Mason v. MediFit Corporate Services, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Sheila Mason
Defendant: MediFit Corporate Services, Inc. dba EXOS and Joleen MacKay
Case Number: 3:2017cv02542
Filed: May 3, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2018 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 43 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
February 8, 2018 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 43 MOTION to Dismiss [Motion to Enforce Settlement and Dismiss Lawsuit] filed by Sheila Mason. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 8, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 6, 2018 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Enforce Settlement and Dismiss Lawsuit filed by MediFit Corporate Services, Inc. dba EXOS. 43 MOTION to Dismiss [Mo tion to Enforce Settlement and Dismiss Lawsuit]. Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 6, 2018. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
August 11, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by MediFit Corporate Services, Inc. dba EXOS filed by MediFit Corporate Services, Inc. dba EXOS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. MediFit Corporate Services, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Mason
Represented By: Michael Edward Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MediFit Corporate Services, Inc. dba EXOS
Represented By: Brian T. Ashe
Represented By: Elizabeth Jarvis MacGregor
Represented By: Reanne Swafford-Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joleen MacKay
Represented By: Brian T. Ashe
Represented By: Elizabeth Jarvis MacGregor
Represented By: Reanne Swafford-Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?