TSI USA LLC v. Uber Technologies Inc

Plaintiff: TSI USA LLC
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv03536
Filed: June 20, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 60 Stipulation Re Choice of Law and Related Issues. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 17, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/17/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 16, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 53 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Opposition. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 6, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 2, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 44 Stipulation ENLARGING TIME FOR FILING OF OPPOSITION AND REPLY BRIEFS IN CONNECTION WITH DEFENDANT'S 42 MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
August 25, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 40 Stipulation DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND RELATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE; AND FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Motions due by 8/31/2017; Responses due by 9 /28/2017; Replies due by 10/12/2017; Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Case Management Statement due by 11/21/2017; Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/28/2017 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TSI USA LLC v. Uber Technologies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TSI USA LLC
Represented By: Brian A Farlow
Represented By: Steven M Shebar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Danny S Ashby
Represented By: Ellie F Chapman
Represented By: Christin J Hill
Represented By: Geoffrey T. Holtz
Represented By: Ethel J Johnson
Represented By: Brian Rocca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?