Eidler et al v. Brookdale Senior Living, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Eidler, Christopher Eidler, Stacia Stiner, Mary-Catherine Jones, Kelly Clapper, Hellen Carlson and Carlson Joan
Defendant: Brookdale Senior Living, Inc. and Brookdale Living Communities, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv03962
Filed: July 13, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2018 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 67 Administrative Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing re 61 MOTION to Strike Portions of Second Amended Complaint, 59 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, 60 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
April 30, 2018 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 64 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motions. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
March 16, 2018 49 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 13-3962-HSG. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/16/2018. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eidler et al v. Brookdale Senior Living, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Eidler
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Bien-Kahn
Represented By: Sarah S Colby
Represented By: Gay Crosthwait Grunfeld
Represented By: Christopher David Hu
Represented By: Kelly Jean Knapp
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Stebner
Represented By: Guy Burton Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Eidler
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Bien-Kahn
Represented By: Sarah S Colby
Represented By: Gay Crosthwait Grunfeld
Represented By: Christopher David Hu
Represented By: Kelly Jean Knapp
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Stebner
Represented By: Guy Burton Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacia Stiner
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Bien-Kahn
Represented By: Sarah S Colby
Represented By: Gay Crosthwait Grunfeld
Represented By: Christopher David Hu
Represented By: Kelly Jean Knapp
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Stebner
Represented By: Guy Burton Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary-Catherine Jones
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Bien-Kahn
Represented By: Sarah S Colby
Represented By: Gay Crosthwait Grunfeld
Represented By: Christopher David Hu
Represented By: Kelly Jean Knapp
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Stebner
Represented By: Guy Burton Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Clapper
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Bien-Kahn
Represented By: Sarah S Colby
Represented By: Gay Crosthwait Grunfeld
Represented By: Christopher David Hu
Represented By: Kelly Jean Knapp
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Stebner
Represented By: Guy Burton Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hellen Carlson
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Bien-Kahn
Represented By: Sarah S Colby
Represented By: Gay Crosthwait Grunfeld
Represented By: Christopher David Hu
Represented By: Kelly Jean Knapp
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Stebner
Represented By: Guy Burton Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlson Joan
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Bien-Kahn
Represented By: Sarah S Colby
Represented By: Gay Crosthwait Grunfeld
Represented By: Christopher David Hu
Represented By: Kelly Jean Knapp
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Stebner
Represented By: Guy Burton Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookdale Senior Living, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Barker
Represented By: Mallory Ann Jensen
Represented By: Adam P. KohSweeney
Represented By: Matthew David Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookdale Living Communities, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Barker
Represented By: Mallory Ann Jensen
Represented By: Adam P. KohSweeney
Represented By: Matthew David Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?