Meta Company v. Zhong et al

Plaintiff: Meta Company
Defendant: Zhangyi Zhong and Dreamworld USA Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv03259
Filed: June 6, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1836
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 58 TO EXTEND DEADLINES RE MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, MOTION TO DISMISS, AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Meta Company. Responses due by 11/23/2017. Replies due by 11/30/2017. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/25/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
August 31, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 56 TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TO EXTEND ADR DEADLINES filed by Meta Company Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/31/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
August 22, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 53 TO EXTEND DEADLINES RE MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AND MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Meta Company.Both motions extended to 10/26/17 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/22/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2017)
August 1, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 TO EXTEND DEADLINES RE MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Meta Company. Responses due by 8/24/2017. Replies due by 8/31/2017. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/1/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
July 20, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 to Extend Deadlines re Motion to Expedite Discovery and Motion to Dismiss filed by Meta Company. Motion Hearing for Expedited Discovery reset for 8/24/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Franc isco before Edward M. Chen. Motion to Dismiss Hearing sreet for 8/31/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Opposition due: 8/10/17. Reply due 8/17/17. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/19/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 10, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 RE PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING PATENTS, HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR TRADE SECRETS filed by Meta Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/10/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
June 19, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 19 Plaintiff's Motion to Shorten Time; denying 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Shorten Time; denying 25 Plaintiff's Motion to Shorten Time. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meta Company v. Zhong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meta Company
Represented By: Paul Scott Cowie
Represented By: John-Paul Singh Deol
Represented By: Patrick M. McGill
Represented By: Jennifer G. Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhangyi Zhong
Represented By: Rick C. Chang
Represented By: Duane H. Mathiowetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dreamworld USA Inc.
Represented By: Rick C. Chang
Represented By: Duane H. Mathiowetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?