Bankwitz et al v. Ecolab, Inc.,
Plaintiff: Robert Bankwitz, William Jacobo and Joshua Hernandez
Defendant: Ecolab, Inc., a Delaware corporation
Case Number: 3:2017cv02924
Filed: May 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Re Supplemental Briefing and/or Evidence. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/9/2020. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 59 setting Motion to Reconsideration for 8/2/18 at 2:30 p.m. filed by Ecolab, Inc., a Delaware corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/11/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2018)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MODIFIED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/16/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 ADR COMPLETION DEADLINE filed by Robert Bankwitz. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/8/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 37 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 21 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bankwitz et al v. Ecolab, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecolab, Inc., a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bankwitz
Represented By: Andrew Clayton Ellison
Represented By: Alejandro Pedro Gutierrez
Represented By: Brian Daniel Hefelfinger
Represented By: Daniel Jay Palay
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jacobo
Represented By: Andrew Clayton Ellison
Represented By: Alejandro Pedro Gutierrez
Represented By: Brian Daniel Hefelfinger
Represented By: Daniel Jay Palay
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Hernandez
Represented By: Andrew Clayton Ellison
Represented By: Alejandro Pedro Gutierrez
Represented By: Brian Daniel Hefelfinger
Represented By: Daniel Jay Palay
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?