HERNANDEZ et al v. QBE Insurance Corporation et al

Plaintiff: LEAH ANN HERNANDEZ and Jose Ramon Hernandez
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation and QBE Americas, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv02577
Filed: May 4, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Eureka Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 Stipulation filed by Jose Ramon Hernandez, Leah Ann Hernandez. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/17/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 15, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 to Dismiss QBE Americas, Inc. ONLY filed by Jose Ramon Hernandez, Leah Ann Hernandez. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/15/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
September 19, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 TO EXTEND TIME TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CONTINUE CMC filed by Jose Ramon Hernandez, Leah Ann Hernandez. Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/19/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
June 9, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 re 9 MOTION to Strike 1 Notice of Removal, Complaint attached in Notice of Removal, 8 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 6/12/2017. Replies due by 6/16/2017. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/9/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HERNANDEZ et al v. QBE Insurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEAH ANN HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Ethan A. Glaubiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ramon Hernandez
Represented By: Ethan A. Glaubiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Gerald Max Garcia
Represented By: Rebecca R. Weinreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Gerald Max Garcia
Represented By: Rebecca R. Weinreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?