Scott Crawford et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Scott Crawford and Jarvis Jernigan, Jr.
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc. and Rasier, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv02664
Filed: May 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER denying (227) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in case 3:17-cv-02664-RS; denying (187) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in case 3:17-cv-06124-RS. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/7/2022. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 199 to Continue the Status Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2021. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 9/9/2021 is continued to 9/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/1/2021. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/26/2021. (rslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER REGARDING SEALING MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/12/2021. (rslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2021)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 120 to Extend Stay AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Bench Trial set for 6/22/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Richard Seeborg. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/25/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE FACT DISCOVERY AND ENTER PROTECTIVE ORDER IN RELATED CASES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/17/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/18/2018. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER Re 46 To Continue Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc.s And Raiser, LLCs Deadline To Oppose Plaintiffs Motion For Administrative Relief From General Order 56 Stay Of Discovery. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/17/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 22 Changing Hearing Date Per L.R. 6-2. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/25/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott Crawford et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Crawford
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Jacqueline Kaye Hammack
Represented By: William Brock Most
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarvis Jernigan, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Jacqueline Kaye Hammack
Represented By: William Brock Most
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Janet Lynn Grumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?