Student A et al v. Berkeley Unified School District et al

Plaintiff: Student A, Student B, Student C and Student D
Defendant: Berkeley Unified School District, Donald Evans, Beatriz Leyva-Cutler, Ty Alper, Judy Appel, Josh Daniels, Karen Hemphill and Board of Education of the Berkeley Unified School District
Case Number: 3:2017cv02510
Filed: May 2, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
June 28, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation Setting and Continuing Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint) filed by Student B, Student D, Student C, Student A. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 28, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
May 17, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying without prejudice 5 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Student A et al v. Berkeley Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Student A
Represented By: David Shane Brun
Represented By: Larisa M. Cummings
Represented By: Deborah Rose Jacobson
Represented By: Arlene Brynne Mayerson
Represented By: Anjali Moorthy
Represented By: Brendan Eugene Radke
Represented By: Ramaah Sadasivam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Student B
Represented By: David Shane Brun
Represented By: Larisa M. Cummings
Represented By: Deborah Rose Jacobson
Represented By: Arlene Brynne Mayerson
Represented By: Anjali Moorthy
Represented By: Brendan Eugene Radke
Represented By: Ramaah Sadasivam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Student C
Represented By: David Shane Brun
Represented By: Larisa M. Cummings
Represented By: Deborah Rose Jacobson
Represented By: Arlene Brynne Mayerson
Represented By: Anjali Moorthy
Represented By: Brendan Eugene Radke
Represented By: Ramaah Sadasivam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Student D
Represented By: David Shane Brun
Represented By: Larisa M. Cummings
Represented By: Deborah Rose Jacobson
Represented By: Arlene Brynne Mayerson
Represented By: Anjali Moorthy
Represented By: Brendan Eugene Radke
Represented By: Ramaah Sadasivam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkeley Unified School District
Represented By: Beatriz Berumen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Evans
Represented By: Beatriz Berumen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beatriz Leyva-Cutler
Represented By: Beatriz Berumen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Alper
Represented By: Beatriz Berumen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Appel
Represented By: Beatriz Berumen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Daniels
Represented By: Beatriz Berumen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Hemphill
Represented By: Beatriz Berumen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of the Berkeley Unified School District
Represented By: Beatriz Berumen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?