Thompson v. Brennan

Plaintiff: Brian Thompson
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 3:2017cv03798
Filed: July 3, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 briefing schedule of Motion to Dismiss and resetting CMC filed by Brian Thompson. Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/6/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 4, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME AND ORDERING PARTIES TO MEET-AND-CONFER AND FILE STIPULATION BY FRIDAY DECEMBER 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on December 4, 2017. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
November 17, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AND VACATING NOVEMBER 30, 2017 HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Show Cause Response due by 12/1/2017. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/17/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Thompson
Represented By: Dwana Simone Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?