150 Spear Street Associates L.P. v. VWR International, LLC et al

Plaintiff: 150 Spear Street Associates L.P.
Defendant: VWR International, LLC and Univar USA Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv03246
Filed: June 6, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2018 82 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 81 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Scheduling Order filed by VWR International, LLC.Fact discovery cut-off 10/15/2018. Expert disclosures 11/5/2018. Expert rebuttal 11/26/2018. Expert discovery c ut-off 12/10/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 12/31/2018. Pretrial conference statement 4/22/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2019 at 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Jury Trial set for 5/20/2019 - 6/17/2019 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 5, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
June 4, 2018 78 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order re 77 . Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/4/2018. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
March 27, 2018 71 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order Striking Letter Briefs 68 , 69 , 70 . Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/27/2018. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
March 21, 2018 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion to Compel. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
February 16, 2018 63 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Governing Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by VWR International, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 16, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 15, 2018 62 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order; Order Continuing Discovery Hearing. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/15/2018. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2018)
December 19, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by VWR International, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 19, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
October 24, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order, Motions terminated: 43 Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Scheduling of Courtroom Meet and Confer Session filed by 150 Spear Street Associates L.P., 41 Joint Discovery Letter Briefin Response to Notice of Refer ral for Discovery filed by 150 Spear Street Associates L.P., 47 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Discovery Dispute filed by 150 Spear Street Associates L.P. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/24/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
June 30, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 1 Complaint, filed by VWR International, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 30, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 150 Spear Street Associates L.P. v. VWR International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 150 Spear Street Associates L.P.
Represented By: George Allen Brandt
Represented By: Philip S. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VWR International, LLC
Represented By: Bonnie Allyn Barnett
Represented By: Stephan Choo
Represented By: N. Kathleen Strickland
Represented By: Adam Johnson Thurston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Univar USA Inc.
Represented By: Anthony J. Barron
Represented By: Gregory Hixson
Represented By: Jennifer A. Kuenster
Represented By: Michelle Ulick Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?