Organic Consumers Association et al v. Sanderson Farms, Inc.

Plaintiff: Organic Consumers Association, Center for Food Safety and Friends of the Earth
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv03592
Filed: June 22, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2018 66 Opinion or Order of the Court Order, signed 4/2/18, by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 49 Motion for Sanctions.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 28, 2018 65 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 64 DEADLINES FOR FILING OF MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/28/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 19, 2018 63 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 62 Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/19/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Organic Consumers Association et al v. Sanderson Farms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Organic Consumers Association
Represented By: Gretchen Elsner
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: Jaimie Mak
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Food Safety
Represented By: Gretchen Elsner
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: Jaimie Mak
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Earth
Represented By: Gretchen Elsner
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: Jaimie Mak
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?