Joseph Bisaccia v. Revel Systems Inc.

Plaintiff: Joseph Bisaccia
Defendant: Revel Systems Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv02533
Filed: May 3, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 38 Stipulation Regarding Continuance of October 17, 2017 Further Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2017; Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2017 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 5, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 35 Stipulation Regarding Conditional Certification and Distribution of Judicial Notice. (terminating 20 Motion CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION AND DISTRIBUTION OF JUDICIAL NOTICE). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
September 14, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 33 Notice and Proposed Order re Status of Final Approval in Related Case Re 20 MOTION CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION AND DISTRIBUTION OF JUDICIAL NOTICE: Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/14/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph Bisaccia v. Revel Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bisaccia
Represented By: Daniel S Brome
Represented By: Matthew C Helland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revel Systems Inc.
Represented By: Mollie Michelle Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?