hearing on plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is re-set for 7/27/2017 at 10:00 a.m. as previously discussed. The hearing that was set for 7/13/2017 is consequently VACATED in its entirety, and the #75 Motion to Continue Hearing Date for Amici Curiae's Motion is TERMINATED as moot. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/10/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
July 7, 2017 Filing 78 Letter from Joseph Salama Reporting Compliance with Court Order re Briefing Scheduling. (Salama, Joseph) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
July 6, 2017 Filing 77 Letter from Joseph Salama Requesting Court Rule on Administrative Motion in CV-02767 at docket nos 8, 21, 22, 23. (Salama, Joseph) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 76 Declaration of Barbara Harding in Support of #75 MOTION to Continue Amici Curiae Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law and the National Women's Law Center's Motion to Continue Hearing Date for Amici Curiae's Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief filed byLawyers's Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Women's Law Center. (Related document(s) #75 ) (Harding, Barbara) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 75 MOTION to Continue Amici Curiae Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law and the National Women's Law Center's Motion to Continue Hearing Date for Amici Curiae's Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief filed by Lawyers's Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Women's Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 74 REPLY (re #45 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief of the Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law and the National Women's Law Center ) filed byLawyers's Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Women's Law Center. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order by Hon. James Donato granting #62 Administrative Motion to Extend Time for defendants' cross-motion and opposition to plaintiff's summary judgment motion. The Court grants the requested retroactive extension in light of the unique circumstances here. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 29, 2017 Filing 72 REPLY (re #59 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Shen Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment ) Response to Defendants' Opposition to MSJ filed byMichael Bales, Kevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Philip Shen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Emails)(Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 27, 2017 Filing 71 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Telephone Conference held on 6/22/2017. Total Time in Court 19 minutes. Court Reporter Name Kathy Sullivan. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/27/2017)
June 26, 2017 Filing 70 MOTION to Relate Case Notice of Related Case and Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Michael Bales, Kevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Philip Shen. (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 26, 2017 Filing 69 ERRATA re #68 Opposition/Response to Motion, Proposed Order - Opposition to Admin Motion to Seal by Michael Bales, Kevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Philip Shen. (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 26, 2017 Filing 68 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #60 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re: Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Oppsition to Shen Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment ) Opposition to Admin Motion to Seal filed byMichael Bales, Kevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Philip Shen. (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 25, 2017 Filing 67 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #62 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION extend time re #59 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Shen Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, #60 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re: Defendants' Cross Motion f ) Statement of Nonopposition filed byMichael Bales, Kevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Philip Shen. (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 6/25/2017)
June 23, 2017 Filing 66 Declaration of Tami Benau in Support of #59 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Shen Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, #60 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re: Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Oppsition to Shen Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment CORRECTED REDACTED VERSION filed byAlbany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. (Related document(s) #59 , #60 ) (Alberts, Katherine) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 23, 2017 Filing 65 *** MAIN DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR .LOCK REQUESTED BY FILER . *** Declaration of Tami Benau in Support of #59 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Shen Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, #60 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re: Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Oppsition to Shen Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment CORRECTED REDACTED VERSION filed byAlbany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. (Related document(s) #59 , #60 ) (Alberts, Katherine) (Filed on 6/23/2017) Modified on 6/23/2017 (fff, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2017 Filing 64 *** DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Declaration of Tami Benau in Support of #59 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Shen Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment CORRECTED REDACTED VERSION filed byAlbany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. (Related document(s) #59 ) (Alberts, Katherine) (Filed on 6/23/2017) Modified on 6/23/2017 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2017 Filing 63 REPLY (re #38 MOTION to Dismiss (Redacted Version) ) filed byAlbany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 23, 2017 Filing 62 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION extend time re #59 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Shen Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, #60 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re: Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Oppsition to Shen Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, #61 Declaration in Support, filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. Responses due by 6/27/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Alberts, Katherine) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 23, 2017 Filing 61 Declaration of Melisa Pfohl in Support of #59 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Shen Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment - Redacted Version filed byAlbany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. (Related document(s) #59 ) (Alberts, Katherine) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 23, 2017 Filing 60 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re: Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Oppsition to Shen Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration, #7 Declaration, #8 Declaration, #9 Declaration, #10 Declaration, #11 Declaration, #12 Declaration, #13 Declaration, #14 Declaration, #15 Notice of Identities)(Alberts, Katherine) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 23, 2017 Filing 59 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Shen Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 7/7/2017. Replies due by 7/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration)(Alberts, Katherine) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 21, 2017 Filing 58 NOTICE by Michael Bales, Kevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Philip Shen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Matal v Tam)(Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 57 Letter from All plaintiffs' counsel reporting back on meet and confer about coordinating the cases. (Salama, Joseph) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re (52 in 3:17-cv-02478-JD) Status Report. The Court sets a telephonic status conference for Thursday, June 22, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. The parties are directed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to schedule their appearances. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/20/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #53 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Peter Canfield. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/19/17. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 19, 2017 Filing 53 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11481989.) filed by Lawyers's Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Women's Law Center. (Canfield, Peter) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 19, 2017 Filing 52 STATUS REPORT by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Leone, Louis) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 51 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #38 MOTION to Dismiss (Redacted Version) ) filed byMichael Bales, Kevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Philip Shen. (Attachments: #1 Errata Opposition and Objection to Request for Judicial Notice)(Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE by Michael Bales, Kevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Philip Shen (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 15, 2017 Filing 49 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference, previously set for 6/27/17 at 9:30 AM has been re-set for 8/16/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Donato granting #47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph H. Walsh. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 13, 2017 Filing 47 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11467542.) filed by Lawyers's Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Women's Law Center. (Walsh, Joseph) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Barbara Harding.. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
June 9, 2017 Filing 45 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief of the Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law and the National Women's Law Center filed by Lawyers's Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Women's Law Center. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 6/23/2017. Replies due by 6/30/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
June 9, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11460572.) filed by Lawyers's Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Women's Law Center. (Harding, Barbara) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
June 8, 2017 Filing 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Bales, Kevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Philip Shen. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 6/22/2017. Replies due by 6/29/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 8, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 6/27/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/8/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 7, 2017 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 6, 2017 Filing 41 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #37 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents and Facts in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss ) filed byMichael Bales, Kevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Philip Shen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. The Court refers both of these related cases to Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for a mandatory settlement conference to be held on June 27, 2017. Further instructions will be issued by Judge Spero. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/6/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. The Doe case, No. 17-cv-2767, was recently related to the Shen case, No. 17-cv-2478. The Court orders all lead counsel in both cases to meet and confer about how best to coordinate the two cases going forward, including a possible joinder by the Doe plaintiffs in the upcoming summary judgment proceedings in the Shen case. The parties are directed to submit a joint proposal to the Court by June 20, 2017. The Court is open to moving the currently set July 13, 2017 date if jointly requested by the parties. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/6/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 2, 2017 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss (Redacted Version) filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 6/16/2017. Replies due by 6/23/2017. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Request for Judicial Notice)(Alberts, Katherine) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 Filing 37 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents and Facts in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, #4 Unredacted Version of Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, #5 Redacted Version of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #6 Unredacted Version of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Alberts, Katherine) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 Filing 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING ADR filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Leone, Louis) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 Filing 35 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Howard Herman on June 1, 2017. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 1, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Bales, Kevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Philip Shen (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
June 1, 2017 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Bales, Kevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Philip Shen (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/26/2017. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #1 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Summary Judgment Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/26/2017. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 25, 2017 Filing 30 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference scheduled on July 27, 2017 at 10:30 AM Pacific time is ADVANCED to June 1, 2017 at 12:00 PM. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 25, 2017 Filing 29 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on July 27, 2017 at 10:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 25, 2017 Filing 28 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Alberts, Katherine) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 25, 2017 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #22 Telephone Conference Regarding Hearing Date for Motions for Summary Judgment as to First Amendment Claims filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Alberts, Katherine) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 25, 2017 Filing 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Leone, Louis) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 24, 2017 Filing 25 Letter from Louis A. Leone . (Leone, Louis) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
May 24, 2017 Filing 24 REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 24, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. The parties are advised that pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12(b), whenever a party knows or learns that an action, filed in or removed to this district is (or the party believes that the action may be) related to an action pending in this district, the party must promptly file in the earliest-filed case an administrative motion to consider whether cases should be related. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/24/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
May 23, 2017 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Telephone Conference held on 5/23/2017. Total Time: 23 minutes. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/23/2017)
May 22, 2017 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Hearing Dates and Briefing Schedules filed by Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Alberts, Katherine) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. The telephone conference that was set for May 19, 2017, is re-set for Tuesday, May 23, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. The parties are directed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 by the day before to schedule their appearances. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/18/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 18, 2017 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 18 Order,, Set Hearings, Requesting Rescheduling of May 19, 2017 Conference filed by Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (Alberts, Katherine) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. The Court sets a telephone conference for Friday, May 19, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. The parties are directed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 by the day before to schedule their appearances. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/17/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
May 16, 2017 Filing 17 Letter from Counsel . (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 10, 2017 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Albany High School, Albany Unified School District, Jeff Anderson, Melisa Pfohl, Valerie Williams, Suzanne Young. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
May 9, 2017 Filing 15 Proposed Summons. (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
May 8, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis A. Leone (Leone, Louis) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
May 8, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth L. Gordon (Gordon, Seth) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
May 8, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Alberts (Alberts, Katherine) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. After the complaint and summons are served, plaintiffs are directed to meet and confer with defendants on a proposed briefing schedule for the preliminary injunction motion. Dates should be set with an eye toward a hearing in mid to late July 2017, but plaintiffs may ask for an earlier date if warranted by the facts and circumstances. The proposed hearing date should be at least two weeks after the reply brief is filed. (Donato, James) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
May 3, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael Bales, Kevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Philip Shen. Responses due by 5/17/2017. Replies due by 5/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities for PI, #2 Affidavit Affidavits for PI, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order for PI)(Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
May 3, 2017 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Supplement List of Defendants's addresses)(Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
May 1, 2017 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 7/27/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2017 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
May 1, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Alexander Beck for all the plaintiffs (Beck, Alan) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
May 1, 2017 Filing 6 Case assigned to Hon. James Donato. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
May 1, 2017 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Bales, Kevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Philip Shen.. (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
May 1, 2017 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Bales, Kevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Philip Shen.. (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
May 1, 2017 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Bales, Kevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Philip Shen.. (Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
May 1, 2017 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants.Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-11356217.). Filed byKevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Michael Bales, Philip Shen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Coversheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Supplement Magistrate Consent)(Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 5/1/2017) Modified on 5/1/2017 (as, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2017 Filing 1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Michael Bales, Kevin Chen, Nima Kormi, Philip Shen. (Attachments: #1 Errata Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order TRO - Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit Affidavits)(Yorkey, Darryl) (Filed on 5/1/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shen et al v. Albany Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albany High School
Represented By: Katherine A. Alberts
Represented By: Louis A. Leone
Represented By: Seth L. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Young
Represented By: Katherine A. Alberts
Represented By: Louis A. Leone
Represented By: Seth L. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Anderson
Represented By: Katherine A. Alberts
Represented By: Louis A. Leone
Represented By: Seth L. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albany Unified School District
Represented By: Katherine A. Alberts
Represented By: Louis A. Leone
Represented By: Seth L. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melisa Pfohl
Represented By: Katherine A. Alberts
Represented By: Louis A. Leone
Represented By: Seth L. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Williams
Represented By: Katherine A. Alberts
Represented By: Louis A. Leone
Represented By: Seth L. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nima Kormi
Represented By: Darryl Dale Yorkey
Represented By: Alan Alexander Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Chen
Represented By: Darryl Dale Yorkey
Represented By: Alan Alexander Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bales
Represented By: Darryl Dale Yorkey
Represented By: Alan Alexander Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Shen
Represented By: Darryl Dale Yorkey
Represented By: Alan Alexander Beck
Represented By: Catherine Anne Beekman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Poe
Represented By: Joseph Salama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Noe
Represented By: Darryl Dale Yorkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. E.
Represented By: Darryl Dale Yorkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lawyers's Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Represented By: Joseph Walsh
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Barbara Harding
Represented By: David Craig Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Women's Law Center
Represented By: Joseph Walsh
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Barbara Harding
Represented By: David Craig Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Rick Roe
Represented By: Joseph Salama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?