Hudson v. Procter and Gamble Distributing, LLC

Plaintiff: Tania Hudson
Defendant: Procter and Gamble Distributing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv02529
Filed: May 3, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/21/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
August 7, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Lindsey W. Davis is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/07/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 1, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY. All parties shall appear telephonically at the August 18, 2017 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/01/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson v. Procter and Gamble Distributing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tania Hudson
Represented By: Patrick A. Hormillosa
Represented By: Joseph Antonio Lepera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Procter and Gamble Distributing, LLC
Represented By: Craig Joseph O'Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?