Saravia v. Sessions et al
Plaintiff: Ilsa Saravia
Defendant: Jefferson B. Sessions, James McHenry, Thomas E. Price, Steven Wagner, Scott Lloyd, Elicia Smith and Brent Cardall
Case Number: 3:2017cv03615
Filed: June 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 8:1105
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 246 Motion for Settlement. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER re [181-2] Defendants' Motion for Clarification. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on January 25, 2019. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER LIFTING RESTRICTIONS ON NONPARTY ACCESS TO ELECTRONIC FILINGS. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on January 22, 2019. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER RE MOTION TO LIFT STAY. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/15/2018. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER RE 108 EMERGENCY APPLICATION CONCERNING RELEASE OF A.H. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on December 12, 2017. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE TO EMERGENCY APPLICATION. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on December 7, 2017. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER re 103 GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY APPLICATION FOR RELIEF. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on November 27, 2017. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING THE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; GRANTING THE MOTION FOR PROVISIONAL CLASS CERTIFICATION; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART THE FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING IN FULL THE NON-FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS, re 51 , 54 , 58 , 61 . Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on November 20, 2017. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER RE FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on October 30, 2017. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re Expedited Discovery (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saravia v. Sessions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilsa Saravia
Represented By: William S. Freeman
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B. Sessions
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McHenry
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Price
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Wagner
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Lloyd
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elicia Smith
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Cardall
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?