Bosia v. Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mark Bosia
Defendant: Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv02701
Filed: May 10, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of John C. Lynch is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/16/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
August 7, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Virginia Bell Flynn is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/07/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 2, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY. The instant action is stayed pending the D.C. Circuit's opinion in ACA International. No later than four weeks from the date the D.C. Circuit issues said opinion, the parties shall submit a joint report apprising the Court of the status of any appeal of ACA International, and the parties' positions as to whether a continuation of the stay is warranted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/01/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017)
July 28, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY. The August 4, 2017 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/28/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 21, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PARTIES' STIPULATION RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY. To the extent the parties seek an order vacating the presently scheduled hearing on defendant's motion to stay, the stipulation is d enied. To the extent the parties seek an order extending the reply deadline, the Court grants a limited extension to July 24, 2017. The July 28, 2017 deadline for defendant to respond to plaintiff's amended complaint and the August 11, 2017 Case Management Conference are vacated, and will be reset as appropriate. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/21/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 14, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. The August 4, 2017 hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/14/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 13, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT OCWEN MORTGAGE SERVICING, INC. ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a). Defendant Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/13/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
May 31, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/31/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bosia v. Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Bosia
Represented By: Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Veronica Elizabeth McKnight
Represented By: Joshua B. Swigart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Chad R Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?