Planet Aid, Inc. et al v. Reveal, Center for Investigative Reporting et al

Plaintiff: Planet Aid, Inc. and Lisbeth Thomsen
Defendant: Reveal, Center for Investigative Reporting, Matt Smith and Amy Walters
Case Number: 3:2017cv03695
Filed: June 28, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DEFERRING RULING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO RETRANSFER; GRANTING JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY. Motions terminated: 32 MOTION TO RETRANSFER THE CASE TO THE DISTRICT OF MARYLAND OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TAKE JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY filed by Lisbeth Thomsen, Planet Aid, Inc. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/30/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
September 1, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO RETRANSFER. The hearing is continued from September 8, 2017, to October 27, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/01/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
August 1, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING AND DECLARATION. Plaintiffs are directed to file, no later than August 2, 2017, their supplemental brief and declaration. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/01/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
July 24, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO RETRANSFER AND TO MODIFY TIME FOR BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO RETRANSFER. Pending the Court's decision on the pending motion t o retransfer, all proceedings in this case are stayed and all pending deadlines and hearings are hereby vacated, including the September 29, 2017 Case Management Conference. As to the pending motion to retransfer, defendants' deadline to file t heir opposition is extended to August 2, 2017, plaintiffs' deadline to file their reply is extended to August 9, 2017, and the hearing thereon is continued from August 25, 2017, to September 8, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 18, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT IN SINGLE-SIDED FORMAT; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Plaintiffs are directed to submit forthwith a chambers copy of their complaint in single-sided format. All chambers copies of documents filed hereafter in the instant case shall be submitted in single-sided format. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/18/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
July 17, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Samuel Rosenthal is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/17/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
July 14, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/14/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Planet Aid, Inc. et al v. Reveal, Center for Investigative Reporting et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planet Aid, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew F. Miller
Represented By: Samuel Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisbeth Thomsen
Represented By: Matthew F. Miller
Represented By: Samuel Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reveal, Center for Investigative Reporting
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Brendan Nathaniel Charney
Represented By: Ronald G. London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Smith
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Brendan Nathaniel Charney
Represented By: Ronald G. London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Walters
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Brendan Nathaniel Charney
Represented By: Ronald G. London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?