Simonmed Imaging Inc. v. Dignity Healthcare Inc.

Plaintiff: Simonmed Imaging Inc.
Defendant: Dignity Health
Case Number: 3:2017cv02907
Filed: May 19, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2018 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Postponing Case Deadlines Pending Settlement Agreement filed by Dignity Health. Deadline to either file Motion(s) or, in the alternative, file a responsive pleading 4/2 3/2018. Deadline to file oppositions to Motion(s) 5/7/2018. Deadline to file replies to Motions(s) 5/14/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2 018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Fact discovery cut-off 7/3/2018. Expert disclosures 7/24/2018. Expert rebuttal 8/14/2018. Expert discovery cut-off 8/28/2018. Dispositive Motion due by 9/18/2018. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 21, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
January 17, 2018 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Postponing Certain Schedule Dates Pending Settlement Agreement filed by Dignity Health Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 17, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
December 11, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Scheduling of Motions in Response to Amended Pleadings filed by Dignity Health. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simonmed Imaging Inc. v. Dignity Healthcare Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simonmed Imaging Inc.
Represented By: David J. Millstein
Represented By: Gerald S Richelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dignity Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?