Williams v. State of California et al

Plaintiff: Dwain Williams
Defendant: State of California, CDCR, Correctional Training Facility, Marion Spearman and Darren Chamberlain
Case Number: 3:2017cv02511
Filed: May 2, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 8 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 11/6/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
October 16, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE VIDEO CONFERENCE TESTIMONY AT EVIDENTIARY HEARING. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/16/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
September 12, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 30 Stipulation Concerning the Limited Evidentiary Hearing. Miscellaneous Deadline (Disclosure of Potential Witnesses and Exhibits) due by 10/6/2017; Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/27/2017 01:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
August 3, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING. Evidentiary Hearing set for 9/20/2017 01:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/3/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwain Williams
Represented By: Khoa Dang Le
Represented By: Khoa Dang Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Trace O. Maiorino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Represented By: Trace O. Maiorino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Training Facility
Represented By: Trace O. Maiorino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Spearman
Represented By: Trace O. Maiorino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Chamberlain
Represented By: Trace O. Maiorino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?