West American Insurance Company et al v. Nutiva, Inc.

Plaintiff: West American Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company and American Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Nutiva, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv03374
Filed: June 12, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 2, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 27 Stipulation REQUESTING LEAVE TO PARTICIPATE IN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
September 14, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re C-16-711 HSG. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/14/17. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West American Insurance Company et al v. Nutiva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West American Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peerless Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutiva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?