Kao v. Abbott Laboratories Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Kao and Nina Barwick
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv02790
Filed: May 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order filed by Abbott Laboratories Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 25, 2019. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS AND STAYING CASE UNDER PRIMARY JURISDICTION DOCTRINE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO EXCHANGE INITIAL DISCLOSURES re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Abbott Laboratories Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 5, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Nina Barwick, Crystal Kao. Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 31, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kao v. Abbott Laboratories Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Kao
Represented By: Benjamin Gastel
Represented By: Michael Isaac Miller
Represented By: J. Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Jonathan David Weissglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Barwick
Represented By: Benjamin Gastel
Represented By: Michael Isaac Miller
Represented By: J. Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Jonathan David Weissglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?