State of California v. Valero Energy Corporation et al
Plaintiff: State of California
Defendant: Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Energy Partners LP and Plains All American Pipeline, L.P.
Objector: AOT Energy Americas, LLC and Kinder Morgan, Inc.
Miscellaneous: BP America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv03786
Filed: June 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND FINAL JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/12/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL by Judge Judge William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 36 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER RE JOINT NOTICE OF PENDING DISMISSAL re 103 Notice (Other) filed by State of California Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/21/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 *REDACTED ORDER RE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/17/2017. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER SEALING PORTIONS OF ORDER RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re 91 Notice (Other) filed by Kinder Morgan, Inc., 100 Objection, filed by Shell Oil Products U.S., 99 Response ( Non Motion ), filed by Andeavor (formerly Tesoro Corporation), 85 Objection filed by Kinder Morgan, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/15/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO PARTICIPATE IN EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION by Hon. William Alsup granting 92 Stipulation selecting Early Neutral Evaluation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER RE THIRD-PARTY OBJECTIONS TO UNSEALING re 91 Notice (Other) filed by Kinder Morgan, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/8/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO UNSEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 58 Motion to Unseal Document.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER RE THIRD-PARTY OBJECTIONS TO UNSEALING re 85 Objection filed by Kinder Morgan, Inc. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/5/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER RE SEALING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER by Hon. William Alsup Re 81 Administrative Motion sealing.(whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER RE SEALING OF ORDER ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re 79 Order Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/23/2017. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER RE HAYES' DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT by Hon. William Alsup granting 66 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER RE OBJECTIONS TO PRODUCTION Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/25/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE OBJECTIONS TO DOCUMENT PRODUCTION re 35 Objection, filed by AOT Energy Americas, LLC, 38 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Valero Energy Partners LP, Valero Energy Corporation Discovery Hearing set for 7/25/2017 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/24/2017. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE by Hon. William Alsup 28 Discovery Letter Brief.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California v. Valero Energy Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Debbie Chiv
Represented By: Polly Jessica Estes
Represented By: Charles M. Kagay
Represented By: Suzanne Klotz
Represented By: Wayne Ming-Cheng Liao
Represented By: Paul Andrew Moore
Represented By: Brian Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Energy Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Stephen Oliver
Represented By: Michael James Perry
Represented By: Stuart Christopher Plunkett
Represented By: Stephen Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Energy Partners LP
Represented By: Jeffrey Stephen Oliver
Represented By: Michael James Perry
Represented By: Stuart Christopher Plunkett
Represented By: Stephen Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plains All American Pipeline, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher Walter James
Represented By: Deborah Carleton Milner
Represented By: James A. Reeder, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Vigdor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: AOT Energy Americas, LLC
Represented By: Robert Paul Merten, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Kinder Morgan, Inc.
Represented By: M. Ray Hartman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: BP America, Inc.
Represented By: John David Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?