Keefe Kaplan Maritime, Inc v. the vessel "CYGNET"

Plaintiff: Keefe Kaplan Maritime, Inc
Defendant: the vessel "CYGNET
Case Number: 3:2017cv03899
Filed: July 10, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Default Judgment. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 18, 2018 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER discharging 30 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/18/2018. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
December 11, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to Plaintiff. Show Cause Response due by 12/15/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/11/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keefe Kaplan Maritime, Inc v. the vessel "CYGNET"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keefe Kaplan Maritime, Inc
Represented By: Richard John Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: the vessel "CYGNET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?