Rearden LLC et al v. The Walt Disney Company et al

Plaintiff: Rearden LLC and MOVA LLC
Defendant: The Walt Disney Company, Buena Vista Home Entertainment Inc, Marvel Studios LLC, Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group Inc. and Mandeville Films Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv04006
Filed: July 17, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2018 90 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re (60 in 3:17-cv-04192-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (40) Amended Complaint, filed by Paramount Pictures Corporation, Paramount Home Entertainment Distribution Inc., (61 in 3:17-cv-04191-JST) STIPULATION W ITH PROPOSED ORDER re (41) Amended Complaint, filed by Twentieth Century Fox Home Entertainment LLC, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, (89 in 3:17-cv-04006-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (63) Amended Complaint, filed by Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc., Mandeville Films Inc., Marvel Studios, LLC, The Walt Disney Company, Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 25, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 18, 2018 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
March 7, 2018 64 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Filing of First Amended Complaints and Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss Same filed by MOVA LLC, Rearden LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 7, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
February 21, 2018 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part (36) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:17-cv-04006-JST; granting in part and denying in part (17) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:17-cv-04191-JST; granting in part and denying in part (17) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:17-cv-04192-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
October 27, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint) Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Hearing and Case Management Conference Scheduling filed by MOVA LLC, Rearden LLC. Case Management Statement due by 2/12/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 27, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
September 18, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] Regarding Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) or, alternatively, to Stay filed by Marvel Studios LLC, Mandeville Films Inc., Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group Inc., The Walt Disney Company, Buena Vista Home Entertainment Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 15, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rearden LLC et al v. The Walt Disney Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rearden LLC
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Mark S Carlson
Represented By: Rio Shaye Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOVA LLC
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Mark S Carlson
Represented By: Rio Shaye Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Walt Disney Company
Represented By: Kelly Max Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buena Vista Home Entertainment Inc
Represented By: Kelly Max Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvel Studios LLC
Represented By: Kelly Max Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Max Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandeville Films Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Max Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?