Ali v. Cooper, et al.,

Plaintiff: Islah Ali
Defendant: Vanessa Cooper, Janet Basta, Lynette Jordan, Kara Korbel and Alemeda Housing Authority
Case Number: 3:2017cv03658
Filed: June 26, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2018 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 45 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
May 23, 2018 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Supplemental Briefing Due Tuesday 5/29/18 by 4pm, not to exceed 3 pages. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on May 23, 2018. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
March 7, 2018 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Kara Korbel, Janet Basta, Lynette Jordan, Vanessa Cooper, Alameda Housing Authority. Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2018. Further Case Management Conference reset for 6/28/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/7/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
January 30, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 20 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. Cooper, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Islah Ali
Represented By: Jacqueline Coulter-Peebles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Basta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynette Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kara Korbel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alemeda Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?