Eolas Technologies Incorporated v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eolas Technologies Incorporated
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Petitioner: Latham & Watkins LLP
Not Yet Classified: David Keyzer
Consolidated Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC, Wal Mart Stores Inc, Google Inc. and Google LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv03022
Filed: May 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
2 Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 556 EXHIBITS to re #547 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, re #539 Declaration in Support - (Exhibits 54 and 55 to the Declaration of Amit Makker in Support of Reply Briefing of Amazon and Google Regarding Remedies for Eolas's and McKool Smith's Violation of Court-Ordered) filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 54, #2 Exhibit 55)(Related document(s) #547 , #539 ) (Makker, Amit) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 555 EXHIBITS to re #547 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, re #514 Declaration in Support - (Exhibit 41 to the Declaration of Amit Makker in Support of Briefing of Amazon and Google Regarding Remedies for Eolas's and McKool Smith's Violation of Court-Ordered Prosecution Bar) filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 41)(Related document(s) #547 , #514 ) (Makker, Amit) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 554 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/20/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 553 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on June 20, 2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 552 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on June 20, 2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Amazon.com Inc, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Makker, Amit) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 551 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 6/20/2019. Hearing held under seal. Argument heard from both parties. Motion taken under submission. Counsel of record may obtain a copy of the FTR recording and/or transcript without a Court order. Total Time in Court: 1 hour 8 minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. Plaintiff Attorney: Megan Church, Lauren Weinstein, John Campbell, Robert Litts. Defendant Attorney: Jennifer Haltom Doan, J. Randy Roeser, Amit Makker, Douglas Lumish, Grant Kinsel, Quinn Emanuel, David Perslon. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/20/2019) Modified on 6/21/2019 (mllS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDERThe Court has received the letter from attorney Jeffrey Lamken dated June 7, 2019. ECF No. 542. The Court advises the parties that the hearing scheduled for June 20, 2019, will not be an evidentiary hearing and the Court will not be taking live testimony. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 549 ORDER REGARDING JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO BRING CERTAIN PRESENTATION EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURTROOM by Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 548 ORDER GRANTING EOLAS TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATEDS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEALTHE COURTROOM OR OTHERWISE PRESERVE PRIVILEGE AND WORK PRODUCT by Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 546 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Bring Certain Presentation Equipment into the Courtroom filed by Amazon.com Inc. Responses due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 545 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #543 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Seal the Courtroom or Otherwise Preserve Privilege and Work Product ) filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 544 Letter from David A. Perlson & Douglas E. Lumish Responding to Eolas's June 7, 2019 Letter. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 543 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Seal the Courtroom or Otherwise Preserve Privilege and Work Product filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Megan Cunniff Church in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Courtroom, #2 Proposed Order)(Church, Megan) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 542 Letter from Jeffrey A. Lamken regarding June 20, 2019 hearing. (Lamken, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 541 Declaration of James A. Glenn in Support of #537 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Reply Briefing of Amazon and Google Regarding Remedies for Eolas's and McKool Smith's Violation of Court-Ordered Prosecution Bar and Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Amit Makker i filed byEolas Technologies Incorporated. (Related document(s) #537 ) (Glenn, James) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 540 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amazon.com Inc (re: #537 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 539 Declaration of Amit Makker in Support of #538 Reply Briefing of Amazon and Google Regarding Remedies for Eolas's and McKool Smith's Violation of Court-Ordered Prosecution Bar filed byAmazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 54 [Sealed], #2 Exhibit 55 [Sealed], #3 Exhibit 56, #4 Exhibit 57 [Sealed])(Makker, Amit) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 538 REPLY (re #513 MOTION ) (Reply Briefing of Amazon and Google Regarding Remedies for Eolas's and McKool Smith's Violation of Court-Ordered Prosecution Bar [Redacted]) filed byAmazon.com Inc. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 537 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Reply Briefing of Amazon and Google Regarding Remedies for Eolas's and McKool Smith's Violation of Court-Ordered Prosecution Bar and Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Amit Makker in Support Thereof filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amit Makker in Support of Administrative Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [Redacted] Reply Briefing, #4 [Unredacted] Reply Briefing, #5 [Unredacted] Exhibit 54 to Makker Declaration in Support of Reply Briefing, #6 [Unredacted] Exhibit 55 to Makker Declaration in Support of Reply Briefing, #7 [Unredacted] Exhibit 57 to Makker Declaration in Support of Reply Briefing)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 536 Letter from Mario Moore re the May 2, 2019 filing of Eolas's Response to Amazon and Google's Brief Regarding Remedies. (Moore, Mario) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #513 Briefing of Amazon and Google Regarding Remedies for Eolas's and McKool Smith's Violation of Court-Ordered Prosecution Bar. Responses due by 5/2/2019. Replies due by 5/30/2019. Hearing set for 6/20/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 535 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated of re #533 Declaration in Support, re #532 Declaration in Support (Moore, Mario) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 534 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated of re #522 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Response to Briefing of Amazon and Google Regarding Remedies (Moore, Mario) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 533 Declaration of David M. Martin in Support of #523 Brief in Response to Amazon and Google's Briefing Regarding Remedies filed byEolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #523 ) (Moore, Mario) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 532 Declaration of Nancy J. Linck in Support of #523 Brief in Response to Amazon and Google's Briefing Regarding Remedies filed byEolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #523 ) (Moore, Mario) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 531 Declaration of Mark Swords in Support of #523 Brief in Response to Amazon and Google's Briefing Regarding Remedies (Redacted) filed byEolas Technologies Incorporated. (Related document(s) #523 ) (Moore, Mario) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 530 Declaration of James Stetson in Support of #523 Brief in Response to Amazon and Google's Briefing Regarding Remedies (Redacted) filed byEolas Technologies Incorporated. (Related document(s) #523 ) (Moore, Mario) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 529 Declaration of Mike McKool in Support of #523 Brief in Response to Amazon and Google's Briefing Regarding Remedies (Redacted) filed byEolas Technologies Incorporated. (Related document(s) #523 ) (Moore, Mario) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 528 Declaration of Michael Doyle in Support of #523 Brief in Response to Amazon and Google's Briefing Regarding Remedies (Redacted) filed byEolas Technologies Incorporated. (Related document(s) #523 ) (Moore, Mario) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 527 Declaration of John Campbell in Support of #523 Brief in Response to Amazon and Google's Briefing Regarding Remedies (Redacted) filed byEolas Technologies Incorporated. (Related document(s) #523 ) (Moore, Mario) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 526 Declaration of Kevin Burgess in Support of #523 Brief in Response to Amazon and Google's Briefing Regarding Remedies (Redacted) filed byEolas Technologies Incorporated. (Related document(s) #523 ) (Moore, Mario) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 525 Declaration of Josh Budwin in Support of #523 Brief in Response to Amazon and Google's Briefing Regarding Remedies filed byEolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit A2, #4 Exhibit A3, #5 Exhibit A4, #6 Exhibit A5, #7 Exhibit A6, #8 Exhibit A7, #9 Exhibit A8, #10 Exhibit A9, #11 Exhibit A10, #12 Exhibit A11, #13 Exhibit A12, #14 Exhibit A13, #15 Exhibit A14, #16 Exhibit A15, #17 Exhibit B, #18 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #523 ) (Moore, Mario) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 524 Declaration of James Glenn in Support of #523 Brief in Response to Amazon and Google's Briefing Regarding Remedies filed byEolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (Part 1), #3 Exhibit 2 (Part 2), #4 Exhibit 3 (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8 (Redacted), #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16 (Redacted), #18 Exhibit 17 (Redacted), #19 Exhibit 18 (Redacted), #20 Exhibit 19 (Redacted), #21 Exhibit 20 (Redacted), #22 Exhibit 21 (Redacted), #23 Exhibit 22 (Redacted), #24 Exhibit 23 (Redacted))(Related document(s) #523 ) (Moore, Mario) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 523 Brief in Response to Amazon and Google's Briefing Regarding Remedies (Redacted) filed byEolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Remedies)(Moore, Mario) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 522 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Response to Briefing of Amazon and Google Regarding Remedies filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Seal, #2 Declaration of Mario Moore in Support of Motion to Seal, #3 Response Brief (Redacted), #4 Response Brief (Unredacted), #5 Proposed Order Denying Remedies, #6 Declaration of James Glenn in Support of Response, #7 Exhibit 1 to Glenn Declaration, #8 Exhibit 2 (Part 1) to Glenn Declaration, #9 Exhibit 2 (Part 2) to Glenn Declaration, #10 Exhibit 3 to Glenn Declaration (Redacted), #11 Exhibit 3 to Glenn Declaration (Unredacted), #12 Exhibit 4 to Glenn Declaration, #13 Exhibit 5 to Glenn Declaration, #14 Exhibit 6 to Glenn Declaration, #15 Exhibit 7 to Glenn Declaration, #16 Exhibit 8 to Glenn Declaration (Redacted), #17 Exhibit 8 to Glenn Declaration (Unredacted), #18 Exhibit 9 to Glenn Declaration, #19 Exhibit 10 to Glenn Declaration, #20 Exhibit 11 to Glenn Declaration, #21 Exhibit 12 to Glenn Declaration, #22 Exhibit 13 to Glenn Declaration, #23 Exhibit 14 to Glenn Declaration, #24 Exhibit 15 to Glenn Declaration, #25 Exhibit 16 to Glenn Declaration (Redacted), #26 Exhibit 16 to Glenn Declaration (Unredacted), #27 Exhibit 17 to Glenn Declaration (Redacted), #28 Exhibit 17 to Glenn Declaration (Unredacted), #29 Exhibit 18 to Glenn Declaration (Redacted), #30 Exhibit 18 to Glenn Declaration (Unredacted), #31 Exhibit 19 to Glenn Declaration (Redacted), #32 Exhibit 19 to Glenn Declaration (Unredacted), #33 Exhibit 20 to Glenn Declaration (Redacted), #34 Exhibit 20 to Glenn Declaration (Unredacted), #35 Exhibit 21 to Glenn Declaration (Redacted), #36 Exhibit 21 to Glenn Declaration (Unredacted), #37 Exhibit 22 to Glenn Declaration (Redacted), #38 Exhibit 22 to Glenn Declaration (Unredacted), #39 Exhibit 23 to Glenn Declaration (Redacted), #40 Exhibit 23 to Glenn Declaration (Unredacted), #41 Declaration of Josh Budwin (Redacted), #42 Declaration of Josh Budwin (Unredacted), #43 Exhibit A to Budwin Declaration, #44 Exhibit A1 to Budwin Declaration, #45 Exhibit A2 to Budwin Declaration, #46 Exhibit A3 to Budwin Declaration, #47 Exhibit A4 to Budwin Declaration, #48 Exhibit A5 to Budwin Declaration, #49 Exhibit A6 to Budwin Declaration, #50 Exhibit A7 to Budwin Declaration, #51 Exhibit A8 to Budwin Declaration, #52 Exhibit A9 to Budwin Declaration, #53 Exhibit A10 to Budwin Declaration, #54 Exhibit A11 to Budwin Declaration, #55 Exhibit A12 to Budwin Declaration, #56 Exhibit A13 to Budwin Declaration, #57 Exhibit A14 to Budwin Declaration, #58 Exhibit A15 to Budwin Declaration, #59 Exhibit B to Budwin Declaration, #60 Exhibit C to Budwin Declaration, #61 Declaration of Kevin Burgess (Redacted), #62 Declaration of Kevin Burgess (Unredacted), #63 Declaration of John Campbell (Redacted), #64 Declaration of John Campbell (Unredacted), #65 Declaration of Michael Doyle (Redacted), #66 Declaration of Michael Doyle (Unredacted), #67 Declaration of Mike McKool (Redacted), #68 Declaration of Mike McKool (Unredacted), #69 Declaration of James Stetson (Redacted), #70 Declaration of James Stetson (Unredacted), #71 Declaration of Mark Swords (Redacted), #72 Declaration of Mark Swords (Unredacted))(Moore, Mario) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #520 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 520 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice (Megan Cunniff Church), (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13295357) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Johnson, Daniel) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 519 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Johnson, Jr on behalf of Jeffrey A. Lamken (Johnson, Daniel) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 518 Declaration of James A. Glenn in Support of #512 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Briefing of Amazon And Google Regarding Remedies for Eolass and Mckool Smiths Violation of Court-Ordered Prosecution Bar; Certain Exhibits to The Makker Declaration in Support Thereof; Certain Ex filed byEolas Technologies Incorporated. (Related document(s) #512 ) (Johnson, Daniel) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 517 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Amazon.com Inc of re #512 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Briefing of Amazon And Google Regarding Remedies for Eolass and Mckool Smiths Violation of Court-Ordered Prosecution Bar; Certain Exhibits to The Makker Declaration in Support Thereof; Certain Ex (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 516 Declaration of Dr. Benjamin B. Bederson in Support of #513 Brief of Amazon and Google Regarding Remedies for Eolas's and Mckool Smith's Violation of Court-Ordered Prosecution Bar [Redacted] filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #513 ) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 515 Declaration of Carl G. Anderson in Support of #513 Brief of Amazon and Google Regarding Remedies for Eolas's and Mckool Smith's Violation of Court-Ordered Prosecution Bar filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #513 ) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 514 Declaration of Amit Makker in Support of #513 Brief of Amazon and Google Regarding Remedies for Eolas's and Mckool Smith's Violation of Court-Ordered Prosecution Bar filed byAmazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (Sealed), #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 (Sealed), #8 Exhibit 8 (Sealed), #9 Exhibit 9 (Sealed), #10 Exhibit 10 (Sealed), #11 Exhibit 11 (Sealed), #12 Exhibit 12 (Sealed), #13 Exhibit 13 (Sealed), #14 Exhibit 14 (Sealed), #15 Exhibit 15 (Sealed), #16 Exhibit 16 (Sealed), #17 Exhibit 17 (Sealed), #18 Exhibit 18 (Sealed), #19 Exhibit 19 (Sealed), #20 Exhibit 20 (Sealed), #21 Exhibit 21 (Sealed), #22 Exhibit 22 (Sealed), #23 Exhibit 23 (Sealed), #24 Exhibit 24 (Sealed), #25 Exhibit 25 (Sealed), #26 Exhibit 26 (Sealed), #27 Exhibit 27 (Sealed), #28 Exhibit 28 (Sealed), #29 Exhibit 29 (Sealed), #30 Exhibit 30 (Sealed), #31 Exhibit 31 (Sealed), #32 Exhibit 32 (Sealed), #33 Exhibit 33 (Sealed), #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38 (Sealed), #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40 (Sealed), #41 Exhibit 41 (Sealed), #42 Exhibit 42 (Sealed), #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53)(Related document(s) #513 ) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 513 Briefing of Amazon and Google Regarding Remedies for Eolas's and McKool Smith's Violation of Court-Ordered Prosecution Bar [Redacted] filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/4/2019) Modified on 5/3/2019 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2019 Filing 512 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Briefing of Amazon And Google Regarding Remedies for Eolass and Mckool Smiths Violation of Court-Ordered Prosecution Bar; Certain Exhibits to The Makker Declaration in Support Thereof; Certain Exhibits to the Anderson Declaration in Support Thereof; and Portions of the Bederson Declaration in Support Thereof filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amit Makker, #2 Declaration of Miles D. Freeman, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Briefing of Amazon and Google Regarding Remedies for Eolass and Mckool Smiths Violation of Court-Ordered Prosecution Bar [Unredacted], #5 Briefing of Amazon and Google Regarding Remedies for Eolass and Mckool Smiths Violation of Court-Ordered Prosecution Bar [Redacted], #6 Exhibit 3 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #7 Exhibit 7 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #8 Exhibit 8 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #9 Exhibit 9 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #10 Exhibit 10 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #11 Exhibit 11 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #12 Exhibit 12 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #13 Exhibit 13 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #14 Exhibit 14 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #15 Exhibit 15 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #16 Exhibit 16 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #17 Exhibit 17 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #18 Exhibit 18 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #19 Exhibit 19 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #20 Exhibit 20 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #21 Exhibit 21 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #22 Exhibit 22 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #23 Exhibit 23 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #24 Exhibit 24 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #25 Exhibit 25 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #26 Exhibit 26 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #27 Exhibit 27 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #28 Exhibit 28 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #29 Exhibit 29 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #30 Exhibit 30 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #31 Exhibit 31 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #32 Exhibit 32 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #33 Exhibit 33 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #34 Exhibit 38 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #35 Exhibit 40 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #36 Exhibit 41 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #37 Exhibit 42 to Makker Decl. [Unredacted - Sealed Entirely], #38 Exhibit A to Anderson Decl. [Unredacted], #39 Exhibit A to Anderson Decl. [Redacted], #40 Declaration of Dr. Benjamin B. Bederson in Support of Briefing of Amazon and Google Regarding Remedies for Eolas's and McKool Smith's Violation of Court-Ordered Prosecution Bar [Unredacted], #41 Declaration of Dr. Benjamin B. Bederson in Support of Briefing of Amazon and Google Regarding Remedies for Eolas's and McKool Smith's Violation of Court-Ordered Prosecution Bar [Redacted])(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 511 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 28, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Johnson, Daniel) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
March 30, 2019 Filing 510 Transcript of FTR Proceedings held on 3/28/2019, before Judge Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sarah Goekler, telephone number sgoekler.csr@gmail.com; (530)941-2621. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #507 Transcript Order, #509 Transcript Order, #508 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2019. (Related documents(s) #507 , #509 , #508 ) (slg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 509 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 28, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC, for Court Reporter Sarah Goekler. (Vakil, Bijal) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 508 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 28, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Google LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 507 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 28, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Amazon.com Inc, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Makker, Amit) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 506 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Discovery Hearing held on 3/28/2019. (FTR Time: 2:01-2:38.)Attorneys for Plaintiff: James Glenn; Michael Fritz.Attorneys for Defendant Amazon: Grant Kinsel; Amit Makker.Attorneys for Defendant Google: David Perlson; Miles Freeman.Attorney for Defendant Walmart: Allen Wang. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/28/2019) Modified on 3/29/2019: Matter transcribed by Sarah Goekler. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #504 Administrative Motion to Extend Page Limits for Prosecution Bar Briefing. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 26, 2019 Filing 504 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Extend Page Limits for Prosecution Bar Briefing filed by Amazon.com Inc. Responses due by 4/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 503 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 3/28/2019 at 02:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements to appear by telephone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 502 SCHEDULING ORDER. Amazon & Google's opening brief due 4/4/2019. Responses due by 5/2/2019. Replies due by 5/30/2019. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 1, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 501 NOTICE re #497 Order filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order Setting Briefing Schedule)(Johnson, Daniel) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 500 [Proposed] Order Regarding Proposed Briefing Schedule re #497 Order filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 499 CLERK'S NOTICE TERMINATING MOTION AS MOOT as to #498 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. No order is required from the Court. Attorney Graham E. Phillips has been terminated from the Court's docket. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 498 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Amazon.com Inc. Responses due by 3/12/2019. Replies due by 3/19/2019. (Phillips, Graham) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #403 ORDER RE ALLEGED PROSECUTION BAR VIOLATION. Proposed schedule due by 3/1/2019. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 21, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #495 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 495 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice (James Allen Glenn), (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13044822) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #(1) Texas State Bar Certificate of Good Standing)(Johnson, Daniel) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 4, 2019 Filing 494 Joint Statement Regarding Schedule for Completion of Patent Prosecution Bar Discovery filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
December 21, 2018 Filing 493 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-9-2018, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #486 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2019. (Related documents(s) #486 ) (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying #467 Motion to Compel; granting #470 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting #477 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #490 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 490 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC. Responses due by 12/21/2018. Replies due by 12/28/2018. (Lemley, Mark) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 489 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/9/2018 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Wal Mart Stores Inc, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Wang, Allen) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 488 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/09/2018 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 487 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/09/2018 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 486 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 9, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Amazon.com Inc, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Makker, Amit) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 485 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held on 11/9/2018 re #467 Amazon and Google's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Additional Post-July 22, 2014 Discovery filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Court Reporter: Debra Pas.)(Time: 00:54)Attorney for Plaintiff: Dan Johnson Jr.Attorneys for Defendant Amazon: Douglas Lumish.Attorneys for Defendant Google: David Perlson; Carl Anderson. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/9/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 484 Letter from Daniel Johnson, Jr. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7)(Johnson, Daniel) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 483 Declaration of Mario Moore ISO Administrative Motion to Seal (ECF No. 477) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Moore, Mario) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #481 Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 481 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents re #479 Declaration in Support, filed by Amazon.com Inc. Responses due by 10/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard G. Frenkel, #2 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 480 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Amazon.com Inc of re #477 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief and Related Materials in Support of Motion to Compel Post-July 22, 2014 Discovery (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 479 Declaration of Richard G. Frenkel in Support of #478 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8 [Sealed], #3 Exhibit 9 [Sealed], #4 Exhibit 10 [Sealed], #5 Exhibit 11 [Sealed])(Related document(s) #478 ) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 10/19/2018) Modified on 10/22/2018 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 4 replaced on 10/25/2018) (rcsS, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 5 replaced on 10/25/2018) (rcsS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2018 Filing 478 REPLY (re #467 Amazon and Google's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Additional Post-July 22, 2014 Discovery [Redacted])) - [Redacted Version of Reply Brief] filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 477 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief and Related Materials in Support of Motion to Compel Post-July 22, 2014 Discovery filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard G. Frenkel in Support of Amazon's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [Redacted] Amazon and Google's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Additional Post-July 22, 2014 Discovery, #4 [Unredacted] Amazon and Google's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Additional Post-July 22, 2014 Discovery, #5 [Unredacted] Exhibit 8 to Frenkel Declaration in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Additional Post-July 22, 2014 Discovery, #6 [Unredacted] Exhibit 9 to Frenkel Declaration in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Additional Post-July 22, 2014 Discovery, #7 [Unredacted] Exhibit 10 to Frenkel Declaration in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Additional Post-July 22, 2014 Discovery, #8 [Unredacted] Exhibit 11 to Frenkel Declaration in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Additional Post-July 22, 2014 Discovery)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 476 Declaration of Richard G. Frenkel in Support of #470 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Declaration of Richard G. Frenkel Regarding Plaintiff Eolas Technologies Incorporated's Administrative Motion to File Materials Under Seal) filed byAmazon.com Inc. (Related document(s) #470 ) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 475 Declaration of Mario Moore in Support of #466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants' Motion to Compel Additional Post-July 22, 2014 Discovery and Related Materials filed byEolas Technologies Incorporated. (Related document(s) #466 ) (Moore, Mario) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 11, 2018 Filing 474 Proof of Service by Eolas Technologies Incorporated re #470 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #471 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Moore, Mario) (Filed on 10/11/2018) Modified on 10/12/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2018 Filing 473 DECLARATION of Mario Moore in Opposition to #472 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byEolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10 [redacted], #11 Exhibit 11 [redacted], #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14 [redacted], #15 Exhibit 15 [redacted], #16 Exhibit 16 [redacted], #17 Exhibit 17 [redacted], #18 Exhibit 18 [redacted], #19 Exhibit 19 [redacted], #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22 [redacted], #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30)(Related document(s) #472 ) (Moore, Mario) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 11, 2018 Filing 472 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #467 MOTION to Compel (Amazon and Google's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Additional Post-July 22, 2014 Discovery [Redacted]) ) [Redacted] filed byEolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moore, Mario) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 11, 2018 Filing 471 EXHIBITS to re #470 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 14, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 15, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #9 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 16, #10 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #11 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 17, #12 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, #13 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 18, #14 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18, #15 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 19, #16 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19, #17 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 22, #18 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 22)(Related document(s) #470 ) (Moore, Mario) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 11, 2018 Filing 470 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition Brief, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition Brief)(Moore, Mario) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 469 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Amazon.com Inc of re #466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants' Motion to Compel Additional Post-July 22, 2014 Discovery and Related Materials (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 468 Declaration of Richard G. Frenkel in Support of #467 Amazon and Google's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Additional Post-July 22, 2014 Discovery - [Redacted] filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 [Sealed], #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 [Sealed], #4 Exhibit 4 [Sealed], #5 Exhibit 5 [Sealed], #6 Exhibit 6 [Sealed])(Related document(s) #467 ) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 467 Amazon and Google's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Additional Post-July 22, 2014 Discovery - [Redacted] filed by Amazon.com Inc. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 10/11/2018. Replies due by 10/19/2018. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants' Motion to Compel Additional Post-July 22, 2014 Discovery and Related Materials filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard G. Frenkel in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [Redacted] Amazon and Google's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Additional Post-July 22, 2014 Discovery, #4 [Unredacted] Amazon and Google's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Additional Post-July 22, 2014 Discovery, #5 [Unredacted] Exhibit 1 to Frenkel Declaration in Support of Amazon and Google's Motion to Compel Additional Post-July 22, 2014 Discovery, #6 [Unredacted] Exhibit 3 to Frenkel Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel, #7 [Unredacted] Exhibit 4 to Frenkel Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel, #8 [Unredacted] Exhibit 5 to Frenkel Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel, #9 [Unredacted] Exhibit 6 to Frenkel Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #463 Stipulation to Continue the Hearing for Amazon and Google's Motion to Compel Briefing Schedule. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER RE: EOLAS'S IN CAMERA SUBMISSION re #458 Notice of Submission of Documents for In Camera Review filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/18/18. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 463 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Motion to Compel Briefing Schedule re #462 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue the Hearing for Amazon and Google's Motion to Compel filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 462 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue the Hearing for Amazon and Google's Motion to Compel filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Amit Makker, #(2) [Proposed] Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 461 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 6, 2018, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #457 Transcript Order, #456 Transcript Order, #455 Transcript Order, #454 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2018. (Related documents(s) #457 , #456 , #455 , #454 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 460 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part #459 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The hearing on the motion to compel is continued until November 6, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. All briefs must be submitted by October 23, 2018. The parties shall file a stipulated briefing schedule by September 21, 2018. (This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice.) (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 459 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Post-July 22, 2014 Documents and Shorten Time for Any Opposition to This Motion Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-3 filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard G. Frenkel, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Enlarge Time to File, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time for Opposition)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 458 NOTICE filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated of Submission of Documents for In Camera Review re #453 Order (Johnson, Daniel) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 457 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/06/2018 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Amazon.com Inc, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Makker, Amit) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 456 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/06/2018 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 455 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/06/2018 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Wal Mart Stores Inc, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Wang, Allen) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 454 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/06/2018 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Google LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER FOLLOWING SEPTEMBER 6, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/7/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 452 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Discovery Hearing held on 9/6/2018. The Court to issue an order. (FTR Time: 2:00-2:31.)Attorney for Plaintiff: Dan Johnson.Attorneys for Defendant Amazon: Douglas Lumish.Attorneys for Defendant Google: David Perlson; Carl Anderson.Attorneys for Defendant Walmart: Allen Wang. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/6/2018) Modified on 9/11/2018: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2018 Filing 451 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that a discovery conference is scheduled for September 6, 2018 at 2:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 450 Joint Status Update Regarding Prosecution Bar Dispute filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 449 NOTICE by Wal Mart Stores Inc re #448 Order regarding Joint Status Update (Vakil, Bijal) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER REQUESTING JOINT STATUS UPDATE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/16/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
June 15, 2018 Filing 447 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert George Litts (Litts, Robert) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 15, 2018 Filing 446 NOTICE of Appearance by Mario Moore (Moore, Mario) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 15, 2018 Filing 445 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Johnson, Jr (Johnson, Daniel) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 444 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 26, 2018, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #442 Transcript Order, #443 Transcript Order, #440 Transcript Order, #441 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 5/25/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2018. (Related documents(s) #442 , #443 , #440 , #441 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
April 30, 2018 Filing 443 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/26/2018 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Google LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 27, 2018 Filing 442 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/26/2018 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
April 27, 2018 Filing 441 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/26/2018 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Amazon.com Inc, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Makker, Amit) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
April 27, 2018 Filing 440 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/26/2018 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Wal Mart Stores Inc, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Vakil, Bijal) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
April 26, 2018 Filing 439 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Discovery Hearing held on 4/26/2018. (FTR Time: 9:04-9:22.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/26/2018) Modified on 4/27/2018: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER re #437 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 24, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 23, 2018 Filing 437 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Kevin Lee Burgess (Withdrawal of Craig Tolliver as Counsel for Eolas Technologies - Corrected) (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 23, 2018 Filing 436 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Kevin Lee Burgess (Withdrawal of Craig Tolliver as Counsel for Eolas Technologies) (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 435 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 4/19/2018. (FTR Time: 9:03-9:12.)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/19/2018)
April 12, 2018 Filing 434 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that a telephonic discovery hearing is scheduled for April 19, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Please contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements to appear by telephone. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 5, 2018 Filing 433 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 4/5/2018. (FTR Time: 2:25-2:39.) Attorneys for Plaintiff: John Campbell Jr.; Kevin BurgessAttorneys for Defendant Amazon: Grant Kinsel; Amit Makker; Jennifer DoanAttorneys for Defendant Google: David Perlson; Michael FreemanAttorney for Defendant Walmart: Bijal Vakil (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/5/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 432 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/29/2018 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Amazon.com Inc, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Makker, Amit) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 431 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/29/2018 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
April 1, 2018 Filing 430 Transcript of Digital Audio Recording of Proceedings held on 3/29/2018, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #428 Transcript Order, #429 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2018. (Related documents(s) #428 , #429 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 429 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/29/2018 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Wal Mart Stores Inc, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Wang, Allen) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 428 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/29/2018 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Google LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 3/30/2018) Modified on 3/30/2018: Corrected proceedings 'date'. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2018 Filing 427 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: #424 Discovery Hearing), by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Court will send to Vicki Merideth at vmerideth@mckoolsmith.com a link to the files requested in this order. (Filing Fee: $31.00, receipt number 0971-12233796). (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 426 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING DISCOVERY HEARING. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that a further discovery hearing is scheduled for April 26, 2018 at 9:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. Counsel may appear by telephone and shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 425 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: #424 Discovery Hearing), by Amazon.com Inc. Court will send to Donny Kong at donny.kong@lw.com a link to the files requested in this order. (Filing Fee: $31.00, receipt number 0971-12232292). (Makker, Amit) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 424 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Discovery Hearing held on 3/29/2018. Plaintiff shall provide Amazon the documents previously submitted in camera by April 6, 2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/29/2018) Modified on 3/30/2018: Matter transcribed by Lydia Zinn (Zinn Reporting). (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2018 Filing 423 Responsive Brief Pursuant to re #414 Order filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Related document(s) #414 ) (McKool, Mike) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #421 Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Court's December 21, 2017 Order. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 16, 2018 Filing 421 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Extend Deadline to Respond to Court's December 21, 2017 Order #414 filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of James Quigley)(McKool, Mike) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 420 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING DISCOVERY HEARING. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that at the request of the parties, the discovery hearing currently scheduled for February 8, 2018 is continued to March 29, 2018 at 9:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER as modifed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #417 Joint Stipulation to Modify Date of Discovery Hearing. Discovery Hearing reset for 2/8/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 9, 2018 Filing 418 Declaration of Richard G. Frenkel in Support of #417 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Modify Date of Discovery Hearing filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Related document(s) #417 ) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
January 9, 2018 Filing 417 JOINT STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER to Modify Date of Discovery Hearing filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
January 8, 2018 Filing 416 Amazon's Statement of Objection to Potential Premature Consideration of Merits re #414 Order filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
January 8, 2018 Filing 415 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING TIME OF DISCOVERY HEARING. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that the discovery hearing currently scheduled for February 1, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. shall commence at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER RE: IN CAMERA REVIEW FOR VIOLATION OF PATENT PROSECUTION BAR. Discovery Hearing set for 2/1/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/21/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 1, 2017 Filing 413 Responsive Statement Pursuant to ECF No. 409 filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of John Campbell, #(2) Exhibit 1)(McKool, Mike) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 412 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #411 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond . (This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice.) (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017) Modified on 11/29/2017 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2017 Filing 411 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER re #410 Statement to Extend EOLAS's Deadline for Responding to Amazon's Statement (ECF No. 410) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of James E. Quigley)(McKool, Mike) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 22, 2017 Filing 410 Amazon's Statement Pursuant to Dkt. No. #409 filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER RE: PATENT PROSECUTION BAR DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/16/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 408 NOTICE filed by Amazon.com Inc. of Notice Regarding Discovery Dispute Regarding Court's Order (ECF Nos. #403 ) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 16, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 13, 2017 Filing 406 NOTICE filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated Regarding Compliance with re #403 Order (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 1, #(2) Exhibit 2)(McKool, Mike) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 405 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #404 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Court Deadlines Other than those Set Forth in the Court's September 27, 2017 Order filed by Amazon.com Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 2, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 404 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Court Deadlines Other than those Set Forth in the Court's September 27, 2017 Order filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amit Makker)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER RE ALLEGED PROSECUTION BAR VIOLATION re #400 Statement filed by Amazon.com Inc, #399 Statement, filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 27, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 402 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #401 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Court Deadlines filed by Amazon.com Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 26, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 Filing 401 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Court Deadlines filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carl G. Anderson)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 25, 2017 Filing 400 Statement and [Proposed] Order re #387 Order and Amazon's Motion for Order to Show Cause by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 Filing 399 Statement and Proposed Order Regarding Next Steps After Court's #387 Order by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike) (Filed on 9/25/2017) Modified on 9/26/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MIKE MCKOOL PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #397 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 Filing 397 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Mike McKool ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11737778.) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McKool, Mike) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #391 Motion for Leave to File. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 395 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #390 Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Modify Court Deadlines filed by Amazon.com Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 20, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 16, 2017 Filing 394 Statement and [Proposed] Order Regarding Next Steps After Court's Order (ECF No. 387) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 9/16/2017)
September 15, 2017 Filing 393 Statement and [Proposed] Order re #387 Order and Amazon's Motion for Order to Show Cause filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Filing 392 [Proposed] Order Regarding Next Steps After Court's Order re Prosecution Bar (ECF No. 387) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 391 MOTION for Leave to File to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order ECF No. 387 filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Campbell, #2 Exhibit 1 - Motion for Reconsideration, #3 Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 390 Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Modify Court Deadlines filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Richard Frenkel)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 389 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #388 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Extend Page Limits for Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition/Cross-Motion filed by Amazon.com Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 388 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Extend Page Limits for Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition/Cross-Motion filed by Amazon.com Inc. Responses due by 9/15/2017. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER RE: PROSECUTION BAR re #262 SEALED MOTION for Order to Show Cause Regarding McKool Smith's Violation of Prosecution Bar filed by Amazon.com Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 1, 2017. The Court places this order provisionally under seal only because the briefs in support of and in opposition to Amazon's motion were filed under seal. The Court will unseal the order on September 11, 2017 unless one or more of the parties demonstrates good cause for the continued sealing of the order. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2017 Filing 386 AMENDED ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #382 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISQUALIFY by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #253 Motion to Disqualify Latham & Watkins as Counsel for Amazon.com, Inc. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 18, 2017 Filing 384 Defendant's Supplemental Response Brief Regarding #253 Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Latham & Watkins LLP filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/18/2017)
August 18, 2017 Filing 383 Eolas' Supplemental Response in Support of re #253 Motion to Disqualify Latham & Watkins filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Culbertson, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/18/2017)
August 15, 2017 Filing 382 AMENDED ANSWER to #33 First Amended Complaint, amd Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 381 Supplemental Brief re #378 Stipulation and Order; -Supplemental Brief Regarding #253 Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Latham & Watkins LLP filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Related document(s) #378 ) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 380 Eolas's Supplemental Brief in Support of re #253 Motion to Disqualify Latham & Watkins filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Culbertson, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 379 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #375 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Setting Early Summary Judgment and Claim Construction Reconsideration Briefing Schedules - (Corrected) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Tutorial Hearing set for 10/31/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Hearing on summary judgment motions set for 12/5/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 8, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 378 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #376 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Supplemental Briefing on Eolas's Motion to Disqualify Latham & Watkins LLP filed by Amazon.com Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 8, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER REGARDING AUGUST 2, 2017 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #373 [Proposed] Order filed by Amazon.com Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 8, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 376 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Supplemental Briefing on Eolas's Motion to Disqualify Latham & Watkins LLP filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 4, 2017 Filing 375 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Setting Early Summary Judgment and Claim Construction Reconsideration Briefing Schedules re #372 Case Management Conference - (Corrected) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 4, 2017 Filing 374 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Setting Early Summary Judgment and Claim Construction Reconsideration Briefinf Schedules re #372 Case Management Conference filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 4, 2017 Filing 373 [Proposed] Order Regarding August 2, 2017 Case Management Conference re #372 Case Management Conference filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 2, 2017 Filing 372 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/2/2017. Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Total Time in Court: 1 hour, 44 minutes. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/2/2017)
July 24, 2017 Filing 371 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 370 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #369 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Rescheduling July 5, 2017 Case Management Conference for August 2, 2017 filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 21, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 369 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Rescheduling July 5, 2017 Case Management Conference for August 2, 2017 filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Quigley)(Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 368 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #367 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Selecting Private ADR by Eolas Technologies Incorporated and Amazon.com, Inc. filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 15, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 14, 2017 Filing 367 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order selecting Private ADR by Eolas Technologies Incorporated and Amazon.com, Inc. filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Quigley, James) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 14, 2017 Filing 366 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Quigley, James) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 14, 2017 Filing 365 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY GRAHAM E. PHILLIPS PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #361 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ELANA N. DAWSON PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #360 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MELISSA A. SHERRY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #359 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 Filing 361 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for Graham Phillips, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11449096) filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Phillips, Graham) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 Filing 360 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for Elana Nightingale Dawson, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11449062) filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Nightingale Dawson, Elana) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 Filing 359 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for Melissa Arbus Sherry, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11449033) filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Sherry, Melissa) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOSHUA R. THANE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #356 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY J. RANDY ROESER PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #355 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 Filing 356 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice (Joshua Thane), (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11447082) filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Thane, Joshua) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 5, 2017 Filing 355 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice (J. Randy Roeser), (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11445292) filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Roeser, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JENNIFER H. DOAN PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #353 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
June 5, 2017 Filing 353 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice (Jennifer H. Doan), (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11444930) filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Doan, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY GEOFFREY CULBERTSON PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #350 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY KELLLY TIDWELL PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #349 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 Filing 350 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for Geoffrey Culbertson, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11441885) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Culbertson, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 Filing 349 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for Kelly Tidwell, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11441769) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Tidwell, Kelly) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 1, 2017 Filing 348 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/5/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CRAIG N. TOLLIVER PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #342 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOHN B. CAMPBELL PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #341 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES E. QUIGLEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #343 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY KEVIN L. BURGESS PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #340 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 31, 2017 Filing 343 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for James L. Quigley, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11434908) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Quigley, James) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 31, 2017 Filing 342 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for Craig N. Tolliver, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11434872) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 31, 2017 Filing 341 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for John B. Campbell, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11434838) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Campbell, John) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 31, 2017 Filing 340 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for Kevin L. Burgess, (Filing Fee: $310, receipt number 0971-11434808) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 31, 2017 Filing 339 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-15 filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Adams Ryan, Stephanie) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/31/17. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 31, 2017 Filing 337 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 30, 2017 Filing 336 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Amazon.com Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 30, 2017 Filing 335 Certificate of Interested Entities by Amazon.com Inc and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 30, 2017 Filing 334 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Adams Ryan, Stephanie) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 30, 2017 Filing 333 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie M. Adams Ryan (Adams Ryan, Stephanie) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 26, 2017 Filing 332 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge Consent/Declination due by 6/2/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/2/2017. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 26, 2017 Filing 331 CLERK'S NOTICE acknowledging receipt of case transferring in from Eastern District of Texas. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 26, 2017 Filing 329 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 6:15-cv-01038. Original filed copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 5/26/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2017 Filing 330 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/22/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 23, 2017 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California. (mll, )
April 28, 2017 Filing 328 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Google Inc. for proceedings held on 04/04/2017 before Judge Robert Schroeder. (Perlson, David)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER granting #268 Sealed Motion to Transfer. The Court ORDERS that all claims asserted by Plaintiff Eolas Technologies Inc. against Amazon are TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California. Given the approaching deadlines under this Courts current docket control order, all deadlines are STAYED until the case is received and reassigned by the clerk of the Northern District of California and until further order of that Court. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/28/17. (mll, )
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER TO SEVER AND TRANSFER. All claims asserted by Plaintiff Eolas Technologies Inc. against Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC (6:15cv1040) are hereby SEVERED from the above-captioned action into a new cause of action. The filing fee for the severed cause of action against Wal-Mart Stores Texas is waived. The above-captioned action against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/28/17. (mll, )
April 28, 2017 ***Consolidated Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc (6:15cv1040) is SEVERED from this consolidated action and TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California per #326 Order.*** (mll, )
April 28, 2017 ***Consolidated Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC is SEVERED from this consolidated action and assigned to Civil Action 6:17cv242.*** (mll, )
April 28, 2017 Case Stayed pending transfer to the Northern District of California (or further Order of the Court). (mll, )
April 28, 2017 ***This civil action will be transferred to the Northern District of California on or after 5-19-2017, per Local Rule CV-83(b).*** (mll, )
April 24, 2017 Filing 325 RESPONSE in Opposition re #324 MOTION for Ruling re #269 Emergency MOTION to Stay filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
April 24, 2017 Filing 324 MOTION for Ruling re #269 Emergency MOTION to Stay by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER granting #321 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/20/17. (mll, )
April 17, 2017 Filing 322 ***CORRECTED DECLARATION FOR DOCUMENT #320 .***Sealed Document - Supplemental Declaration of Robert P. Schuwerk (Attachments: #1 Corrected Supplemental Declaration of Robert P. Schuwerk)(Dacus, Deron) Modified on 4/17/2017 (mjc, ).
April 17, 2017 Filing 321 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Supplemental Declaration of Robert P. Schuwerk by Latham & Watkins LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
April 14, 2017 Filing 320 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re #253 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Latham & Watkins as Counsel for Amazon.com, Inc. and Supporting Brief filed by Latham & Watkins LLP. (Attachments: #1 Crumbaugh Supplemental Declaration, #2 Murphy Supplemental Declaration, #3 Schuwerk Supplemental Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1)(Dacus, Deron)
April 11, 2017 Filing 319 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 4/4/17, before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Theresa Sawyer, Telephone number: 479/866-0140. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2017. (dlc, )
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER granting #315 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits and Extend Sur-Reply Deadline. Movant may exceed the Courts page limitations by up to five pages in its sur-reply in opposition to Eolass motion to disqualify Latham & Watkins LLP as counsel for Amazon. It is further ORDERED that Movant may file its sur-reply no later than April 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/10/2017. (rlf)
April 7, 2017 Filing 317 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #276 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Tolliver, Craig)
April 7, 2017 Filing 316 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #275 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment (Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(a)) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Burgess, Kevin)
April 6, 2017 Filing 315 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply and to Exceed Page Limits by Latham & Watkins LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
April 5, 2017 Filing 314 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #253 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Latham & Watkins as Counsel for Amazon.com, Inc. and Supporting Brief filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A, #2 Exhibit A-1 to A-3, #3 Affidavit B, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Affidavit C, #6 Affidavit D, #7 Exhibit D-1 to D-2, #8 Affidavit E, #9 Exhibit E1 to E-3, #10 Affidavit F, #11 Exhibit F-1 to F2)(Culbertson, Geoffrey)
April 4, 2017 Filing 313 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Motion Hearing held on 4/4/2017 re #269 Emergency MOTION to Stay filed by Amazon.com, Inc., and #268 SEALED MOTION - Renewed Motion to Transfer filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Court Reporter Theresa Sawyer) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER granting #303 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/03/17. (mll, )
April 1, 2017 Filing 311 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTATION REGARDING EOLAS TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED'S RESPONSE TO WALMART STORES TEXAS, LLC'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DKT. 291) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Response to Walmart's Statement of Alleged Undisputed Material Facts)(Burgess, Kevin)
March 31, 2017 Filing 310 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #275 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment (Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(a)) filed by Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Keville, John)
March 31, 2017 Filing 309 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #269 Emergency MOTION to Stay filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Tolliver, Craig)
March 31, 2017 Filing 308 REPLY to Response to Motion re #276 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Keville, John)
March 31, 2017 Filing 307 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #268 SEALED MOTION - Renewed Motion to Transfer filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order to motion to sever and transfer, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order denying motion to reconsider, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sec. 3844 Procedure for Transfer)(Burgess, Kevin)
March 31, 2017 Filing 306 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. DISREGARD.*** SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #268 SEALED MOTION - Renewed Motion to Transfer filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order re motion to sever and transfer, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order denying motion to reconsider, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sec. 3844 Procedure for Transfer)(Burgess, Kevin) Modified on 3/31/2017 (gsg).
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER granting #298 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/31/17. (mll, )
March 31, 2017 Filing 304 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #262 SEALED MOTION for Order to Show Cause Regarding McKool Smith's Violation of Prosecution Bar filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Quigley)(Budwin, Joshua)
March 31, 2017 Filing 303 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion For Leave To Exceed Page Limit And Extend Reply Deadline by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Culbertson, Geoffrey) #1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
March 31, 2017 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Sealed Sur-Reply submitted, Entry #306 . Should not be sealed. See entry #307 for corrected document. (gsg)
March 28, 2017 Filing 302 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #268 SEALED MOTION - Renewed Motion to Transfer filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
March 28, 2017 Filing 301 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Elana Nightingale Dawson on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6220032. (Dawson, Elana)
March 28, 2017 Filing 300 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Graham E. Phillips on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6220020. (Phillips, Graham)
March 28, 2017 Filing 299 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Arbus Sherry on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6219952. (Sherry, Melissa)
March 28, 2017 Filing 298 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 297 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/27/17. (mll, )
March 27, 2017 Filing 296 REPLY to Response to Motion re #269 Emergency MOTION to Stay filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Decl. of R. Frenkel, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Decl. of R. Frenkel, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Decl. of R. Frenkel, #4 Decl. of J. Doan)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 27, 2017 Filing 295 RESPONSE in Opposition re #276 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Burgess, Kevin)
March 27, 2017 Filing 294 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #275 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment (Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(a)) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of 2016 02 09 [Dkt. 16] Wal-Mart's Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of 2016 02 26 [Dkt. 22] SEALED Eolas Response to Wal-Mart's Mtn to Transfer, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2016 03 15 [Dkt. 27] SEALED Wal-mart Reply ISO Mtn to Transfer, #4 Exhibit 4 -2016 03 24 [Dkt. 30] SEALED Sur-Reply in Opp to Wal-Mart's Mtn to Transfer, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2016 09 29 [Dkt. 35] Memorandum and Order Denying MTC Venue, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2015 11 24 [Dkt. 1] Eolas Complaint for Patent Infringement, #7 Exhibit 7 -2016 02 24 [Dkt. 38] 2d Amended Complaint as to Wal-Mart, #8 Exhibit 8 - 2016 05 17 B. Vakil to J. Quigley re Infringement Contentions, #9 Exhibit 9 - 2016 05 20 Quigley Ltr to Def Counsel re E's Inf Cont, #10 Exhibit 10 - 2016 05 31 D. Perlson Ltr to J. Quigley re inf. contentions, #11 Exhibit 11 - 2016 06 07 J. Quigley Ltr to D. Perlson re Eolas's Inf. Contentions, #12 Exhibit 12 - 2016 06 07 V. Merideth service email, #13 Exhibit 13 - 2016 08 18 [Dkt. 155] Defs' Mtn to Strike Eolas's Inf Contentions, #14 Exhibit 14 - 2016 12 05 [Dkt. 205] Order Granting & Denying in Part Mtn to Strike Eolas's Inf. Cont, #15 Exhibit 15 - 2017 02 28 Martin Opening Report Walmart Appendix, #16 Exhibit 16 - 2017 03 16 Martin Supplemental Report Appendix W04 Product Viewer, #17 Exhibit 17 - 2017 02 28 Martin Opening Report Appendix W04 Product Viewer, #18 Exhibit 18 - 2017 02 28 Martin Opening Report Additional Evidence Other-browsers W04-product viewer, #19 Exhibit 19 - 2017 02 28 Martin Opening Report Additional Evidence How to Order, #20 Exhibit 20 - Excerpts of 2016 03 31 Infringement Contentions Exhibit W04 - Product Viewer, #21 Exhibit. 21 - Excerpts of 2016 03 31 Infringement Contentions Exhibit W01 - Cart, #22 Exhibit 22 - 2017 01 26 deposition transcript of Geoffrey Edwards, #23 Exhibit 23 - Excerpts of 2017 02 10 deposition transcript of Marco Tartaglia, #24 Exhibit 24 - Excerpts of 2017 01 26 deposition transcript of Helena Carol Johnston, #25 Exhibit 25 - WMT_EOLAS490575_RESTRICTED-ATTORNEYS' EYES ONLY, #26 Exhibit 26 - Excerpts of 2017 02 28 Ryan Sullivan Opening Expert Report, #27 Exhibit 27 - Dkt. 408, Genband US LLC v. Metaswitch Networks Corp.,et al, #28 Exhibit 28 - 2016 02 16 [Dkt. 20] Eolas's 1st Amended Complaint, #29 Exhibit 29 - 2017 02 28 Martin Opening Report Appendix W01 Cart, #30 Exhibit 30 - 2017 03 16 Martin Supplemental Report Appendix W01 Cart, #31 Declaration of James Quigley, #32 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting #289 Motion to Exceed Page Limits. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/27/17. (mll, )
March 25, 2017 Filing 292 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #256 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Amazon.com, Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 24, 2017 Filing 291 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #253 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Latham & Watkins as Counsel for Amazon.com, Inc. and Supporting Brief filed by Latham & Watkins LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Frenkel Declaration, #3 Exhibit A-1, #4 Exhibit A-2, #5 Exhibit A-3, #6 Exhibit A-4, #7 Exhibit A-5, #8 Exhibit A-6, #9 Exhibit A-7, #10 Exhibit A-8, #11 Exhibit A-9, #12 Exhibit A-10, #13 Exhibit A-11, #14 Exhibit A-12, #15 Exhibit A-13, #16 Exhibit A-14, #17 Exhibit A-15, #18 Exhibit A-16, #19 Exhibit A-17, #20 Crumbaugh Declaration, #21 Exhibit B-1, #22 Exhibit B-2, #23 Exhibit B-3, #24 Exhibit B-4, #25 Exhibit B-5, #26 Exhibit B-6, #27 Exhibit B-7, #28 Murphy Declaration, #29 Exhibit C-1, #30 Exhibit C-2, #31 Exhibit C-3, #32 Exhibit C-4, #33 Exhibit C-5, #34 Exhibit C-6, #35 Schuwerk Declaration, #36 Exhibit D-1, #37 Exhibit D-2, #38 Exhibit D-3, #39 Doan Declaration)(Dacus, Deron)
March 24, 2017 Filing 290 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #262 SEALED MOTION for Order to Show Cause Regarding McKool Smith's Violation of Prosecution Bar filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Doan, #2 Exhibit 25, #3 Exhibit 26, #4 Exhibit 27, #5 Exhibit 28)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 24, 2017 Filing 289 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limits by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 24, 2017 Filing 288 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #268 SEALED MOTION - Renewed Motion to Transfer filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Quigley, #2 Exhibit 1 - 5/12/16 Hearing Transcript Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 2 -Hayden Depo Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 3 - Galassi Depo Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 4 - Smith Depo Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 5 -Nicholls Depo Excerpts, #7 Exhibit 6 - Scott Depo Excerpts, #8 Exhibit 7 - Jewell Depo Excerpts, #9 Exhibit 8 - Nann Depo Excertps, #10 Exhibit 9 - Coddington Depo Excerpts, #11 Exhibit 10 - Jedda Depo Depo Excerpts, #12 Exhibit 11 - Washington Depo Excerpts, #13 Exhibit 12 - Eno Depo Excertps, #14 Exhibit 13 - Eno Subpoena, #15 Exhibit 14 - Martin Subpoena, #16 Exhibit 15 - Ang Subpoena, #17 Exhibit 16 - Krueger Subpoena, #18 Exhibit 17 - Martin Depo Excerpts, #19 Exhibit 18 - Krueger Depo Excerpts, #20 Exhibit 19 - Ang 2/8/17 Depo Excerpts, #21 Exhibit 20 - Ang 2/9 17 Depo Excerpts, #22 Exhibit 21 - Johnston Rough Depo Excerpts, #23 Exhibit 22 - Hung Email, #24 Exhibit 23 - Johnston Subpoena, #25 Exhibit 24 - Robertson Subpoena, #26 Exhibit 25 - UC Regents Subpoena, #27 Exhibit 26 - Rajdev Depo Excerpts, #28 Exhibit 27 - Robdertson Depo Excerpts, #29 Exhibit 28 - Truelove Email, #30 Exhibit 29 Amazon's 3rd Supp Initial Disclosures, #31 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting #281 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Amazon to reply to Plaintiff's Response to Amazon.com Inc.'s Motion for Order to Show Cause (Docket No. 274) is extended to 3-24-2017. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/24/17. (mll, )
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting #280 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Amazon's Renewed Motion to Transfer (Dkt. No. 268). Amazon.com, Inc. shall file its reply in support of its Renewed Motion to Transfer by 3-28-2017, and Eolas shall file any sur-reply thereto by 3-31-2017. Setting Hearing on Motion #268 SEALED MOTION - Renewed Motion to Transfer, #276 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Stay Proceedings :( Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2017 10:00 AM in Texarkana Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/24/17. (mll, )
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER granting #279 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Plaintiff Eolas Technologies, Inc. shall file its response in opposition to Docket No. 275 by 3-27-2017, the Walmart parties shall file any reply thereto by 3-31-2017 and Eolas shall file any sur-reply thereto by 4-07-2017. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/24/17. (mll, )
March 22, 2017 Filing 284 RESPONSE in Opposition re #269 Emergency MOTION to Stay filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig Tolliver, #2 Exhibit 1 - Advanced Mktg. v. CVS, #3 Exhibit 2 - CYVA Research Holding v. Locklizard, #4 Exhibit 3 - Coddington depo excerpts, #5 Exhibit 4 -Galassi depo excerpts, #6 Exhibit 5 - Hayden depo excerpts, #7 Exhibit 6 - Jewell depo excerpts, #8 Exhibit 7 -Nann depo excerpts, #9 Exhibit 8 - Nicholls depo excerpts, #10 Exhibit 9 - Scott depo excerpts, #11 Exhibit 10 - Smith depo excerpts, #12 Exhibit 11 - Washington depo excerpts, #13 Exhibit 12 - Ang depo excerpts 2/8/17, #14 Exhibit 13 - Ang depo excerpts 2/9/17, #15 Exhibit 14 - Krueger depo excerpts, #16 Exhibit 15 - Stetson depo excerpts, #17 Exhibit 16 - Swords depo excerpts, #18 Text of Proposed Order)(Tolliver, Craig)
March 22, 2017 Filing 283 ***INCORRECT LINKAGE. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** RESPONSE in Opposition re #276 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig Tolliver, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Text of Proposed Order)(Tolliver, Craig) Modified on 3/22/2017 (gsg).
March 22, 2017 Filing 282 RESPONSE in Opposition re #281 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Amazon's Motion for Order to Show Cause filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
March 22, 2017 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Response, Entry #283 . Document Linked Incorrectly. (gsg)
March 21, 2017 Filing 281 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Amazon's Motion for Order to Show Cause by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 21, 2017 Filing 280 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Amazon's Renewed Motion to Transfer (Dkt. No. 268) by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 20, 2017 Filing 279 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Emergency Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. 275] by Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vakil, Bijal)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting #277 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Plaintiff Eolas Technologies, Inc. shall file its response in opposition to Docket No. #276 by March 27, 2017; the Walmart parties shall file any reply by March 31, 2017; and Eolas shall file any sur-reply by April 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/17/2017. (rlf)
March 16, 2017 Filing 277 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Emergency Motion to Stay Proceedings (Dkt. No. 276) by Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vakil, Bijal)
March 15, 2017 Filing 276 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vakil, Bijal)
March 15, 2017 Filing 275 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment (Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(a)) by Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Walmart Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Exhibit A - Johnston Dep, #3 Exhibit B - Edwards Dep, #4 Exhibit C - Eolas March 31 2016 PR 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures, #5 Exhibit C1 - Exhibit W01 - Cart, #6 Exhibit C2 - Exhibit W02 - Lists, #7 Exhibit C3 - Exhibit W03 - Product Feedback, #8 Exhibit C4 - Exhibit W04 - Product Viewer, #9 Exhibit C5 - Exhibit W05 - Search, #10 Exhibit C6 - Exhibit W06 - Shoveler, #11 Exhibit C7 part 1 - Exhibit W07 - VUDU, #12 Exhibit C7 part 2 - Exhibit W07 - VUDU, #13 Exhibit C7 part 3 - Exhibit W07 - VUDU, #14 Exhibit C7 part 4 - Exhibit W07 - VUDU, #15 Exhibit D - Feb. 28 2017 Expert Report of Dr. David Martin, #16 Exhibit D1 - Appendix W (Walmart), #17 Exhibit D2 - Appendix W01 Cart, #18 Exhibit D3 - Appendix W04 Product Viewer, #19 Exhibit D4 - Appendix W05 Search, #20 Exhibit D5 - Appendix W06 Carousel, #21 Exhibit E - Feb. 28 2017 Expert Report of Dr. Ryan Sullivan, #22 Exhibit F - Feb. 23 2017 Expert Report of Dr. Elliot S. Schwartz, #23 Exhibit G -March 7 2016 Letter from Vakil to Burgess and Quigley, #24 Exhibit H - August 15 2016 Letter from Vakil to Burgess, #25 Exhibit I - March 1 2017 Letter from Vakil to Burgess, #26 Exhibit J - March 2 2017 Email from Burgess to Vakil, #27 Exhibit K - March 9 2017 Email from Burgess to Vakil, #28 Text of Proposed Order)(Vakil, Bijal)
March 14, 2017 Filing 274 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #262 SEALED MOTION for Order to Show Cause Regarding McKool Smith's Violation of Prosecution Bar filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Josh Budwin, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Budwin, Joshua)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting #270 Motion to Expedite Briefing Regarding #269 Motion to Stay. The Court ORDERS the following briefing schedule for Amazon's Motion: Eolas's response is due on 3-22-2017; Amazon.com Inc.'s reply is due on 3-27-2017; Eolas's sur-reply is due on 3-31-2017. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/14/17. (mll, )
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting #271 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/14/17. (mll, )
March 13, 2017 Filing 271 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
March 10, 2017 Filing 270 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Emergency Motion to Stay Proceedings (Dkt. No. 269) by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 10, 2017 Filing 269 Emergency MOTION to Stay by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 10, 2017 Filing 268 SEALED MOTION - Renewed Motion to Transfer by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of A. Makker, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting #266 Motion for Extension of Time. Movant shall have to 3-24-2017 to file its response and said response may exceed the page limitation by ten pages. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/07/17. (mll, )
March 7, 2017 NOTICE: Member Case No. 6:15-cv-1039 transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:17-cv-01138, filed 03/06/2017, per #251 Order to Transfer. (rlf)
March 6, 2017 Filing 266 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Latham & Watkins LLP as Counsel for Amazon.com, Inc. and for Response to Exceed Page Limitation by Latham & Watkins LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting #259 Motion for Leave to File. Movant Latham & Watkins LLP's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Notice of Appearance for Its Attorney of Record is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/03/17. (mll, )
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting #257 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael E Jones and Earl Glenn Thames, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/03/17. (mll, )
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting #261 Motion to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/03/17. (mll, )
March 2, 2017 Filing 262 SEALED MOTION for Order to Show Cause Regarding McKool Smith's Violation of Prosecution Bar by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 2, 2017 Filing 261 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limits by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 2, 2017 Filing 260 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Latham & Watkins LLP (Dacus, Deron)
March 2, 2017 Filing 259 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Appearance for Its Attorney of Record by Latham & Watkins LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting #252 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/1/2017. (gsg)
March 1, 2017 Filing 257 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mike Jones and Glenn Thames by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 256 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/1/2017. (rlf)
February 28, 2017 Filing 255 NOTICE by Amazon.com, Inc. Final Election of Asserted Prior Art (Doan, Jennifer)
February 28, 2017 Filing 254 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC Notice of Compliance with Final Election of Asserted Prior Art (Eastern District of Texas General Order 13-20) (Vakil, Bijal)
February 28, 2017 Filing 253 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Latham & Watkins as Counsel for Amazon.com, Inc. and Supporting Brief by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A - Declaration of Michael D. Doyle, #2 Exhibit A-1 to A-14 to Declaration of Doyle, #3 Affidavit B - Declaration of Mark C. Swords, #4 Exhibit B-1 to B-2 to Declaration of Swords, #5 Affidavit C - Declaration of James L. Stetson, #6 Affidavit D - Declaration of Geoffrey Culbertson, #7 Exhibit D-1 to D-4 to Declaration of Geoffrey Culbertson, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Culbertson, Geoffrey)
February 28, 2017 Filing 252 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages - Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Latham & Watkins as Counsel for Amazon.com, Inc. and Supporting Brief by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Culbertson, Geoffrey)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Court GRANTS Google Inc.s motion and ORDERS that Case No. 6:15-cv-1039 (Member case) filed by Plaintiff Eolas Technologies, Inc. against Google Inc. is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/24/2017. (rlf)
February 24, 2017 Filing 250 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #241 MOTION for Leave to File A SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR PATENT RULE 3-3 INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND RULE 3-4(b) DOCUMENT PRODUCTION (Dkt. 203) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Burgess, Kevin)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 249 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER granting petition for writ of mandamus. Google's requested relief is granted and the District Court is instructed to transfer the case to the Northern District of California. Issued: February 23, 2017. Chief Judge Prost; Circuit Judges: Lourie and Linn. Dissent filed by Circuit Judge Linn. (dlc, )
February 22, 2017 Filing 248 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #232 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER granting #224 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/22/17. (mll, )
February 16, 2017 Filing 246 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #241 MOTION for Leave to File A SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR PATENT RULE 3-3 INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND RULE 3-4(b) DOCUMENT PRODUCTION (Dkt. 203) filed by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Perlson, David)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting #244 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/16/2017. (rlf)
February 15, 2017 Filing 244 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 9, 2017 Filing 243 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #241 MOTION for Leave to File A SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR PATENT RULE 3-3 INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND RULE 3-4(b) DOCUMENT PRODUCTION (Dkt. 203) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
February 2, 2017 Filing 242 BRIEF filed DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR PATENT RULE 3-3 INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND RULE 3-4(b) DOCUMENT PRODUCTION (Dkt. 203) by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael D. Powell, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Powell, Michael)
February 2, 2017 Filing 241 MOTION for Leave to File A SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR PATENT RULE 3-3 INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND RULE 3-4(b) DOCUMENT PRODUCTION (Dkt. 203) by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powell, Michael)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting #235 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jennifer Ann Van Dusen terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 01/25/17. (mll, )
January 25, 2017 Filing 239 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly B Tidwell on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Tidwell, Kelly)
January 25, 2017 Filing 238 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey Patton Culbertson on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Culbertson, Geoffrey)
January 23, 2017 Filing 237 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Hess on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Hess, Kevin)
January 23, 2017 Filing 236 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig N Tolliver on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Tolliver, Craig)
January 23, 2017 Filing 235 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. David Folsom added as Mediator. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 01/23/17. (mll, )
January 19, 2017 Filing 233 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Stephen Schlichter on behalf of Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC (Schlichter, Eric)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 01/17/17. (mll, )
January 13, 2017 Filing 231 RESPONSE in Opposition re #221 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Previous Litigation Documents and Email Production from Eolas Technologies Incorporated filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
January 11, 2017 Filing 230 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Lawrence Green, III on behalf of Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC (Green, Robert)
January 11, 2017 Filing 229 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John R Keville on behalf of Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC (Keville, John)
January 10, 2017 Filing 228 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated NOTICE OF FINAL ELECTION OF ASSERTED CLAIMS (Burgess, Kevin)
January 5, 2017 Filing 227 NOTICE by Google Inc. re #221 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Previous Litigation Documents and Email Production from Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Notice of Joinder) (Perlson, David)
January 5, 2017 Filing 226 NOTICE by Amazon.com, Inc. re #221 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Previous Litigation Documents and Email Production from Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Notice of Joinder) (Doan, Jennifer)
January 4, 2017 Filing 225 ANSWER to #215 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Eolas Technologies Incorporated.(Burgess, Kevin)
January 3, 2017 Filing 224 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL GOOGLE TO PRODUCE LICENSES by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
December 29, 2016 Filing 223 NOTICE by Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC re #221 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Previous Litigation Documents and Email Production from Eolas Technologies Incorporated Certificate of Conference (Vakil, Bijal)
December 29, 2016 Filing 222 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #165 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
December 29, 2016 Filing 221 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Previous Litigation Documents and Email Production from Eolas Technologies Incorporated by Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Bijal V. Vakil, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Vakil, Bijal)
December 29, 2016 Filing 220 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blake Richard Davis on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Davis, Blake)
December 21, 2016 Filing 219 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #203 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Motion for Leave to Supplement Their Patent Rule 3-3 Invalidity Contentions and Rule 3-4(b) Document Production filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Burgess, Kevin)
December 20, 2016 Filing 218 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Proceedings held on 11/2/2016 before Judge Robert Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber Theresa Sawyer. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/13/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/23/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/23/2017. (tlh, )
December 19, 2016 Filing 217 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated re #209 Order, (Burgess, Kevin)
December 13, 2016 Filing 216 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
December 13, 2016 Filing 215 ANSWER to #33 Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by Amazon.com, Inc..(Doan, Jennifer)
December 13, 2016 Filing 214 REPLY to Response to Motion re #203 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Motion for Leave to Supplement Their Patent Rule 3-3 Invalidity Contentions and Rule 3-4(b) Document Production filed by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Felipe Corredor, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Powell, Michael)
December 9, 2016 Filing 213 USCA FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER filed. Eolas Technologies Inc is directed to respond to the petition for writ of mandamus within 10 days from the date of filing of this order. Any reply must be received within 5 days from the date of filing of the response re USCA FEDERAL CIRCUIT case no. 17-107. (tkd, )
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court adopts the constructions as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/08/16. (mll, )
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/08/16. (mll, )
December 7, 2016 Filing 210 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT NOTICE OF DOCKETING. A petition for writ of mandamus has been filed by Google Inc. USCA-Federal Circuit Case No. 17-107. (Attachments: #1 Key Rule Changes)(dlc, )
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER that following a meet and confer, parties may file a joint sealed motion stating their respective positions to redact limited portions of 208 Sealed Order no later than 12-23-2016. The Court plans to issue an unsealed version no later than 12-30-2016. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/07/16. (mll, )
December 6, 2016 Filing 207 RESPONSE to #190 Notice (Other), Amazon's Responsive Statement Regarding Eolas's Citation of Supplemental Authority filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
December 6, 2016 Filing 206 RESPONSE in Opposition re #203 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Motion for Leave to Supplement Their Patent Rule 3-3 Invalidity Contentions and Rule 3-4(b) Document Production filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James E. Quigley, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #155 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/05/16. (mll, )
November 28, 2016 Filing 204 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated re #197 Order, (Burgess, Kevin)
November 23, 2016 Filing 203 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Motion for Leave to Supplement Their Patent Rule 3-3 Invalidity Contentions and Rule 3-4(b) Document Production by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael D. Powell, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Powell, Michael)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER denying without prejudice #88 Motion for Summary Judgment of No Invalid Patent Term Adjustment. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/23/16. (mll, )
November 22, 2016 Filing 201 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carl G Anderson on behalf of Google Inc. (Anderson, Carl)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting #199 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The deadline for Amazon to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement is extended to 12-13-2016. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/22/16. (mll, )
November 18, 2016 Filing 199 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #33 Amended Complaint by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
November 16, 2016 Filing 198 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark A Lemley on behalf of Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC (Lemley, Mark)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER that following a meet and confer, parties may file a joint sealed motion stating their respective positions to redact limited portions of #196 Sealed Order no later than 11-29-2016. The Court plans to issue an unsealed version no later than 12-06-2016. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/15/16. (mll, )
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ***VACATED See #249 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER*** UNSEALED PER PARTIES' NOTICE #204 *** ORDER denying #48 Sealed Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/15/16. (mll, ) Modified on 11/22/2016 (mll, ). Modified on 12/1/2016 (bas). Modified on 2/23/2017 (dlc, ).
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting #194 Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Shahzeb Akhtar. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/14/16. (mll, )
November 7, 2016 Filing 194 STIPULATION Joint Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Mr. Shahzeb Akhtar by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order granting Parties' Joint Stipulation)(Perlson, David)
November 7, 2016 Filing 193 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Amazon.com, Inc. for proceedings held on 11/2/2016 Markman Hearing before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (Kinsel, Grant)
November 4, 2016 Filing 192 NOTICE by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC re #130 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Eolas' Motion for Summary Judgment of No Invalidity Based on 35 U.S.C. 101 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Doan, Jennifer)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER denying #182 Motion to Strike, but granting the alternative relief. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/03/16. (mll, )
November 3, 2016 Filing 190 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated re #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY BASED ON 35 U.S.C. SECTION 101 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Burgess, Kevin)
November 3, 2016 Filing 189 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated NOTICE OF HEARING PRESENTATION SLIDES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Burgess, Kevin)
November 3, 2016 Filing 188 NOTICE by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC Defendants' Notice of Hearing Presentation Slides (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
November 2, 2016 Filing 187 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC for proceedings held on 11/2/2016 Markman Hearing before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (Wang, Allen)
November 2, 2016 Filing 186 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Google Inc. for proceedings held on 11/2/2016 Markman Hearing before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (Perlson, David)
November 2, 2016 Filing 185 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Markman Hearing held on 11/2/2016. (Court Reporter Theresa Sawyer) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
November 1, 2016 Filing 184 RESPONSE in Opposition re #182 MOTION to Strike Eolas' Untimely Supplemental Opinion (Dkt. 179-3), or in the Alternative Supplement the Claim-Construction Record Thereto filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Burgess, Kevin)
November 1, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing: TIME CHANGE ONLY: Markman Hearing set for 11/2/2016 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (SMC)
October 31, 2016 Filing 183 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earl Glenn Thames, Jr on behalf of Google Inc. (Thames, Earl)
October 27, 2016 Filing 182 MOTION to Strike Eolas' Untimely Supplemental Opinion (Dkt. 179-3), or in the Alternative Supplement the Claim-Construction Record Thereto by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
October 24, 2016 Filing 181 USCA ORDER directing Eolas Technologies Incorporated to respond to the petition for writ of mandamus no later than seven days from the date of this order. Any reply must be filed not later than three days from the date of the response. Issued on 10/24/16. (dlc, )
October 21, 2016 Filing 180 NOTICE of Docketing from USCA - FEDERAL CIRCUIT of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Google Inc on 10/21/2016. USCA - FEDERAL CIRCUIT Miscellaneous Case Number 17-103 (Attachments: #1 Key Rule Changes)(tkd, )
October 18, 2016 Filing 179 REPLY to #168 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K, #2 Exhibit L, #3 Supplemental Declaration of David M. Martin, Jr. PH.D., #4 Appendix 1, #5 Appendix 2, #6 Appendix 3, #7 Appendix 4)(Burgess, Kevin)
October 18, 2016 Filing 178 JOINT Claim Construction Chart by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Burgess, Kevin)
October 14, 2016 Filing 177 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated NOTICE OF TIME ESTIMATE FOR MARKMAN HEARING (Burgess, Kevin)
October 14, 2016 Filing 176 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Liang Xu on behalf of Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC (Xu, Jason)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #171 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's opening claim construction brief is extended to 10-11-2016, and the deadline for Plaintiff to reply to Defendants' responsive claim construction brief is extended to 10-18-2016. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/12/16. (mll, )
October 11, 2016 Filing 174 RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1 to Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief - Disputed Claim Terms, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Declaration of Dr. Todd Mowry in Support of Defendants' Claim Construction Positions, #17 Appendix 1 to the Declaration of Dr. Todd Mowry)(Perlson, David)
October 11, 2016 Filing 173 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Franklin Garvish, II on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Garvish, John)
October 11, 2016 Filing 172 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Wright Budwin on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Budwin, Joshua)
October 5, 2016 Filing 171 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Amend Certain Claim Construction Deadlines by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER appointing David Keyzer as technical advisor with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendant and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/03/16. (mll, )
September 21, 2016 Filing 169 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC Defendants Notice of Compliance with Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art (Eastern District of Texas General Order 13-20) (Vakil, Bijal)
September 16, 2016 Filing 168 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Martin, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Burgess, Kevin)
September 14, 2016 Filing 167 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated NOTICE OF SELECTION OF TECHNICAL ADVISOR (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Burgess, Kevin)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting #161 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Derek Tang is withdrawn ascounsel for Google Inc. in this action. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/8/16. (mjc, )
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #164 Motion to Amend/Correct the DCO. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/8/16. (mjc, )
September 7, 2016 Filing 164 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #152 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
September 7, 2016 Filing 163 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY ELECTION OF ASSERTED CLAIMS (Burgess, Kevin)
September 6, 2016 Filing 162 RESPONSE in Opposition re #155 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Motion to Strike Eolas' Infringement Contentions filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
September 1, 2016 Filing 161 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Google Inc.. (Perlson, David)
August 30, 2016 Filing 160 NOTICE by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC re #48 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer To The Northern District of California of Request for Ruling on Motions to Transfer, including #21 in 6:15cv1039 and #16 in 6:15cv1040 (Jones, Michael)
August 24, 2016 Filing 159 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Vakil, Bijal)
August 24, 2016 Filing 158 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Google Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #156 Motion for Leave to Brief Additional Claim Terms. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/24/16. (mll, )
August 23, 2016 Filing 156 Unopposed MOTION For Leave to Brief Additional Claim Terms by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
August 18, 2016 Filing 155 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Motion to Strike Eolas' Infringement Contentions by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
August 17, 2016 Filing 154 Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Burgess, Kevin)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #147 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. The deadline to amend pleadings and add inequitable conduct allegations is extended to 8-10-2016, and the deadline to respond to amended pleadings is extended to 8-24-2016. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/17/16. (mll, )
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #149 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/17/16. (mll, )
August 10, 2016 Filing 151 AMENDED ANSWER to #34 Amended Complaint by Google Inc..(Perlson, David)
August 10, 2016 Filing 150 AMENDED ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint (Second) by Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Vakil, Bijal)
August 9, 2016 Filing 149 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #99 Order, Set Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
August 4, 2016 Filing 148 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Felipe Corredor, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Perlson, David)
August 3, 2016 Filing 147 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings and Respond to Amended Pleadings by Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #145 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #145 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Invalidity Based on 35 U.S.C. 101. Replies due by 8/4/2016. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/2/16. (mjc, )
July 29, 2016 Filing 145 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Invalidity Based on 35 U.S.C. 101 by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
July 21, 2016 Filing 144 REPLY to Response to Motion re #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Van Dusen, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Burgess, Kevin)
July 21, 2016 Filing 143 NOTICE by Amazon.com, Inc. (Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-2) (Doan, Jennifer)
July 21, 2016 Filing 142 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE OF PRELIMINARY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE [P.R. 4-2] (Vakil, Bijal)
July 21, 2016 Filing 141 NOTICE by Google Inc. NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE OF PRELIMINARY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE [P.R. 4-2] (Perlson, David)
July 21, 2016 Filing 140 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE OF PRELIMINARY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE [P.R. 4-2] (Burgess, Kevin)
July 20, 2016 Filing 139 STIPULATION Joint Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Mr. Bineet Bhasin and Mr. Mitchell Taylor by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Mr. Bineet Bhasin and Mr. Mitchell Taylor)(Perlson, David)
July 18, 2016 Filing 138 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Lewis Townsend on behalf of Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC (Townsend, Stephen)
July 15, 2016 Filing 137 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NO INVALID PATENT TERM ADJUSTMENT Google and Walmart's Sur-Reply to Eolas' Motion for Summary Judgement and Alternative Request for Discovery Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(d) filed by Google Inc.. (Perlson, David)
July 15, 2016 Filing 136 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NO INVALID PATENT TERM ADJUSTMENT filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #128 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response toPlaintiff's Combined Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of No Invalid Patent Term Adjustment. Defendants' responses are due by 7/15/2016. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/7/16. (mjc, )
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #133 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #133 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Replies due by 7/21/2016. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/7/16. (mjc, )
July 1, 2016 Filing 133 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
June 30, 2016 Filing 132 NOTICE by Amazon.com, Inc. (Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-1) (Doan, Jennifer)
June 30, 2016 Filing 131 NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Perlson, David)
June 29, 2016 Filing 130 RESPONSE in Opposition re #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY BASED ON 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Felipe Corredor, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Perlson, David)
June 29, 2016 Filing 129 NOTICE by Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Wang, Allen)
June 29, 2016 Filing 128 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Combined Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of No Invalid Patent Term Adjustment by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 29, 2016 Filing 127 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE OF PROPOSED TERMS AND CLAIM ELEMENTS FOR CONSTRUCTION [PATENT L.R. 4-1] (Burgess, Kevin)
June 24, 2016 Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NO INVALID PATENT TERM ADJUSTMENT filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Quigley, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17)(Burgess, Kevin)
June 17, 2016 Filing 125 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated re #48 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer To The Northern District of California NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO TRANSFER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Burgess, Kevin)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #121 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #121 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Invalidity Based on 35 U.S.C. 101. Responses due by 6/29/2016. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/13/16. (mjc, )
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #122 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #122 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NO INVALID PATENT TERM ADJUSTMENT . Replies due by 6/24/2016. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/13/16. (mjc, )
June 10, 2016 Filing 122 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NO INVALID PATENT TERM ADJUSTMENT by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
June 10, 2016 Filing 121 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Invalidity Based on 35 U.S.C. 101 by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
June 9, 2016 Filing 120 RESPONSE to #114 Notice (Other), Amazon's Response to Eolas's Notice Identifying Inventor Documents in the Northern District of California filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
June 6, 2016 Filing 119 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NO INVALID PATENT TERM ADJUSTMENT Google and Walmarts Opposition to Eolas Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternative Request for Discovery Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(d) filed by Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Allen Wang, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Affidavit of David Perlson, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Vakil, Bijal) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2016: #15 Certificate of Service) (gsg, ).
June 6, 2016 Filing 118 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NO INVALID PATENT TERM ADJUSTMENT and Request Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(d) to Take Discovery filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Kinsel Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 3, 2016 Filing 117 NOTICE by Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Wang, Allen)
June 3, 2016 Filing 116 NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Perlson, David)
June 3, 2016 Filing 115 NOTICE by Amazon.com, Inc. Notice of Compliance (Doan, Jennifer)
June 3, 2016 Filing 114 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated re #48 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer To The Northern District of California NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO TRANSFER (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cheong S. Ang, #2 Declaration of David C. Martin)(Burgess, Kevin)
June 2, 2016 Filing 113 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric E Lancaster on behalf of Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC (Lancaster, Eric)
May 31, 2016 Filing 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Quigley, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #110 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NO INVALID PATENT TERM ADJUSTMENT; Responses due by 6/6/2016. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/27/16. (mll, )
May 26, 2016 Filing 110 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NO INVALID PATENT TERM ADJUSTMENT by Amazon.com, Inc., Google Inc., Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 18, 2016 Filing 109 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 05/12/16 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Smith, CSR, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number: 903-794-1018 (brenda_smith@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/13/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2016. (bhs, )
May 16, 2016 Filing 108 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Howard Yu on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Yu, Nicholas)
May 16, 2016 Per law clerk, motions #68 Motion for Docket Control Order, #70 Motion for Discovery Order, and #71 Motion for Protective Order are terminated. Per instructions given at scheduling conference, the parties have refiled. (bas, )
May 13, 2016 Filing 107 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Google Inc. for proceedings held on 5/12/2016 - Motion Hearing before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (Perlson, David)
May 13, 2016 Filing 106 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC for proceedings held on 5/12/2016 - Motion Hearing before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (Vakil, Bijal)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER during hearing denying #101 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder III on 5/12/2016. (bas)
May 12, 2016 Filing 105 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III: Motion Hearing held on 5/12/2016 re #48 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer To The Northern District of California filed by Amazon.com, Inc., and #101 Emergency MOTION to Strike #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NO INVALID PATENT TERM ADJUSTMENT filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Court Reporter Brenda Smith) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
May 11, 2016 Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition re #101 Emergency MOTION to Strike #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NO INVALID PATENT TERM ADJUSTMENT filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
May 10, 2016 Filing 103 NOTICE by Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC re #101 Emergency MOTION to Strike #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NO INVALID PATENT TERM ADJUSTMENT Walmart's Notice of Joinder (Vakil, Bijal)
May 10, 2016 Filing 102 NOTICE by Google Inc. re #101 Emergency MOTION to Strike #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NO INVALID PATENT TERM ADJUSTMENT Google's Notice of Joinder (Perlson, David)
May 9, 2016 Filing 101 Emergency MOTION to Strike #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NO INVALID PATENT TERM ADJUSTMENT by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 9, 2016 Filing 100 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated to #85 Sealed Motion filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Burgess, Kevin)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2017 09:00 AM in Texarkana Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Selection set for 9/18/2017 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Trial set for 9/25/2017 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Markman Hearing set for 11/2/2016 09:00 AM in Texarkana Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Pretrial Conference set for 9/7/2017 10:00 AM in Texarkana Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/05/16. (mll, )
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/05/16. (mll, )
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/05/16. (mll, )
April 29, 2016 Filing 96 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
April 29, 2016 Filing 95 Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
April 29, 2016 Filing 94 Joint MOTION Entry of Discovery Order by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
April 29, 2016 Filing 93 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Eolas Technologies Incorporated re #48 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer To The Northern District of California (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Burgess, Kevin)
April 29, 2016 Filing 92 NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Perlson, David)
April 29, 2016 Filing 91 NOTICE by Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC Service of Initial Disclosures (Vakil, Bijal)
April 29, 2016 Filing 90 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated NOTICE OF DISCLOSURES (Burgess, Kevin)
April 28, 2016 Filing 89 NOTICE by Amazon.com, Inc. Notice of Compliance with Paragraphs 1 and 3 of the Joint Proposed Discovery Order (Doan, Jennifer)
April 27, 2016 Filing 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NO INVALID PATENT TERM ADJUSTMENT by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Quigley, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #84 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/27/16. (mll, )
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #83 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/27/16. (mll, )
April 25, 2016 Filing 85 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION Brief In Support of Its Motion To Dismiss For Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer To The Northern District of California by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 25, 2016 Filing 84 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Its Supplemental Brief In Support of Its Motion To Dismiss For Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, to Transfer To The Northern District of California by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 25, 2016 Filing 83 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Its Supplemental Brief In Support of Its Motion To Dismiss For Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, to Transfer To The Northern District of California by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER that parties file an updated Discovery Order, Docket Control Order, and Protective Order incorporating the limitations set in this Order, by 4-29-2016. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/21/16. (mll, )
April 15, 2016 Filing 81 Joint MOTION for Protective Order WITH SEVERAL POINTS OF DISAGREEMENT by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
April 15, 2016 Filing 80 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A DOCKET CONTROL ORDER WITH POINTS OF DISAGREEMENT by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
April 15, 2016 Filing 79 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A DISCOVERY ORDER WITH ONE POINT OF DISAGREEMENT by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
April 15, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions #48 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer To The Northern District of California ; docket no. 21 - Sealed Motion to Transfer in cause no. 6:15cv1039; and docket no. 16 - Motion to Change Venue in cause no. 6:15cv1040. Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2016 10:30 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (bas) Modified on 4/15/2016 (bas).
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/14/16. (mll, )
April 11, 2016 Filing 77 JOINT NOTICE of Agreed Designation of Mediator, Honorable David Folsom, filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Burgess, Kevin) M
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #72 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/07/16. (mll, )
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 E-DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/07/16. (mll, )
April 7, 2016 Filing 74 Scheduling conference held on 4/7/2016 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (bas) (bas, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2016: #1 Exhibit Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas, ).
April 5, 2016 Filing 73 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #48 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer To The Northern District of California filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 40, #2 Exhibit 41, #3 Exhibit 42, #4 Exhibit 43, #5 Exhibit 44, #6 Exhibit 45)(Burgess, Kevin)
April 5, 2016 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION to Seal SUR-REPLY TO AMAZON'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
April 4, 2016 Filing 71 Joint MOTION for Protective Order WITH SEVERAL POINTS OF DISAGREEMENT by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
April 4, 2016 Filing 70 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DOCKET CONTROL ORDER WITH POINTS OF DISAGREEMENT by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
April 4, 2016 Filing 69 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN AGREED E-DISCOVERY ORDER by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
April 4, 2016 Filing 68 Joint MOTION ENTRY OF A DISCOVERY ORDER WITH SEVERAL POINTS OF DISAGREEMENT by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #57 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/04/16. (mll, )
April 1, 2016 Filing 66 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Leigh Truelove on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Truelove, Jennifer)
April 1, 2016 Filing 65 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
April 1, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Attendance at Scheduling Conference (Perlson, David)
April 1, 2016 Filing 63 NOTICE by Amazon.com, Inc. (Notice of Attorneys Attending Scheduling Conference) (Doan, Jennifer)
April 1, 2016 Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Ann Van Dusen on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Van Dusen, Jennifer)
April 1, 2016 Filing 61 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated NOTICE REGARDING SERVICE OF P.R. 3-1 AND 3-2 DISCLOSURES (Burgess, Kevin)
April 1, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated NOTICE REGARDING ATTENDEES OF APRIL 7, 2016 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Burgess, Kevin)
April 1, 2016 Filing 59 NOTICE by Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC of Attendance at Scheduling Conference (Heartfield, J)
March 28, 2016 Filing 58 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #48 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer To The Northern District of California filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 28, 2016 Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to the Northern District of California by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 28, 2016 Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Amit Makker on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5678418. (Makker, Amit)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #52 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/22/16. (mll, )
March 18, 2016 Filing 54 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #53 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Mark Swords' Declaration - Exhibit 1)(Burgess, Kevin)
March 18, 2016 Filing 53 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #48 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer To The Northern District of California filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cheong Ang, #2 Declaration of David C. Martin, #3 Declaration of Mark Swords, #4 Declaration of Michael Doyle, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25, #30 Exhibit 26, #31 Exhibit 27, #32 Exhibit 28, #33 Exhibit 29, #34 Exhibit 30, #35 Exhibit 31, #36 Exhibit 32, #37 Exhibit 33, #38 Exhibit 34, #39 Exhibit 35, #40 Exhibit 36, #41 Exhibit 37, #42 Exhibit 38, #43 Exhibit 39, #44 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
March 18, 2016 Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION to Seal RESPONSE TO AMAZON'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
March 15, 2016 Filing 51 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint by Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC.(Vakil, Bijal)
March 9, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Grant E Kinsel on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Kinsel, Grant)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Amazon's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/8/16. (mjc, )
March 4, 2016 Filing 48 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer To The Northern District of California by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Cutts Declaration, #23 Davis Declaration, #24 Diedrich Declaration, #25 Fischer Declaration, #26 Jewell Declaration, #27 Martin Declaration)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 4, 2016 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Its Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer to the Northern District of California by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 4, 2016 Filing 46 ANSWER to #34 Amended Complaint by Google Inc..(Perlson, David)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Walmart shall respond to the Second Amended Complaint by 3-15-2016. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/03/16. (mll, )
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 4/7/2016 10:00 AM in Texarkana Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/02/16. (mll, )
March 2, 2016 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #38 Amended Complaint by Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vakil, Bijal)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Withdraw ; withdrawing #21 Sealed Motion to Dismiss or Transfer. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/29/16. (mll, )
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/25/16. (mll, )
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mario A Apreotesi terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/25/16. (mll, )
February 25, 2016 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #21 SEALED MOTION To Dismiss For Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer To The Northern District of California (as Moot) by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 24, 2016 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Burgess, Kevin)
February 24, 2016 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO WAL-MART by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
February 24, 2016 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Mario Apreotesi by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
February 16, 2016 Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Burgess, Kevin)
February 16, 2016 Filing 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Google Inc., filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Burgess, Kevin)
February 16, 2016 Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Amazon.com, Inc., filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Burgess, Kevin)
February 16, 2016 Filing 32 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Amazon.com, Inc., filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Burgess, Kevin) Modified on 2/16/2016 (sm, ).
February 16, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY WILL REFILE. Document # 32, Amended Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
February 12, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen W Wang on behalf of Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC (Wang, Allen)
February 12, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Conor Flynn on behalf of Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC (Flynn, Thomas)
February 12, 2016 Filing 29 First Amended ANSWER to Complaint #1 in 6:15-cv-1040-RWS by Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC.(Vakil, Bijal)
February 12, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shamita D Etienne-Cummings on behalf of Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC (Etienne-Cummings, Shamita)
February 11, 2016 Filing 27 First Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Google Inc..(Perlson, David)
February 11, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Perlson on behalf of Google Inc. (Perlson, David)
February 9, 2016 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amazon.com, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/08/16. (mll, )
February 8, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Randall Roeser on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Roeser, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:15-cv-1038 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/05/16. (mll, )
February 8, 2016 ***Consolidated Defendants added: Google Inc (6:15cv1039); Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC (6:15cv1040). (mll, )
February 5, 2016 Filing 21 SEALED MOTION To Dismiss For Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer To The Northern District of California by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Cutts Declaration, #21 Davis Declaration, #22 Diedrich Declaration, #23 Fischer Declaration, #24 Jewell Declaration, #25 Martin Declaration)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 5, 2016 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION For Leave To File Under Seal Amazon's Motion To Dismiss For Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer To The Northern District of California by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 25, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated NOTICE OF READINESS FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Burgess, Kevin)
January 21, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Amazon.com, Inc. to 2/5/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
January 20, 2016 Filing 18 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.com, Inc..( Doan, Jennifer)
January 20, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph H Lee on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Lee, Joseph)
January 20, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard G Frenkel on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Frenkel, Richard)
January 20, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey G. Homrig on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Homrig, Jeffrey)
January 20, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas E Lumish on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Lumish, Douglas)
January 19, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James E Quigley on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Quigley, James)
December 16, 2015 Filing 12 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.com, Inc..( Doan, Jennifer)
December 16, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Reed Thane on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Thane, Joshua)
December 16, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
December 16, 2015 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Amazon.com, Inc. to 1/21/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
December 8, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Bruce Campbell, Jr on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Campbell, John)
December 8, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mario A Apreotesi on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Apreotesi, Mario)
December 4, 2015 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Amazon.com, Inc. on 12/1/2015, by personal service; answer due: 12/22/2015. (mll, )
December 1, 2015 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Amazon.com, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
November 24, 2015 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent None for Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Burgess, Kevin)
November 24, 2015 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Burgess, Kevin)
November 24, 2015 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Burgess, Kevin)
November 24, 2015 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burgess, Kevin)
November 24, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Amazon.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5497498.), filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated.(Burgess, Kevin)
November 24, 2015 Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III added. (mll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eolas Technologies Incorporated v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: David Keyzer
Represented By: David Michael Keyzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC
Represented By: Stephen Lewis Townsend
Represented By: Allen W. Wang
Represented By: Mark A Lemley
Represented By: John R. Keville
Represented By: Bijal V Vakil
Represented By: Jason Liang Xu
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Green, III
Represented By: Shamita D. Etienne-Cummings
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Thomas Conor Flynn
Represented By: Eric Edmund Lancaster
Represented By: Eric Stephen Schlichter
Represented By: Jason Liang Xu,
Represented By: J. Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Mark Alan Lemley
Represented By: Bijal Vijay Vakil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Wal Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Stephen Lewis Townsend
Represented By: Allen W. Wang
Represented By: Mark A Lemley
Represented By: John R. Keville
Represented By: Bijal V Vakil
Represented By: Jason Liang Xu
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Green, III
Represented By: Shamita D. Etienne-Cummings
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Thomas Conor Flynn
Represented By: Eric Edmund Lancaster
Represented By: Eric Stephen Schlichter
Represented By: Jason Liang Xu,
Represented By: J. Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Bijal Vijay Vakil
Represented By: Mark Alan Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: David A. Perlson
Represented By: Michael Daniel Powell
Represented By: E. Glenn Thames, Jr.
Represented By: Carl G Anderson
Represented By: Michael Edwin Jones
Represented By: Charles K. Verhoeven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: David A. Perlson
Represented By: Michael Daniel Powell
Represented By: E. Glenn Thames, Jr.
Represented By: Carl G Anderson
Represented By: Michael Edwin Jones
Represented By: Charles K. Verhoeven
Represented By: David Andrew Perlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Douglas E. Lumish
Represented By: Amit Makker
Represented By: Joshua Reed Thane
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Homrig
Represented By: Grant E. Kinsel
Represented By: Nicholas Howard Yu
Represented By: Richard G Frenkel
Represented By: Joseph H Lee
Represented By: Melissa Arbus Sherry
Represented By: Graham E. Phillips
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: Elana Nightingale Dawson
Represented By: Blake Richard Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey Randall Roeser
Represented By: Joshua Thane
Represented By: Richard Gregory Frenkel
Represented By: Nicholas H Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eolas Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: Craig N. Tolliver
Represented By: Geoffrey Patton Culbertson
Represented By: Kevin Lee Burgess
Represented By: Mario A Apreotesi
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Truelove
Represented By: John Bruce Campbell, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly B Tidwell
Represented By: Kevin Hess
Represented By: James Elroy Quigley
Represented By: John Franklin Garvish, II
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Van Dusen
Represented By: Joshua Wright Budwin
Represented By: Kelly Tidwell
Represented By: Mike McKool
Represented By: Mario Aurel Apreotesi
Represented By: Stephanie M. Adams Ryan
Represented By: James Allen Glenn,
Represented By: Daniel Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Robert George Litts
Represented By: Mario Moore
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Lamken
Represented By: James Allen Glenn
Represented By: Megan C. Church
Represented By: Megan Cunniff Church,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Latham & Watkins LLP
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?