Brian H. et. al. v. Blue Shield of California
Plaintiff: Brian H. and Alex H.
Defendant: Blue Shield of California
Case Number: 3:2017cv03095
Filed: May 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS' SERVICE DBA BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA'S BILL OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 26, 2019. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT; GRANTING DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION FOR JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 7, 2019. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO RECONSIDER; VACATING JUDGMENT; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 20, 2019. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION FOR JUDGMENT; REMANDING FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 11, 2019. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY ADJUDICATION RE: STANDARD OF REVIEW; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. The Court, taking into account all relevant factors, will review Blue Shield's decision for abuse of discretion. The parties shall, no later than November 16, 2018, submit a proposed schedule for the filing of their respective briefs and hearing on the merits. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 1, 2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/05/2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND; GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/30/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/27/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING PURSUANT TO STIPULATION. The hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss is continued from July 21, 2017, to August 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/03/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2017)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/08/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian H. et. al. v. Blue Shield of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Shield of California
Represented By: Ketakee Rajiv Kane
Represented By: Joseph Edward Laska
Represented By: Gregory Neil Pimstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian H.
Represented By: Jessica M. Cho
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex H.
Represented By: Jessica M. Cho
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?